Versata, Inc. v. Magnitude Software, Inc.

Plaintiff: Versata, Inc.
Defendant: Magnitude Software, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00731
Filed: May 15, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2018 9 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,523,172 B1. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Dismissal)(nms)
June 27, 2018 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #8 . (nms)
June 27, 2018 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Versata, Inc. as to the claims and causes of action asserted in this case (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 15, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven Pepe for Magnitude Software, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
June 14, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew R. Shapiro for Magnitude Software, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
June 12, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Pepe, Attorney Matthew R. Shapiro and Attorney James R. Batchelder, filed by Magnitude Software, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/12/2018. (nms)
June 11, 2018 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Pepe, Attorney Matthew R. Shapiro and Attorney James R. Batchelder - filed by Magnitude Software, Inc.. (Gaza, Anne)
June 6, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise plead in response to Complaint to July 13, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Magnitude Software, Inc. answer due 7/13/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/6/2018. (nms)
June 6, 2018 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise plead in response to Complaint to July 13, 2018 - filed by Magnitude Software, Inc.. (Gaza, Anne) Modified on 6/6/2018 (nms).
May 23, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
May 17, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Versata, Inc.. Magnitude Software, Inc. served on 5/17/2018, answer due 6/7/2018. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 16, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Versata Enterprises, Inc., added as Corporate Parent for Plaintiff Versata, Inc. (rwc)
May 15, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Magnitude Software, Inc. on 5/15/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar)
May 15, 2018 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Trilogy, Inc. for Versata, Inc. filed by Versata, Inc.. (sar)
May 15, 2018 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,523,172 B1. (sar)
May 15, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
May 15, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Magnitude Software, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2382197.) - filed by Versata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Versata, Inc. v. Magnitude Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnitude Software, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Pepe
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Matthew R. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Versata, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?