Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Frontier Communications Corporation

Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Defendant: Frontier Communications Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00536
Filed: April 10, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to June 15, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Frontier Communications Corporation answer due 6/15/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/14/2018. (nms)
May 14, 2018 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to June 15, 2018 - filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Rovner, Philip)
May 9, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Omar F. Amin,Brian M. Buroker for Frontier Communications Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
May 4, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Blair A. Silver for Frontier Communications Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Blair A. Silver, Brian M. Buroker and Omar F. Amin, filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/1/2018. (nms)
May 1, 2018 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Blair A. Silver, Brian M. Buroker and Omar F. Amin - filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Rovner, Philip)
May 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney B. Trent Webb,Aaron E Hankel,Ryan D. Dykal,Robert H. Reckers for Sprint Communications Company L.P. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00363-RGA, 1:18-cv-00361-RGA, 1:18-cv-00362-RGA, 1:18-cv-00536-RGA(crb)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert H. Reckers of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP, filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., and #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Trent Webb, Aaron E. Hankel, and Ryan D. Dykal of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP, filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/30/2018. (nms)
April 27, 2018 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert H. Reckers of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Katona, Shanti)
April 27, 2018 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Trent Webb, Aaron E. Hankel, and Ryan D. Dykal of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications)(Katona, Shanti)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Complaint to June 4, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Frontier Communications Corporation answer due 6/4/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/19/2018. (nms)
April 19, 2018 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to June 4, 2018 - filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Rovner, Philip)
April 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 13, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Frontier Communications Corporation served on 4/12/2018, answer due 5/3/2018. (Katona, Shanti) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/13/2018) (ceg).
April 13, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, D.I. 5 Summons Returned Executed was removed from the docket and will be refiled. (ceg)
April 11, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Frontier Communications Corporation on 4/11/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (fms)
April 10, 2018 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sprint Communications, Inc., Corporate Parent Sprint Corporation, Corporate Parent SoftBank Corp. for Sprint Communications Company L.P. filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (fms)
April 10, 2018 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s): see attached. (fms)
April 10, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (fms)
April 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Frontier Communications Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2358913.) - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(fms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Frontier Communications Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Communications Corporation
Represented By: Blair A. Silver
Represented By: Brian M. Buroker
Represented By: Philip A. Rovner
Represented By: Omar F. Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Represented By: Shanti Mulpuru Katona
Represented By: Robert H. Reckers
Represented By: Aaron E Hankel
Represented By: B. Trent Webb
Represented By: Ryan D. Dykal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?