Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Grande Communications Network, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Defendant: Radiate Holdings, L.P., TPG Global, LLC, Grande Communications Network, LLC, WaveDivision Holdings, LLC and RCN Telecom Services, LLC
Special Master: Allen M. -SM- Terrell, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00363
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third-Party Subpoenas on 1) InfoStructure Solutions Inc. on April 4, 2019 and 2) iGlass Properties, LLC on April 5, 2019 filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B)(Belitz, Christina)
April 4, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Identification of Claim Terms for Potential Construction filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti)
April 4, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' List of Claim Terms for Construction filed by Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC.(Farnan, Kelly)
April 3, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Third-Party Subpoenas to InfoStructure Solutions Inc. and iGLASS Properties, LLC by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Belitz, Christina)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (106 in 17-cv-1734-RGA, 111 in 18-cv-536-RGA, 70 in 17-cv-1736-RGA, 67 in 18-cv-361-RGA, 74 in 18-cv-363-RGA, 81 in 18-cv-362-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael W. Gray, filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/29/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms)
March 28, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael W. Gray - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael W. Gray)(Katona, Shanti)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Appointing Special Master: Allen M. Terrell, Jr., appointed (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/13/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REFERRING CASES to Clerk for assignment of a Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/7/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms)
March 6, 2019 Filing 71 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Shanti M. Katona, Esq. regarding Special Master Appointment. (Katona, Shanti)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORAL ORDER: The request for leave to file early summary judgment (see CA 17-1734-RGA at D.I. 69 and D.I. 72) is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/28/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (61 in 18-cv-361-RGA, 75 in 18-cv-362-RGA, 68 in 18-cv-363-RGA, 64 in 17-cv-1736-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME on ESI Deadline to March 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/25/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01736-RGA, 1:18-cv-00361-RGA, 1:18-cv-00362-RGA, 1:18-cv-00363-RGA(nms)
February 22, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Holdings, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC.(Farnan, Kelly)
February 22, 2019 Filing 68 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME on ESI Deadline to March 1, 2019 - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Katona, Shanti)
February 15, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's First Set of Individual Interrogatories to Defendants; and (2) Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company, L.P.'s Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti)
February 8, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Requests for Additional ESI Search Terms filed by Mediacom Communications Corp., Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, TPG Global, LLC, WaveDivision Holdings, LLC, Atlantic Broadband (CT), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Delmar), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Miami), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (NH-ME), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Penn), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (SC), LLC, Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC, Metrocast Cablevision of New Hampshire, LLC, WideOpenWest Finance, LLC, WideOpenWest Networks, Inc., WideOpenWest, Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
February 8, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Identification of Additional ESI Custodian Search Terms filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti)
February 8, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Amended Disclosure of Custodians filed by Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC.(Mayo, Andrew)
January 25, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Disclosure of Search Terms filed by Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC.(Mayo, Andrew)
January 25, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Identification of ESI Custodian Search Terms filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti)
January 25, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Amended Identification of ESI Custodians filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti)
January 22, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 2-7) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (90 in 17-cv-1734-RGA, 52 in 18-cv-361-RGA, 65 in 18-cv-362-RGA, 59 in 18-cv-363-RGA, 90 in 18-cv-536-RGA, 55 in 17-cv-1736-RGA) Stipulation and Order to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/11/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms)
January 10, 2019 Filing 59 STIPULATION regarding extension of deadlines regarding ESI disclosures by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Rovner, Philip)
December 21, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Sprint's Paragraph 4(c) Disclosures; and (2) Sprint's Preliminary Election of Asserted Claims filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SO ORDERED re Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA, 1:17-cv-01736-RGA, 1:18-cv-00361-RGA, 1:18-cv-00362-RGA, 1:18-cv-00363-RGA(nms)
December 14, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Sprint's Identification of ESI Custodians filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti)
December 14, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Disclosure of Custodians filed by Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC.(Mayo, Andrew)
December 6, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The stipulation filed at D.I. 55 has been removed from the docket as it was filed in error. The filing was intended for another case. (nms)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (53 in 18-cv-363-RGA, 46 in 18-cv-361-RGA, 59 in 18-cv-362-RGA, 49 in 17-cv-1736-RGA, 76 in 18-cv-536-RGA, 80 in 17-cv-1734-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: ESI Disclosure Dates. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/30/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms)
November 30, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 2-7) filed by Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC.(Farnan, Kelly)
November 30, 2018 Filing 53 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: ESI Disclosure Dates to - filed by Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC. (Farnan, Kelly)
November 12, 2018 Filing 52 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kelly E. Farnan regarding Proposed Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Farnan, Kelly)
November 12, 2018 Filing 51 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Shanti Katona, regarding disputed provision of the proposed protective order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Katona, Shanti) Modified on 11/13/2018 (nms).
