Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Accord Healthcare Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Defendant: Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Biocon Limited, Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., HEC Pharm Group, HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Accord Healthcare Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Ezra Ventures, LLC, S&B Pharma, Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited, Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Nostrum Laboratories Inc., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., First Time US Generics LLC, Biocon Pharma, Inc., HEC Pharm USA Inc., Strides Global Pharma Private Limited, Cadila Healthcare Limited, Hetero Labs Limited, Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Hetero USA Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC, MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Bionpharma Inc., Strides Pharma, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Intas Pharmaceuticals Limited, Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc., Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE and Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01043
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ORAL ORDER: In light of the stay of this case as to Mylan, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RENEW upon the lifting of the stay: D.I. 522, 533. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/6/19. (ntl)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #635 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Staying the Case as to Dr. Reddy's. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/5/19. (ntl)
September 4, 2019 Filing 635 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Staying the Case as to Dr. Reddy's by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
September 4, 2019 Filing 634 Redaction of #308 Transcript. Telephone Conference held on December 21, 2018 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 633 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Forrest M. McClellen as co-counsel.. (Poff, Adam)
August 9, 2019 Filing 632 STATEMENT re #629 Order Unsecured Bond for Preliminary Injunction Order by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 631 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Novartiss Amended Responses to Defendants First Set of Joint Requests for Admission (Nos. 1, 3-7) filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 630 REDACTED VERSION of #627 Exhibit to a Document by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re #357 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #583 Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/1/19. (ntl)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER re #626 MOTION to Redact #580 Transcript, #581 Transcript filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/1/19. (ntl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 627 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #626 MOTION to Redact #580 Transcript,, #581 Transcript A by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 626 MOTION to Redact #580 Transcript,, #581 Transcript - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, Daniel)
July 26, 2019 Filing 625 PROPOSED ORDER on Preliminary Injunction by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters (D.I. 610, 612), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' request that Novartis produce additional witness(es) to provide Rule 30(b)(6) testimony is GRANTED with respect to Topics 1, 6, and 14. These requests are adequately tailored to be proportional to the needs of the case, plainly seek relevant evidence (with respect to, for example, validity of the patent-in-suit), and Novartis' objections with respect to these topics are unpersuasive. However, Defendants' requests for testimony on the other disputed topics are DENIED, for reasons including that these topics are overbroad (e.g., Topics 2, 13), not proportional to the needs of the case (e.g., Topics 7-9, given that the inventors themselves have been deposed, one no longer works for Novartis, and the other lives outside the U.S.; Topics 10-12, given that Defendants may be able to discern the answers in documents produced and have deposed individuals personally knowledgeable about these topics), and/or more properly the subject of expert testimony (Topic 15), particularly given the stage of this litigation. The Court further orders that, prior to any additional 30(b)(6) deposition(s), the parties meet and confer and make reasonable efforts to limit or eliminate the need for such deposition(s) by determining if any testimony already provided pursuant to Rule 30(b)(1) should be designated as binding, corporate testimony under Rule 30(b)(6). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/25/19. (ntl)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #618 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/24/19. (ntl)
July 23, 2019 Filing 623 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Declaration of Dr. Radojka Savic on Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 9,187,405 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
July 23, 2019 Filing 622 REDACTED VERSION of #613 Declaration by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 621 REDACTED VERSION of #612 Letter by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 620 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Opening Expert Report of Dr. Paul M. Hoffman On Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 9,187,405 and Opening Expert Report of Dr. Robert Fujinami on EAE and U.S. Patent No. 9,187,405 filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 619 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) First Expert Report of Fred D. Lublin, M.D., and (2) Expert Report of Christopher A. Vellturo, Ph.D. filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 618 STIPULATION Extend Deadline for Parties to Submit Redaction Requests Regarding the June 21, 2019 Preliminary Injunction Hearing to July 29, 2019 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 617 REDACTED VERSION of #610 Letter, by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-6)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #616 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Deadline for the Parties to Submit Redaction Request regarding June 21, 2019 Preliminary Injunction Hearing to July 22, 2019 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/17/19. (ntl)
July 15, 2019 Filing 616 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Deadline for the Parties to Submit Redaction Request regarding June 21, 2019 Preliminary Injunction Hearing to July 22, 2019 - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORAL ORDER: For the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion (D.I. 575 at 6-7 n.4), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Mylan's motion to seal (D.I. 333) is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/15/19. (ntl)
July 15, 2019 Filing 614 REDACTED VERSION of #608 Stipulation by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 613 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #612 Letter of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 612 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Responsive Letter - re #610 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #608 Stipulation and Order Staying Claims against Mylan filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/12/19. (ntl)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #607 Stipulation and Order Staying the Case as to Aurobindo filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/12/19. (ntl)
July 10, 2019 Filing 611 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver regarding Discovery Issues - re 606 Order,,. (Joyce, Alexandra)
July 10, 2019 Filing 610 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Defendants regarding Discovery Dispute - re 606 Order,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mieke K. Malmberg, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhbit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Weinblatt, Richard)
July 10, 2019 Filing 609 REDACTED VERSION of #604 Stipulation by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 608 [SEALED] STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying Claims Against Mylan by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 607 [SEALED] STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying the Case as to Aurobindo by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 7/9/2019 (ntl).
