DTN, LLC v. Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.

Plaintiff: DTN, LLC
Defendant: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Counter_defendant: DTN, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00384
Filed: March 12, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2018 215 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 147 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand filed by Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/14/18. (ntl)
October 11, 2018 194 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re discovery disputes and further amending the Scheduling Order as follows: Rebuttal Expert Reports due 10/31/2018; Reply Expert Reports due 11/9/2018; Close of Expert Discovery due 11/20/2018; Case Dispositive Motions due 11/26/2018; Pretrial Conference is set for 12/21/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. See Memorandum Order for further details. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/11/2018. (etg)
March 19, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction filed by DTN, LLC is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/19/18. (ntl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DTN, LLC v. Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DTN, LLC
Represented By: David A. Dorey
Represented By: Craig N. Haring
Represented By: Robert J. Mittman
Represented By: Daniel S. Morris
Represented By: Brian S. Paszamant
Represented By: Daniel E. Rhynhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: DTN, LLC
Represented By: David A. Dorey
Represented By: Craig N. Haring
Represented By: Robert J. Mittman
Represented By: Daniel S. Morris
Represented By: Brian S. Paszamant
Represented By: Daniel E. Rhynhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?