Byteborne Technologies Ltd. v. eBay Inc.

Plaintiff: Byteborne Technologies Ltd.
Defendant: eBay Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00931
Filed: June 24, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
0 Judge: Vacant Judgeship (2017)
1 Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: eBay Inc. answer due 9/17/2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/14/2018. (lih)
August 9, 2018 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to September 17, 2018 - filed by Byteborne Technologies Ltd.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: eBay Inc. answer due 8/17/2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/18/2018. (lih)
July 13, 2018 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer the Complaint to August 17, 2018 - filed by Byteborne Technologies Ltd.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
July 5, 2018 **NOTE: If the parties jointly consent to Magistrate Judge Fallons jurisdiction to conduct all proceedings in this case, then the Pretrial Conference and Trial will be presided over by Judge Fallon consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636. Otherwise, in accordance with the District Court's procedures for "Assignment of Cases to Visiting Judges" (issued May 26, 2017 and available on the District Court's website), upon the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., a motion to dismiss, a motion for judgment on the pleadings, a motion for summary judgment, or initiation of the claim construction process in a patent case), VAC cases will be reassigned to a visiting District Judge, and any further dates in the Scheduling Order, including the Pretrial Conference and Trial dates, may be adjusted dependent on the availability of the visiting District Judge.** (lih)
June 27, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) (rjb)
June 27, 2018 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 26, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Byteborne Technologies Ltd.. eBay Inc. served on 6/26/2018, answer due 7/17/2018. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 25, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to eBay Inc. on 6/25/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg)
June 24, 2018 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Byteborne Technologies Ltd. (ceg)
June 24, 2018 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,660,964 B2. (ceg)
June 24, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
June 24, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against eBay Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2407172.) - filed by Byteborne Technologies Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byteborne Technologies Ltd. v. eBay Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byteborne Technologies Ltd.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Richard Charles Weinblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?