July 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alan H. Pollack,Louis H. Weinstein for Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' joint status report (D.I. 588), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (i) the parties shall submit an agreed-upon form of order for the Court to sign, granting the preliminary injunction motion and imposing an obligation that Plaintiff post a $50 million unsecured bond; and (ii) the parties shall file letters relating to their pending disputes regarding 30(b)(6) deposition notices on July 10 and 12 (the Court will determine if it needs a discovery teleconference after reviewing the letters). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/9/19. (ntl)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #604 Stipulation and Order Staying the Case as to Torrent filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/8/19. (ntl)
July 3, 2019 Filing 605 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission [Nos. 1-9] filed by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
July 3, 2019 Filing 604 [SEALED] STIPULATION Staying the Case as to Torrent by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 603 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Privilege Log filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
July 2, 2019 Filing 602 REDACTED VERSION of #286 Letter by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 601 REDACTED VERSION of #225 Letter by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 600 REDACTED VERSION of #220 Letter, by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 599 REDACTED VERSION of #163 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 598 REDACTED VERSION of #333 MOTION to Seal Limited Sections of Transcript by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ewing, Alexandra)
July 2, 2019 Filing 597 REDACTED VERSION of #296 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Regarding Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Response to Novartis Concerning Redaction Dispute by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
July 2, 2019 Filing 596 REDACTED VERSION of #224 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding response to Novartis's letter of October 25, 2018 by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
July 2, 2019 Filing 595 REDACTED VERSION of #219 Letter, to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding supplemental letter brief by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
July 2, 2019 Filing 594 REDACTED VERSION of #207 Declaration of Brandon M. White by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Ewing, Alexandra)
July 2, 2019 Filing 593 REDACTED VERSION of #206 Reply Brief in Support of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
July 2, 2019 Filing 592 REDACTED VERSION of #120 Declaration of Keith Meckstroth by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ewing, Alexandra)
July 2, 2019 Filing 591 REDACTED VERSION of #119 Opening Brief in Support Of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss For Improper Venue by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #584 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file public copies of documents pursuant to Court's Memorandum Order (DI. 575) to July 2, 2019 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; #582 CONSENT JUDGMENT and Order of Injunction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/1/19. (ntl)
July 1, 2019 Filing 590 REDACTED VERSION of #582 Proposed Consent Judgment by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 589 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.'s Privilege Log filed by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
June 28, 2019 Filing 588 Joint STATUS REPORT by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 587 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Admission Nos. 1-9 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 27, 2019 Filing 586 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limited's Objections and Responses to Novartis's First Set of Requests for Admission filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 585 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission to Hetero (Nos. 1-9) filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 25, 2019 Filing 584 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file public copies of documents pursuant to Court's Memorandum Order (DI. 575) to July 2, 2019 - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 583 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #357 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/24/19. (ntl)
June 24, 2019 Filing 582 [SEALED] PROPOSED CONSENT JUDGMENT and Order of Injunction by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 581 [SEALED] Official Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on June 21, 2019 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. (bpg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 580 Official Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on June 21, 2019 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone number (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2019. (bpg)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #577 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Various Deadlines to Various Dates filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Cadila Healthcare Limited. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/20/19. (ntl)
June 21, 2019 Filing 579 [SEALED] NOTICE of Lodging of Deposition Transcript of Cristian Schnell by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 20, 2019 Filing 578 REDACTED VERSION of #574 Notice (Other) by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 577 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Various Deadlines to Various Dates - filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Haney, Megan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 576 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Rutter on behalf of Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. (Rutter, Jennifer)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 575 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #118 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is GRANTED and Plaintiff's request for discovery and to file an amended complaint is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/17/19. (ntl)
June 14, 2019 Filing 574 [SEALED] NOTICE of Lodging by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #567 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/13/19. (ntl)
June 12, 2019 Filing 573 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Defendants' Allocation For the Preliminary Injunction Hearing - re 332 Order,,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,,. (Phillips, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 572 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding June 21, 2019 Preliminary Injunction Hearing - re 332 Order,,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Regarding June 21, 2019 Preliminary Injunction)(Silver, Daniel)
June 12, 2019 Filing 571 REPLY BRIEF re #522 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
June 12, 2019 Filing 570 REDACTED VERSION of #565 Declaration by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
June 12, 2019 Filing 569 REDACTED VERSION of #564 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
June 12, 2019 Filing 568 REDACTED VERSION of #562 Proposed Consent Judgment by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #562 [SEALED] PROPOSED CONSENT JUDGMENT and Order of Injunction filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/11/19. (ntl)
June 11, 2019 Filing 567 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend the Time the deadline for the parties to submit letters to the Court regarding the June 21, 2019 preliminary injunction hearing re 332 Order,,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,, to June 12, 2019 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 566 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Privilege Log filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