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SO ORDERED Granting Stipulated Order Regarding Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/6/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms)
November 5, 2018 Filing 49 PROPOSED Stipulated Order Regarding Electronically Stored Information, by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Katona, Shanti) Modified on 11/6/2018 (nms).
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (48 in 18-cv-363-RGA, 41 in 18-cv-361-RGA, 66 in 18-cv-536-RGA, 73 in 17-cv-1734-RGA, 53 in 18-cv-362-RGA, 44 in 17-cv-1736-RGA) STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to Submit Stipulated ESI Order and Protective Order to November 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/31/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms)
October 31, 2018 Filing 48 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Submit Stipulated ESI Order and Protective Order to November 5, 2018 - filed by Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 31, 2018 Filing 47 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Shanti Katona regarding Response to Early Summary Judgment. (Katona, Shanti)
October 29, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Sprint's Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5); and (2) Sprint's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (50 in 18-cv-362-RGA, 41 in 17-cv-1736-RGA, 63 in 18-cv-536-RGA, 71 in 17-cv-1734-RGA, 45 in 18-cv-363-RGA, 38 in 18-cv-361-RGA) Stipulation and Order to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/29/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time, by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Katona, Shanti) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
October 23, 2018 Filing 44 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Kelly E. Farnan, regarding Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/24/2018 (nms).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time (see 60 in 18-cv-536-RGA, 67 in 17-cv-1734-RGA, 47 in 18-cv-362-RGA, 35 in 18-cv-361-RGA, 42 in 18-cv-363-RGA, 38 in 17-cv-1736-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/23/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms)
October 22, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 1) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time - filed by Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/22/2018 (nms).
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (37 in 17-cv-1736-RGA, 56 in 18-cv-536-RGA, 46 in 18-cv-362-RGA, 41 in 18-cv-363-RGA, 66 in 17-cv-1734-RGA, 34 in 18-cv-361-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: ESI Order and Protective Order to through and including October 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms)
October 16, 2018 Filing 41 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re: ESI Order and Protective Order to through and including October 31, 2018 - filed by Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 4, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company, L.P.'s Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-96) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that on or before October 22, 2018, each party or each party group shall email to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, information requested regarding ADR. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(cak)
September 28, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff and Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Sprint filed by Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC.(Mayo, Andrew)
September 25, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Marie Belitz on behalf of Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Belitz, Christina)
September 24, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories and Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production filed by Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC.(Mayo, Andrew)
September 21, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE Of Service of Defendants First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff, filed by Mediacom Communications Corp., Frontier Communications Corporation, Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., TPG Global, LLC, WaveDivision Holdings, LLC, Atlantic Broadband (CT), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Delmar), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Miami), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (NH-ME), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Penn), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (SC), LLC, Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC, Metrocast Cablevision of New Hampshire, LLC, WideOpenWest Finance, LLC, WideOpenWest Networks, Inc., WideOpenWest, Inc., Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Holdings, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC.(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 9/21/2018 (nms).
September 17, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC.(Mayo, Andrew)
September 17, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Communications Company L.P.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti)
September 5, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Identification of Accused Products and Services filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti)
September 4, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(fms)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 4/16/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 4/16/2019. Fact Discovery completed by 12/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/12/2020. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 9/12/2019. A Markman Hearing is set for 9/25/2019, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/25/2020, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Jury Trial is set for 10/5/2020, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/25/2020, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Jury Trial is set for 10/14/2020, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/25/2020, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Jury Trial is set for 10/22/2020, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/25/2020, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6A. A Jury Trial is set for 11/2/2020, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/25/2020, at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 6A. A Jury Trial is set for 11/12/2020, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/25/2020, at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 6A. A Jury Trial is set for 11/30/2020, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Jury Trial is set for 12/7/2020, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/29/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms)
August 28, 2018 Filing 30 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Katona, Shanti) Modified on 8/29/2018 (nms).
August 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 8/17/2018. (Court Reporter Taneha Carol, Hawkins Reporting Service.) Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms)
August 15, 2018 Filing 29 Proposed Scheduling Order, by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Katona, Shanti) Modified on 8/15/2018 (nms).
August 3, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-96) filed by Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC.(Farnan, Kelly)
August 3, 2018 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent TPG Global, LLC for Radiate Holdings, L.P.; Corporate Parent OH WDH Holdco, LLC for WaveDivision Holdings, LLC; Corporate Parent Yankee Cable Acquisition, LLC for RCN Telecom Services, LLC; Corporate Parent Grande Parent, LLC for Grande Communications Network, LLC filed by Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC. (Mayo, Andrew)
August 3, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand, by Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC.(Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 8/3/2018 (nms).
