CG Technology Development, LLC v. William Hill U.S. Holdco, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: CG Technology Development, LLC
Defendant: William Hill PLC, Brandywine Bookmaking LLC and William Hill U.S. Holdco, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00533
Filed: April 10, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C. Schoell on behalf of Brandywine Bookmaking LLC, William Hill PLC, William Hill U.S. Holdco, Inc. (Schoell, Joseph)
May 31, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thatcher A. Rahmeier on behalf of Brandywine Bookmaking LLC, William Hill PLC, William Hill U.S. Holdco, Inc. (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
May 30, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to June 12, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Brandywine Bookmaking LLC answer due 6/12/2018; William Hill PLC answer due 6/12/2018; William Hill U.S. Holdco, Inc. answer due 6/12/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/30/2018. (nms)
May 29, 2018 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to June 12, 2018 - filed by Brandywine Bookmaking LLC, William Hill PLC, William Hill U.S. Holdco, Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
May 10, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Scott A. Allen,Abdul Ghani S. Hamadi for CG Technology Development, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
May 9, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert F. Shaffer, Abdul Ghani S. Hamadi, and Scott A. Allen, filed by CG Technology Development, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/9/2018. (nms)
May 9, 2018 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert F. Shaffer, Abdul Ghani S. Hamadi, and Scott A. Allen - filed by CG Technology Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certifications)(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 5/9/2018 (nms).
May 3, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #9 Unopposed MOTION Extending the Time to Respond to the Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Brandywine Bookmaking LLC answer due 6/4/2018; William Hill PLC answer due 6/4/2018; William Hill U.S. Holdco, Inc. answer due 6/4/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/2/2018. (nms)
May 2, 2018 9 Unopposed MOTION Extending the Time to Respond to the Complaint File Answer - filed by CG Technology Development, LLC. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 5/2/2018 (nms).
April 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 13, 2018 8 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re CG Technology Development, LLC: Entry of appearance of attorney Daniel M. Silver. Attorney C. Barr Flinn, Adam W. Poff and Pilar G. Kraman of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP terminated. (Silver, Daniel)
April 12, 2018 7 DECLARATION of Mailing, by CG Technology Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Poff, Adam) Modified on 4/19/2018 (nms).
April 12, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CG Technology Development, LLC. Brandywine Bookmaking LLC served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018. (Poff, Adam)
April 12, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CG Technology Development, LLC. William Hill U.S. Holdco, Inc. served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018. (Poff, Adam)
April 11, 2018 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to William Hill PLC. (fms)
April 10, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Brandywine Bookmaking LLC on 4/10/2018; William Hill PLC on 4/10/2018; William Hill U.S. Holdco, Inc. on 4/10/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (fms)
April 10, 2018 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent CG Technology, L.P. for CG Technology Development, LLC filed by CG Technology Development, LLC. (fms)
April 10, 2018 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,240,098 B2; US 9,269,224 B2; US 9,076,305 B2. (fms)
April 10, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (fms)
April 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringment filed with Jury Demand against Brandywine Bookmaking LLC, William Hill PLC, William Hill U.S. Holdco, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2358705.) - filed by CG Technology Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(fms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CG Technology Development, LLC v. William Hill U.S. Holdco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hill PLC
Represented By: Thatcher A. Rahmeier
Represented By: Joseph C. Schoell
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandywine Bookmaking LLC
Represented By: Thatcher A. Rahmeier
Represented By: Joseph C. Schoell
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hill U.S. Holdco, Inc.
Represented By: Thatcher A. Rahmeier
Represented By: Joseph C. Schoell
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CG Technology Development, LLC
Represented By: Comrie Barr Flinn
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Abdul Ghani S. Hamadi
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Scott A. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?