June 5, 2019 Filing 565 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #564 Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of Robert W. Trenchard in Support by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4, #2 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 564 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #522 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER re #561 Memorandum Opinion regarding claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/5/19. (ntl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 562 [SEALED] PROPOSED CONSENT JUDGMENT and Order of Injunction by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 561 MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/5/19. (ntl)
June 5, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael R. Laing, Maria A. Stubbings for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 4, 2019 Filing 560 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s: (1) Fourth Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants [Nos. 1-7]; (2) Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Common Interrogatories to all Defendants [No. 8]; and (3) Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
June 4, 2019 Filing 559 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Accord Healthcare, Inc.'s Privilege Log filed by Accord Healthcare Inc..(Ormerod, Eve)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #532 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maria A. Stubbings filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/4/19. (ntl)
June 4, 2019 Filing 558 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Amended Privilege Log filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #548 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Deadline for Plaintiff to File its Opposition to Mylans Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) to June 5, 2019 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/3/19. (ntl)
June 3, 2019 Filing 557 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Novartiss Responses to Defendants First Set of Joint Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-22) filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Filing 556 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Discovery Teleconference. (Silver, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Filing 555 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limited's Privilege Log filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #551 Stipulation and Order filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/3/19. (ntl)
June 3, 2019 Filing 554 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Privilege Log filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
May 31, 2019 Filing 553 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Privilege Log filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
May 31, 2019 Filing 552 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's Privilege Log filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 30, 2019 Filing 551 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
May 30, 2019 Filing 550 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Responsive Letter - re #546 Letter,. (Silver, Daniel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 549 REPLY to Response to Motion re #513 MOTION Novartis's Motion for Submission of Supplemental Paper in Support of Its Claim Construction Answering Brief filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 548 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Deadline for Plaintiff to File its Opposition to Mylans Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) to June 5, 2019 - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 547 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendants filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 546 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Plaintiff Novartis Pharm. Corp.'s Motion to Strike Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss - re #534 Letter, #535 Declaration, #533 Emergency MOTION to Strike #523 Opening Brief in Support, #522 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Cottrell, Frederick)
May 28, 2019 Filing 545 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Peter Waibel on June 11, 2019 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 28, 2019 Filing 544 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Peter Waibel on June 11, 2019 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 28, 2019 Filing 543 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Christopher Vellturo on June 13, 2019 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 28, 2019 Filing 542 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Peter Calabresi on June 7, 2019 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 28, 2019 Filing 541 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Arvashni Seeripat on May 30, 2019 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 28, 2019 Filing 540 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Arvashni Seeripat on May 30, 2019 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 28, 2019 Filing 539 REDACTED VERSION of #524 Declaration, of Jason Rawnsley by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ewing, Alexandra)
May 24, 2019 Filing 538 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Radhika Dasari on June 11, 2019 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
May 24, 2019 Filing 537 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #513 MOTION Novartis's Motion for Submission of Supplemental Paper in Support of Its Claim Construction Answering Brief filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/31/2019. (Cottrell, Frederick)
May 24, 2019 Filing 536 REDACTED VERSION of #524 Declaration, of Jason J. Rawnsley by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ewing, Alexandra)
May 23, 2019 Filing 535 DECLARATION re #534 Letter, #533 Emergency MOTION to Strike #523 Opening Brief in Support, #522 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Declaration of Daniel M. Silver, Esq. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
May 23, 2019 Filing 534 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esquire regarding Novartis's Emergency Motion to Stike - re #533 Emergency MOTION to Strike #523 Opening Brief in Support, #522 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Silver, Daniel)
May 23, 2019 Filing 533 Emergency MOTION to Strike #523 Opening Brief in Support, #522 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Rule 7.1.1 Certification)(Silver, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 532 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maria A. Stubbings - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
May 22, 2019 Filing 531 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Vijay Raghavan on June 4, 2019 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 530 REDACTED VERSION of #518 Declaration, of Robert Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 529 REDACTED VERSION of #517 Declaration of Christopher Vellturo by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 528 REDACTED VERSION of #516 Declaration of Peter Waibel by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 527 REDACTED VERSION of #515 Declaration of Fred Lublin by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 526 REDACTED VERSION of #514 Reply Brief by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
May 20, 2019 Filing 525 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #522 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Cottrell, Frederick)
May 20, 2019 Filing 524 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #523 Opening Brief in Support, #522 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Declaration of Jason J. Rawnsley by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cottrell, Frederick)