July 25, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company, L.P.'s First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants; and (2) Plaintiff Sprint Communications Company, L.P.s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendants (Nos. 1-30) filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Amended Complaint to August 3, 3018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Grande Communications Network, LLC answer due 8/3/2018; RCN Telecom Services, LLC answer due 8/3/2018; Radiate Holdings, L.P. answer due 8/3/2018; WaveDivision Holdings, LLC answer due 8/3/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/19/2018. (nms)
July 18, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the First Amended Complaint to August 3, 3018 - filed by Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC. (Mayo, Andrew)
July 6, 2018 Filing 23 First Amended Complaint against Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Katona, Shanti) Modified on 7/6/2018 (nms).
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/17/2018, at 3:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/2/2018. (nms)
June 28, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ryan J Schletzbaum for Sprint Communications Company L.P. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00362-RGA, 1:18-cv-00363-RGA, 1:18-cv-00536-RGA(crb)
June 28, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark D. Schafer,Lauren E. Douville,Jordan T. Bergsten for Sprint Communications Company L.P. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Motion to Dismiss to July 6, 2018 (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #17 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief due 7/6/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/28/2018. (nms)
June 28, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to July 6, 2018 - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Katona, Shanti)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan J. Schletzbaum, Jordan T. Bergsten, Lauren E. Douville and Mark D. Schafer of Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P., filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/27/2018. (nms)
June 26, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan J. Schletzbaum, Jordan T. Bergsten, Lauren E. Douville and Mark D. Schafer of Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P. - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Katona, Shanti)
June 15, 2018 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie re #18 Opening Brief in Support, by Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-N)(Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 6/21/2018 (nms).
June 15, 2018 Filing 18 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 6/21/2018 (nms).
June 15, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 6/21/2018 (nms).
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SO ORDERED Granting #15 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant TPG Global, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/11/2018. (nms)
June 8, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant TPG Global, LLC, by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Katona, Shanti) Modified on 6/11/2018 (nms).
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to June 15, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: TPG Global, LLC answer due 6/15/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/7/2018. (nms)
May 3, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to June 15, 2018 - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Katona, Shanti)
May 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Amy E. Bergeron for Grande Communications Network, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
May 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney B. Trent Webb,Aaron E Hankel,Ryan D. Dykal,Robert H. Reckers for Sprint Communications Company L.P. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00363-RGA, 1:18-cv-00361-RGA, 1:18-cv-00362-RGA, 1:18-cv-00536-RGA(crb)
May 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie for Grande Communications Network, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
May 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robinson Vu for Grande Communications Network, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robinson Vu, Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie, and Amy E. Bergeron filed by Radiate Holdings, L.P., RCN Telecom Services, LLC, WaveDivision Holdings, LLC, Grande Communications Network, LLC, #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Trent Webb, Aaron E. Hankel, and Ryan D. Dykal of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., and #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert H. Reckers of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/30/2018. (nms)
April 30, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robinson Vu, Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie, and Amy E. Bergeron - filed by Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 27, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert H. Reckers of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Katona, Shanti)
April 27, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Trent Webb, Aaron E. Hankel, and Ryan D. Dykal of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications)(Katona, Shanti)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to June 15, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Grande Communications Network, LLC answer due 6/15/2018; RCN Telecom Services, LLC answer due 6/15/2018; Radiate Holdings, L.P. answer due 6/15/2018; WaveDivision Holdings, LLC answer due 6/15/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/25/2018. (nms)
April 25, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to June 15, 2018 - filed by Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., WaveDivision Holdings, LLC. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 12, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. WaveDivision Holdings, LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Grande Communications Network, LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. RCN Telecom Services, LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Radiate Holdings, L.P. served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. TPG Global, LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Summons returned executed at D.I. 5 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall refile the returned summons each at there own docket item entries, thereby allowing the service date to be included and an answering due date to be set. (nms)
March 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00361-RGA, 1:18-cv-00362-RGA, 1:18-cv-00363-RGA (rjb)
March 8, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Grande Communications Network, LLC on 3/8/2018; RCN Telecom Services, LLC on 3/8/2018; Radiate Holdings, L.P. on 3/8/2018; TPG Global, LLC on 3/8/2018; WaveDivision Holdings, LLC on 3/8/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb)
March 7, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sprint Corporation, Corporate Parent Sprint Communications, Inc., Corporate Parent SoftBank Corp. for Sprint Communications Company L.P. filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (crb)
March 7, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) See Attachment. (crb)
March 7, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
March 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., TPG Global, LLC, WaveDivision Holdings, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2336596.) - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Grande Communications Network, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiate Holdings, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG Global, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grande Communications Network, LLC
Represented By: Robinson Vu
Represented By: Amy E. Bergeron
Represented By: Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WaveDivision Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCN Telecom Services, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Represented By: Shanti Mulpuru Katona
Represented By: Robert H. Reckers
Represented By: Aaron E Hankel
Represented By: B. Trent Webb
Represented By: Ryan D. Dykal
Represented By: Jordan T. Bergsten
Represented By: Ryan J Schletzbaum
Represented By: Mark D. Schafer
Represented By: Christina Marie Belitz
Represented By: Lauren E. Douville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Allen M. -SM- Terrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?