Incarcerated Entertainment, LLC v. CNBC LLC et al
Plaintiff: Incarcerated Entertainment, LLC
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Hulu, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Kurtis Productions, Ltd, CNBC LLC and Google LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00480
Filed: March 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Vacant Judgeship (2017)
Referring Judge: Mary Pat Thynge
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nathan Siegel, Constance M. Pendleton and Taaj Reaves - filed by Amazon.com, Inc., CNBC LLC, Hulu, LLC, Kurtis Productions, Ltd, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Hanson, Thomas)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to June 18, 2018 filed by Kurtis Productions, Ltd, CNBC LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Hulu, LLC. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/17/18. (cak)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #22 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Complaint to June 18, 2018 filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/17/18. (cak)
May 17, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to June 18, 2018 - filed by Amazon.com, Inc., CNBC LLC, Hulu, LLC, Kurtis Productions, Ltd, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Hanson, Thomas)
May 17, 2018 Filing 22 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Complaint to June 18, 2018 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Mozal, Nicholas)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #21 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Google to respond to Incarcerated Entertainment's Complaint up to and including 6/18/18. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/14/18. (cak)
May 14, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Answer Complaint by Google LLC. (Liston, Ian)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David H. Kramer and Peter C. Holm - filed by Google LLC. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/4/18. (cak)
May 3, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David H. Kramer and Peter C. Holm - filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David H. Kramer, #2 Certification of Peter C. Holm)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Liston, Ian)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Respond, or Otherwise Reply to the Complaint to May 21, 2018 filed by Kurtis Productions, Ltd, CNBC LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Hulu, LLC. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/23/18. (cak)
April 20, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Hanson, Jr on behalf of CNBC LLC, Hulu, LLC, Kurtis Productions, Ltd, NBCUniversal Media, LLC (Hanson, Thomas)
April 20, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Respond, or Otherwise Reply to the Complaint to May 21, 2018 - filed by CNBC LLC, Hulu, LLC, Kurtis Productions, Ltd, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Hanson, Thomas)
April 20, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Cara L. Gagliano for Apple Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
April 20, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David Eberhart for Apple Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David R. Eberhart and Cara L. Gagliano - filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/18/18. (cak)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #13 Stipulation to Extend Time. Google's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Incarcerated Entertainment's Complaint is extended to May 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/18/18. (cak)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #17 Stipulation to Extend Time. Apple's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Incarcerated Entertainment's Complaint is extended to May 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/18/18. (cak)
April 18, 2018 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint to May 21, 2018 by Apple Inc.. (Mozal, Nicholas)
April 18, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Eberhart and Cara L. Gagliano - filed by Apple Inc.. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Mozal, Nicholas)
April 18, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas D. Mozal and Bradley R. Aronstam, Esquire on behalf of Apple Inc. (Mozal, Nicholas)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Amazon.com, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to May 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/17/18. (cak)
April 13, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Amazon.com, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to May 21, 2018 - filed by Incarcerated Entertainment, LLC. (Weinblatt, Richard)
April 10, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION To Extend Time by Google LLC. (Liston, Ian)
April 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Robert Liston on behalf of Google LLC (Liston, Ian)
April 9, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Incarcerated Entertainment, LLC. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018. (Weinblatt, Richard)
April 9, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Incarcerated Entertainment, LLC. Apple Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018. (Weinblatt, Richard)
April 9, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Incarcerated Entertainment, LLC. CNBC LLC served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018. (Weinblatt, Richard)
April 9, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Incarcerated Entertainment, LLC. Google LLC served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018. (Weinblatt, Richard)
April 9, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Incarcerated Entertainment, LLC. Hulu, LLC served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018. (Weinblatt, Richard)
April 9, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Incarcerated Entertainment, LLC. Kurtis Productions, Ltd served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018. (Weinblatt, Richard)
April 9, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Incarcerated Entertainment, LLC. NBCUniversal Media, LLC served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018. (Weinblatt, Richard)
April 9, 2018 ***NOTE: If the parties jointly consent to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynges jurisdiction to conduct all proceedings in this case, then the Pretrial Conference and Trial will be presided over by Judge Thynge consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636. Otherwise, in accordance with the District Court's procedures for "Assignment of Cases to Visiting Judges" (issued May 26, 2017 and available on the District Court's website), upon the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., a motion to dismiss, a motion for judgment on the pleadings, a motion for summary judgment, or initiation of the claim construction process in a patent case), VAC cases will be reassigned to a visiting District Judge, and any further dates in the Scheduling Order, including the Pretrial Conference and Trial dates, may be adjusted dependent on the availability of the visiting District Judge. (cak)
April 4, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) (rjb)
April 4, 2018 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 2, 2018 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to CNBC LLC. (sar)
March 29, 2018 Filing 4 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s)VA 2-037-974; VA 2-037-975; VA 2-037-976; VA 2-037-977; VA 2-037-978; VA 2-037-979; VA 2-054-419; VA 2-037-982; VA 2-037-983; VA 2-037-984; PA 2-060-096. (Weinblatt, Richard)
March 29, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Amazon.com, Inc. on 3/29/2018; Apple Inc. on 3/29/2018; CNBC LLC on 3/29/2018; Google LLC on 3/29/2018; Hulu, LLC on 3/29/2018; Kurtis Productions, Ltd on 3/29/2018; NBCUniversal Media, LLC on 3/29/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
March 29, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Incarcerated Entertainment, LLC. (rwc)
March 29, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
March 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., CNBC LLC, Google LLC, Hulu, LLC, Kurtis Productions, Ltd, NBCUniversal Media, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2350945.) - filed by Incarcerated Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Incarcerated Entertainment, LLC v. CNBC LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: David Eberhart
Represented By: Bradley Ross Aronstam
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Represented By: Cara L. Gagliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hulu, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurtis Productions, Ltd
Represented By: Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNBC LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Incarcerated Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Richard Charles Weinblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?