May 20, 2019 Filing 523 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #522 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/3/2019. (Cottrell, Frederick)
May 20, 2019 Filing 522 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cottrell, Frederick)
May 20, 2019 Filing 521 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Privilege Log filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 520 REDACTED VERSION of #513 MOTION Novartis's Motion for Submission of Supplemental Paper in Support of Its Claim Construction Answering Brief by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
May 15, 2019 Filing 519 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 14, 2019 Filing 518 [SEALED] Second DECLARATION re #514 Reply Brief of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 240-263, #2 Exhibit 264 Pt.1, #3 Exhibit 264 Pt. 2, #4 Exhibit 265-266, #5 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
May 14, 2019 Filing 517 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #514 Reply Brief of Christopher A. Vellturo, Ph.D. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
May 14, 2019 Filing 516 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #514 Reply Brief of Peter Waibel by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
May 14, 2019 Filing 515 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #514 Reply Brief of Fred D. Lublin, M.D. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
May 14, 2019 Filing 514 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #357 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #511 Stipulation and Order Staying Claims against Prinston filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/14/19. (ntl)
May 10, 2019 Filing 513 [SEALED] MOTION Novartis's Motion for Submission of Supplemental Paper in Support of Its Claim Construction Answering Brief - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Novartis Supplemental Paper on POSA Definition, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
May 10, 2019 Filing 512 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alpesh Pathak on May 30, 2019 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
May 9, 2019 Filing 511 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Staying Claims Against Prinston by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Joyce, Alexandra)
May 7, 2019 Filing 510 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding Requesting a Discovery Dispute Conference. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 6, 2019 Filing 509 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Request for a Discovery Conference regarding discovery dispute related to June 21, 2019 preliminary injunction hearing. (Silver, Daniel)
May 3, 2019 Filing 508 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Joint Requests for Admission filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
May 3, 2019 Filing 507 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jason J. Rawnsley (#5379) regarding Mylans request for discovery dispute teleconference. (Rawnsley, Jason)
May 2, 2019 Filing 506 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Joyce, Alexandra)
May 2, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected transcript added to D.I. 498 per request of court reporter. (ntl)
May 1, 2019 Filing 505 REDACTED VERSION of #496 Declaration by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibit A, #2 Redacted Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 1, 2019 Filing 504 REDACTED VERSION of #495 Letter by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 29, 2019 Filing 503 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Schmouder on May 17, 2019 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 29, 2019 Filing 502 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Peter Hiestand on May 10, 2019 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 29, 2019 Filing 501 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Christian Schnell on May 24, 2019 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 29, 2019 Filing 500 REDACTED VERSION of #490 Declaration by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
April 29, 2019 Filing 499 REDACTED VERSION of #489 Letter by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 498 Official Transcript of Claim Construction Hearing held on April 23, 2019 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2019. (bpg)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters regarding a discovery dispute (D.I. 489, 495), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that HEC shall produce responsive, non-privileged documents in the possession of CANDA HEC-1 LLC ("CANDA HEC"), and supplement its responses to interrogatories with any information in the possession of CANDA HEC, no later than May 15, 2019. The Court finds that Novartis has met its burden to show that Defendant HEC has sufficient control (within the meaning of Rule 34) over the relevant and responsive discovery sought by Novartis, based on at least the following: HEC's rights under Section 11.09 of its agreement with CANDA HEC, CANDA HEC's responsibility for managing the instant litigation and for marketing HEC's proposed generic product (if it is launched), and CANDA HEC's right to share in proceeds that may be derived from HEC's proposed generic product. See Robert Bosch LLC v. Alberee Prod., Inc., 2017 WL 376270, at *3 (D. Del. Jan. 24, 2017) ("The Court's finding as to BLLC's control is based on, among other things, BLLC's ability to secure from BGmbH documents that BLLC appears to have viewed as helpful to BLLC's litigation position during this litigation [and that] BLLC and BGmbH are parties to a joint venture agreement [as well as the] close interactions between BLLC and BGmbH with respect to wiper blade products."). The Court is unpersuaded by HEC's contentions that this dispute constitutes an "improper and wasteful use of the Court's time and resources" or that Plaintiff's failure to seek information by means of a Rule 45 subpoena should cause the Court to make a different finding with respect to HEC's control. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the discovery teleconference scheduled for tomorrow is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/25/19. (ntl)
April 24, 2019 Filing 496 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #495 Letter of Steven J. Udick by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm Group, HEC Pharm USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 24, 2019 Filing 495 [SEALED] Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding Responsive Discovery Dispute Letter - re 486 Order Setting Teleconference,,,,. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 24, 2019 Filing 494 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ivan T. Hofmann on May 1, 2019 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
April 24, 2019 Filing 493 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paul M. Hoffman filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
April 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Markman Hearing held on 4/23/2019. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
April 23, 2019 Filing 492 REDACTED VERSION of #482 Statement by Accord Healthcare Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Cadila Healthcare Limited, Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 23, 2019 Filing 491 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's First Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to Aurobindo filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
April 22, 2019 Filing 490 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #489 Letter of Paul Torchia by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
April 22, 2019 Filing 489 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Discovery Dispute Letter - re 486 Order Setting Teleconference,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
