FO2GO LLC v. SpiderOak, Inc.

Plaintiff: FO2GO LLC
Defendant: SpiderOak, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00865
Filed: June 9, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint for Patent Infringement to August 17, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: SpiderOak, Inc. answer due 8/17/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/31/2018. (nms)
July 31, 2018 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint for Patent Infringement to August 17, 2018 - filed by SpiderOak, Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
July 10, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Wasif Qureshi for SpiderOak, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
July 9, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Bennett for FO2GO LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wasif H. Qureshi, filed by SpiderOak, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/29/2018. (nms)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint for Patent Infringement to August 2, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: SpiderOak, Inc. answer due 8/2/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/29/2018. (nms)
June 29, 2018 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wasif H. Qureshi - filed by SpiderOak, Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
June 29, 2018 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint for Patent Infringement to August 2, 2018 - filed by SpiderOak, Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett, filed by FO2GO LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2018. (nms)
June 25, 2018 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by FO2GO LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 12, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FO2GO LLC. SpiderOak, Inc. served on 6/12/2018, answer due 7/3/2018. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 11, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to SpiderOak, Inc. on 6/11/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg)
June 9, 2018 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by FO2GO LLC. (ceg)
June 9, 2018 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,935,998 B2. (ceg)
June 9, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
June 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against SpiderOak, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2398407.) - filed by FO2GO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FO2GO LLC v. SpiderOak, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpiderOak, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Represented By: Wasif Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FO2GO LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: David R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?