State of Delaware v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, McKesson Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00383
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2018 Filing 37 Letter to Superior Court, New Castle County, dated 4/25/2018, from the Clerk of Court, regarding the remand of the case and enclosing D.I. #35 and #36 . (nms)
April 25, 2018 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #36 . (nms)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The Motion to Remand (D.I. #4 ) is GRANTED. This case is REMANDED to the Superior Court of Delaware. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/25/2018. (nms)
April 25, 2018 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM regarding Motion to Remand (D.I. #4 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/25/2018. (nms)
April 19, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Richard W. Fields for State of Delaware added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
April 17, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: A pdf of Exhibit A has been added to the filing at D.I. #34 per counsel's request. The exhibit was inadvertently omitted in the first instance. (nms)
April 17, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by State of Delaware (Newell, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2018: #1 Exhibit A) (nms).
April 16, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority, by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Barlow, Michael) Modified on 4/17/2018 (nms).
April 10, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Response to Defendant McKesson Corporation's Notice of Supplemental Authority by State of Delaware re #31 Notice (Other) (Newell, Ryan)
April 10, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by McKesson Corporation re #4 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order)(Barlow, Michael) Modified on 4/10/2018 (nms).
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SO ORDERED, re #29 Stipulation Staying Certain Proceedings and Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/29/2018. (nms)
March 28, 2018 Filing 29 STIPULATION Staying Certain Proceedings and Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint by McKesson Corporation. (Barlow, Michael)
March 28, 2018 Filing 28 REQUEST for Oral Argument by McKesson Corporation re #4 MOTION to Remand . (Barlow, Michael)
March 26, 2018 Filing 27 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by State of Delaware. (Newell, Ryan)
March 22, 2018 Filing 26 DECLARATION of David A. Seal, Esq. re #25 Answering Brief in Opposition, by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Barlow, Michael) Modified on 3/23/2018 (nms).
March 22, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand, filed by McKesson Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/29/2018. (Barlow, Michael) Modified on 3/23/2018 (nms).
March 20, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark A Packman for State of Delaware added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Stay (D.I. #14 ) is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2018. (nms)
March 19, 2018 Filing 23 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Ryan P. Newell, regarding response to March 16, 2018 Letter request of Defendants seeking expedited briefing scheduled for Defendants' Motion to Stay (D.I. #22 ). (Newell, Ryan) Modified on 3/19/2018 (nms).
March 16, 2018 Filing 22 Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Michael A. Barlow, Esq., regarding expedited briefing on Defendants' Motion to Stay. (Barlow, Michael) Modified on 3/19/2018 (nms).
March 16, 2018 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Rath, Daniel)
March 16, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Hayley J. Reese on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Reese, Hayley)
March 16, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Brown on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Brown, Daniel)
March 16, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven P. Wood on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Wood, Steven)
March 16, 2018 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Amerisourcebergen Corporation. (Wasson, Jennifer)
March 15, 2018 Filing 16 DECLARATION of David A. Seal, Esq. re #15 Opening Brief in Support, by Amerisourcebergen Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-32)(Barlow, Michael) Modified on 3/16/2018 (nms).
March 15, 2018 Filing 15 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling By Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, filed by Amerisourcebergen Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/29/2018. (Barlow, Michael) Modified on 3/16/2018 (nms).
March 15, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling By Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation - filed by Amerisourcebergen Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barlow, Michael) Modified on 3/16/2018 (nms).
March 15, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael Brendan Rush,Richard Shore,Jenna A Hudson for State of Delaware added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORAL ORDER: The request for an expedited briefing schedule (D.I. #10 ) is GRANTED. The schedule proposed at D.I. #10 is APPROVED. Defendants opposition to the Motion to Remand is due 7 days from the date of this Order, and Plaintiff's Reply shall be due 3 days from the filing of the opposition. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/15/2018. (nms)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard Shore, Mark A. Packman, Michael B. Rush, and Jenna A. Hudson of Gilbert LLP, filed by State of Delaware, and #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard W. Fields of Fields PLLC, filed by State of Delaware. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/15/2018. (nms)
March 15, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard W. Fields of Fields PLLC - filed by State of Delaware. (Newell, Ryan)
March 15, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard Shore, Mark A. Packman, Michael B. Rush, and Jenna A. Hudson of Gilbert LLP - filed by State of Delaware. (Newell, Ryan)
March 14, 2018 Filing 10 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Ryan P. Newell, Esq., regarding request for expedited briefing schedule regarding Motion to Remand (D.I. #4 ). (Newell, Ryan) Modified on 3/15/2018 (nms).
March 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Evans Gay on behalf of State of Delaware (Gay, Kyle)
March 14, 2018 Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by State of Delaware.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Newell, Ryan)
March 14, 2018 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Felice, David)
March 14, 2018 Remark: Case assigned to RGA. Chambers notified of Letter at D.I. #6 . (rwc) Modified on 3/14/2018 (nms).
March 14, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The brief filed at D.I. 5 has been removed from the docket per counsel's request. Counsel will refile a corrected version of the brief. (nms)
March 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 13, 2018 Filing 6 Letter to Mr. John A. Cerino, Clerk of the Court from Ryan P. Newell, Esq. regarding Request for Attention of Duty Judge - re #4 MOTION to Remand . (Newell, Ryan)
March 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand - filed by State of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newell, Ryan)
March 9, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by McKesson Corporation. (fms)
March 9, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (fms)
March 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior CT, Case Number N18C-01-223 MMJ CCLD (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2338748)- filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet with Rider)(fms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Delaware v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca Lyn Butcher
Represented By: Daniel Bartley Rath
Represented By: Jennifer L. Cree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: A. Thompson Bayliss
Represented By: Michael A. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jami B. Nimeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Steven P. Wood
Represented By: Hayley J. Reese
Represented By: Daniel J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Jenness Elizabeth Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Catherine Wasson
Represented By: Jesse Leon Noa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Steven P. Wood
Represented By: Hayley J. Reese
Represented By: Daniel J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Beth Moskow-Schnoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Jenness Elizabeth Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Jenness Elizabeth Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Newell
Represented By: Kyle Evans Gay
Represented By: Richard Shore
Represented By: Richard W. Fields
Represented By: Mark A Packman
Represented By: Michael B. Rush
Represented By: Jenna A Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?