April 22, 2019 Filing 488 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara M. Metzler on behalf of Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. (Metzler, Sara)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each side will be allocated 45 minutes for argument at the Markman Hearing scheduled for April 23, 2019. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/22/19. (ntl)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter (D.I. 382), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for April 26, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than April 22, 2019, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than April 24, 2019, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/18/19. (ntl)
April 16, 2019 Filing 485 DECLARATION re #484 Claim Construction Answering Brief (of Bryan D. Beel) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cottrell, Frederick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 484 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF by Defendants filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 483 [SEALED] STATEMENT / Novartis's Response to Defendants' Technology Tutorial by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
April 16, 2019 Filing 482 [SEALED] STATEMENT re #441 Letter DEFENDANTS COMMENTS REGARDING NOVARTIS TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 16, 2019 Filing 481 [SEALED] Second DECLARATION re #479 Claim Construction Answering Brief (Robert W. Trenchard) by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54, #2 Exhibit 55, #3 Exhibit 56, #4 Exhibit 57, #5 Exhibit 58, #6 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
April 16, 2019 Filing 480 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.'s Objections and Responses to Novartis' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
April 16, 2019 Filing 479 [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
April 16, 2019 Filing 478 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Markman Hearing. (Silver, Daniel)
April 16, 2019 Filing 477 REDACTED VERSION of #465 Exhibit to a Document Exhibits to Declaration of Bryan D. Beel (Volume 5 of 5) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 476 REDACTED VERSION of #464 Exhibit to a Document Exhibits to Declaration of Bryan D. Beel (Volume 4 of 5) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 475 REDACTED VERSION of #463 Exhibit to a Document Exhibits to Declaration of Bryan D. Beel (Volume 3 of 5) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 474 REDACTED VERSION of #462 Exhibit to a Document Exhibits to Declaration of Bryan D. Beel (Volume 2 of 5) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 473 REDACTED VERSION of #461 Declaration of Bryan D. Beel (Volume 1 of 5) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-25, #2 Exhibit 26-50)(Cottrell, Frederick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 472 REDACTED VERSION of #460 Declaration of Dr. Paul M. Hoffman on Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 9,187,405 by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 471 REDACTED VERSION of #459 Declaration of Ivan T. Hofmann by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 470 REDACTED VERSION of #458 Answering Brief in Opposition Defendants' Opposition to Novartis's Motion For Preliminary Injunction by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 469 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Christine Walton on April 18, 2019 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
April 15, 2019 Filing 468 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation - Alan H. Pollack, Louis H. Weinstein, and James P. Barabas by Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. (Ormerod, Eve)
April 11, 2019 Filing 467 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Shreeram Aradhye on April 18, 2019 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 11, 2019 Filing 466 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nicole Cornett on April 17, 2019 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 9, 2019 Filing 465 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #461 Declaration Exhibits to Declaration of Bryan D. Beel (Volume 5 of 5) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 96-104)(Cottrell, Frederick)
April 9, 2019 Filing 464 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #461 Declaration Exhibits to Declaration of Bryan D. Beel (Volume 4 of 5) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 76-95)(Cottrell, Frederick)
April 9, 2019 Filing 463 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #461 Declaration Exhibits to Declaration of Bryan D. Beel (Volume 3 of 5) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 68-75)(Cottrell, Frederick)
April 9, 2019 Filing 462 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #461 Declaration Exhibits to Declaration of Bryan D. Beel (Volume 2 of 5) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51-67)(Cottrell, Frederick)
April 9, 2019 Filing 461 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #458 Answering Brief in Opposition of Bryan D. Beel (Volume 1 of 5) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-25, #2 Exhibit 26-50)(Cottrell, Frederick)
April 9, 2019 Filing 460 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #458 Answering Brief in Opposition of Paul M. Hoffmann by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 9, 2019 Filing 459 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #458 Answering Brief in Opposition of Ivan T. Hofmann by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 9, 2019 Filing 458 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #357 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/16/2019. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 5, 2019 Filing 457 REDACTED VERSION of #455 Notice (Other) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
April 2, 2019 Filing 456 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Accord Healthcare, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Accord Healthcare Inc..(Ormerod, Eve)
March 29, 2019 Filing 455 [SEALED] NOTICE of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation on behalf of Defendants' by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ewing, Alexandra)
March 27, 2019 Filing 454 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vijay Nasare on April 9, 2019 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
March 21, 2019 Filing 453 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Discovery Conference Request - re #419 Letter. (Silver, Daniel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 452 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
March 20, 2019 Filing 451 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to Aurobindo filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
March 19, 2019 Filing 450 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kevin Kong on March 27, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. at the offices of Kirkland & Ellis LLP, 601 Lexington Avenue, New York, NY 10022-4611 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #444 Stipulation and Order Staying the Case as to Alkem Laboratories Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/15/19. (ntl)
March 19, 2019 Filing 449 REDACTED VERSION of #430 Declaration,, by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 6 Pt. 1, #3 Exhibit 6 Pt. 2, #4 Exhibit 7-9, #5 Exhibit 10 Pt. 1, #6 Exhibit 10 Pt. 2, #7 Exhibit 11-14, #8 Exhibit 15 Pt. 1, #9 Exhibit 15 Pt. 2, #10 Exhibit 16-19, #11 Exhibit 20, #12 Exhibit 21-27, #13 Exhibit 28-29, #14 Exhibit 30, #15 Exhibit 31-39, #16 Exhibit 40-41, #17 Exhibit 42-43, #18 Exhibit 44-51, #19 Exhibit 52-53)(Silver, Daniel)
March 19, 2019 Filing 448 REDACTED VERSION of #428 Declaration by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
March 19, 2019 Filing 447 REDACTED VERSION of #427 Declaration by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
March 19, 2019 Filing 446 REDACTED VERSION of #426 Claim Construction Opening Brief by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 445 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bradley Davis on March 21, 2019 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
March 14, 2019 Filing 444 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying the Case as to Defendant Alkem Laboratories, Ltd. by Alkem Laboratories Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
March 13, 2019 Filing 443 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding Transmitting Defendants' Technology Tutorial. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
March 13, 2019 Filing 442 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Technology Tutorial filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
March 13, 2019 Filing 441 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Plaintiffs' Technology Tutorial. (Silver, Daniel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 440 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Notice of Deposition Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
March 12, 2019 Filing 439 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s and Cadila Healthcare Limited's Objections and Responses to Novartis's Notice of Deposition Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
March 12, 2019 Filing 438 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Fred D. Lublin, M.D. on March 15, 2019 filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
March 12, 2019 Filing 437 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lawrence Steinman, M.D. on March 26, 2019 filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
March 12, 2019 Filing 436 NOTICE to Take Deposition of William J. Jusko, Ph.D. on March 22, 2019 filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
March 12, 2019 Filing 435 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Arvashni Seeripat on March 14, 2019 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
March 11, 2019 Filing 434 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Objections and Responses to Novartis' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
March 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James P. Barabas for Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #425 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James P. Barabas filed by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Accord Healthcare Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/11/19. (ntl)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #431 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Tutorials Describing the Technology and Matters in Issue to March 13, 2019 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/8/19. (ntl)
March 8, 2019 Filing 433 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
March 8, 2019 Filing 432 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs First Objections and Responses to Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-3); and (2) Novartiss Objections and Responses to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.s Document Requests 1-4 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
March 7, 2019 Filing 431 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Tutorials Describing the Technology and Matters in Issue to March 13, 2019 - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
March 7, 2019 Filing 430 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #426 Claim Construction Opening Brief of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 5, #2 Exhibit 6, Part 1, #3 Exhibit 6, Part 2, #4 Exhibits 7 - 9, #5 Exhibit 10, Part 1, #6 Exhibit 10, Part 2, #7 Exhibits 11 - 14, #8 Exhibit 15, Part 1, #9 Exhibit 15, Part 2, #10 Exhibits 16 - 19, #11 Exhibit 20, #12 Exhibits 21 - 27, #13 Exhibits 28 - 29, #14 Exhibit 30, #15 Exhibits 31 - 39, #16 Exhibits 40 - 41, #17 Exhibits 42 - 43, #18 Exhibits 44 - 51, #19 Exhibits 52 - 53, #20 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
March 7, 2019 Filing 429 [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF [Defendants'] filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
March 7, 2019 Filing 428 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #426 Claim Construction Opening Brief of Lawrence Steinman, M.D. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
March 7, 2019 Filing 427 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #426 Claim Construction Opening Brief of William J. Jusko, Ph.D. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
March 7, 2019 Filing 426 [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
March 6, 2019 Filing 425 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James P. Barabas - filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Ormerod, Eve)
March 6, 2019 Filing 424 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Eve H. Ormerod regarding Plaintiff's Request for Discovery Dispute Teleconference - re #419 Letter. (Ormerod, Eve)
March 6, 2019 Filing 423 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Response to Mylan's and Aurobindo's Letters - re #420 Letter, #421 Letter. (Silver, Daniel)
March 5, 2019 Filing 422 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Christopher A. Vellturo, Ph.D. on March 8, 2019 filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 421 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Kenneth L. Dorsney regarding Discovery Dispute - re #419 Letter. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
March 5, 2019 Filing 420 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Plaintiff's Request for Discovery Dispute Teleconference - re #419 Letter. (Cottrell, Frederick)
March 5, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jordan H. Bekier for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
March 5, 2019 Filing 419 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Requesting Discovery Dispute Conference. (Silver, Daniel)
March 4, 2019 Filing 418 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants [No. 8] filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
March 4, 2019 Filing 417 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants (No. 8) filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly)
March 4, 2019 Filing 416 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants [No. 8] filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
March 4, 2019 Filing 415 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Response to Plaintiff's Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
March 4, 2019 Filing 414 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's Responses to Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8) and Prinston's Responses to Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8) filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
March 4, 2019 Filing 413 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 412 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s and Actavis Elizabeth LLC's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants [No. 8] filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Keller, Karen)
March 4, 2019 Filing 411 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Accord Healthcare, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants [No. 8]; (2) Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants [No. 8]; and (3) Defendants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants [No. 8] filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
March 4, 2019 Filing 410 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alkem's Objections and Resposes to Plaintiff's Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8) filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #409 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael R. Laing filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #394 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Corbin filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/4/19. (ntl)
March 1, 2019 Filing 409 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael R. Laing - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
March 1, 2019 Filing 408 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Third Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
February 28, 2019 Filing 407 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's Document Production [HETERO.GILENYA-0063267-0070908] filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
February 28, 2019 Filing 406 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limited's Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 405 REDACTED VERSION of #363 Declaration of Christopher A. Vellturo, Ph.D. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
February 26, 2019 Filing 404 REDACTED VERSION of #371 Exhibit to a Document, #367 Exhibit to a Document, #369 Exhibit to a Document, #368 Exhibit to a Document, #370 Exhibit to a Document, Exhibits 140 - 239 of Declaration of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 144 - 146, #2 Exhibits 147 - 152, #3 Exhibits 153 - 160, #4 Exhibits 161 - 173, #5 Exhibits 174 - 239)(Silver, Daniel)
February 26, 2019 Filing 403 REDACTED VERSION of #366 Exhibit to a Document, #365 Exhibit to a Document, #367 Exhibit to a Document, Exhibits 57 - 139 to the Declaration of Rober W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 81 - 108, #2 EXhibits 109 - 115, #3 Exhibits 116 - 139)(Silver, Daniel)
February 26, 2019 Filing 402 REDACTED VERSION of #364 Declaration, of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 17, #2 Exhibits 18 - 25, #3 Exhibits 26 - 47, #4 Exhibits 48 - 56)(Silver, Daniel)
February 26, 2019 Filing 401 REDACTED VERSION of #362 Declaration of Arvashni Seeripat by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
February 26, 2019 Filing 400 REDACTED VERSION of #361 Declaration of William J. Jusko, Ph.D by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
February 26, 2019 Filing 399 REDACTED VERSION of #360 Declaration of Fred D. Lublin, M.D. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
February 26, 2019 Filing 398 REDACTED VERSION of #359 Declaration of Lawrence Steinman, M.D. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
February 26, 2019 Filing 397 REDACTED VERSION of #358 Opening Brief in Support of Novartis' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
February 26, 2019 Filing 396 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories [Nos. 1-7] filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
February 25, 2019 Filing 395 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's Third Amended Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
February 25, 2019 Filing 394 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Corbin - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Laura Corbin)(Silver, Daniel)
February 22, 2019 Filing 393 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd.'s Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories [Nos. 1-7] and Defendants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories [Nos. 1-7] filed by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #391 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jordan Bekier filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/22/19. (ntl)
February 21, 2019 Filing 392 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Identification of Invalidity References Regarding U.S. Patent No. 9,187,405 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
February 21, 2019 Filing 391 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jordan Bekier - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Jordan Bekier)(Silver, Daniel)
February 20, 2019 Filing 390 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Seshu Akula on March 13, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
February 20, 2019 Filing 389 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Anuj Srivastava on March 14, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
February 20, 2019 Filing 388 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Elizabeth Purcell on March 14, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
February 20, 2019 Filing 387 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Arunesh Varma on March 13, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
February 20, 2019 Filing 386 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Radhika Dasari on March 15, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
February 20, 2019 Filing 385 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Amit Ghare on March 12, 2019 at 9:30 am filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
February 20, 2019 Filing 384 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Mitchell on March 15, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
February 20, 2019 Filing 383 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alpesh Pathak on March 12, 2019 at 9:30 am filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
February 20, 2019 Filing 382 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Discovery Teleconference Request for Novartis and HEC. (Silver, Daniel)
February 20, 2019 Filing 381 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Hetero's Third Amended Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
February 19, 2019 Filing 380 NOTICE of Deposition Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) to Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 379 NOTICE of Deposition Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) to Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limited by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 378 NOTICE of Deposition Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) to Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 377 NOTICE of Deposition Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) to Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, and Hetero USA Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 376 NOTICE of Deposition Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) to HEC Pharm Co., Ltd and HEC Pharm USA Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 375 NOTICE of Deposition Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) to Dr. Reddy's Laboroatries, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 374 NOTICE of Deposition Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) to Aurobindo Pharma Limited and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 373 NOTICE of Deposition Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) to Alkem Laboratories, Ltd. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 372 NOTICE of Deposition Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) to Accord Healthcare Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 371 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #364 Declaration, Exhibit Nos. 236 - 239 of Declaration of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 237, #2 Exhibit No. 238, #3 Exhibit No. 239, #4 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 370 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #364 Declaration, Exhibit Nos. 212 - 235 to Declaration of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 216, #2 Exhibit 217 - 226, #3 Exhibit 227 - 229, #4 Exhibit 230 - 235, #5 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 369 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #364 Declaration, Exhibit No. 211 to Declaration of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 211 part 2, #2 Exhibit 211 part 3, #3 Exhibit 211 part 4)(Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 368 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #364 Declaration, Exhibits Nos 153 - 210 to Declaration of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhbiits 161 -173, #2 Exhibits 174 -202, #3 Exhibits 203 - 210)(Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 367 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #364 Declaration, Exhibits Nos 132 -152 to Declaration of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 134 - 139, #2 Exhibits 140 - 143, #3 Exhibits 144 - 146, #4 Exhibits 147 - 152)(Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 366 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #364 Declaration, Exhibits Nos 118 -131 to Declaration of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 123 -124, #2 Exhibits 125 - 128, #3 Exhibits 129 -130, #4 Exhibit 131)(Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 365 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #364 Declaration, Exhibits Nos 57 -117 to Declaration of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 81 - 108, #2 Exhibits 109 - 115, #3 Exhibit 116, #4 Exhibit 117, #5 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 364 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #357 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 -17, #2 Exhibits 18 -25, #3 Exhibits 26 - 47, #4 Exhibits 48 - 56, #5 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 363 [SEALED] DECLARATION Christopher A. Vellturo, Ph.D by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendices, #2 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 362 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #357 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Arvashni Seeripat by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 361 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #357 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of William J. Jusko, Ph.D by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 360 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #357 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Fred D. Lublin, M.D. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 359 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #357 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Lawrence Steinman, M.D. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 358 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #357 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/5/2019. (Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 357 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 356 REDACTED VERSION of #349 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Kenneth L. Dorsney regarding Hetero's Responsive Dispute Letter by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
February 15, 2019 Filing 355 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #353 Stipulation and Order Staying Claims against Bionpharma Inc., #351 Stipulation and Order Staying the Case as to Ezra Ventures, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/14/19. (ntl)
February 14, 2019 Filing 354 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Supplemental Consolidated Invalidity Contentions Regarding U.S. Patent No. 9,187,405 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
February 13, 2019 Filing 353 STIPULATION Staying Claims Against Bionpharma Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters and related materials (see, e.g., D.I. 347, 349), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (i) Plaintiff's request that Hetero be barred from launching at-risk pending final resolution of this matter is DENIED, as the requested relief is "extremely unwarranted" (as Hetero correctly states) and would not be a reasonable consequence for Hetero's failures with respect to document production; (ii) Hetero SHALL complete its full document production as soon as possible and no later than February 28; (iii) Plaintiffs request that Hetero pay Novartis' fees in having to bring its motion is DENIED, although Hetero should understand that if it repeats its failure to meet deadlines and repeats its failure to give Plaintiff advance notice then the Court will impose a reasonable sanction; and (iv) Hetero SHALL, no later than February 20, respond to Interrogatory No. 3 by identifying the "key people involved in the decision about whether and when to launch the ANDA product," as disclosure of these identities is consistent with the Court's prior ruling (see D.I. 308 at 38-39) - although Hetero need not "provide a complete narrative response" that discloses "specific launch plans, specific dates, or other information about the launch plans." IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the teleconference scheduled for today to discuss these disputes is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/13/19. (ntl)
February 12, 2019 Filing 351 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying the Case as to Ezra by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
February 11, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 349 placed under seal per request of counsel. (ntl)
February 8, 2019 Filing 350 [SEALED] CLAIM Construction Chart by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibits B - J, #3 Exhibits K - N, #4 Exhibits O - R)(Silver, Daniel)
February 8, 2019 Filing 349 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Kenneth L. Dorsney regarding Discovery Dispute - re #347 Letter. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 2/11/2019 (ntl).
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #344 Stipulation and Order Staying Claims against Glenmark filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/7/19. (ntl)
February 7, 2019 Filing 348 DECLARATION re #347 Letter of Paul Torchia by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Silver, Daniel)
February 7, 2019 Filing 347 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Discovery Dispute - re 343 Order Setting Teleconference,,,,. (Silver, Daniel)
February 6, 2019 Filing 346 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s: First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Nos. 1-3) and First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-4) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
February 6, 2019 Filing 345 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) and Third Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for Production (Nos. 1-30) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #339 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to Respond to Mylan's Motion to Seal Limited Sections of Transcript to through and including 14 days following the Court's ruling on the pending redaction dispute between Plaintiff and Mylan filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/6/19. (ntl)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #341 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Breckenridge to substantially complete its document production to February 15, 2019 filed by Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., #334 STIPULATION and Order Extending Discovery and Precluding Biopharma from Launching At Risk, #336 STIPULATION and Order Extending Discovery and Precluding Prinston from Launching At Risk. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/6/19. (ntl)
February 5, 2019 Filing 344 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying Claims Against Glenmark by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
February 5, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 344 has been deleted at the request of counsel and will be re-filed. (etg)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for February 13, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than February 7, 2019, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than February 8, 2019, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/5/19. (ntl)
February 4, 2019 Filing 342 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Nos. 14-19) filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
February 4, 2019 Filing 341 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Breckenridge to substantially complete its document production to February 15, 2019 - filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
February 4, 2019 Filing 340 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esquire regarding Scheduling of a Discovery Teleconference. (Silver, Daniel)
February 1, 2019 Filing 339 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to Respond to Mylan's Motion to Seal Limited Sections of Transcript to through and including 14 days following the Court's ruling on the pending redaction dispute between Plaintiff and Mylan - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
February 1, 2019 Filing 338 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 31, 2019 Filing 337 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
January 30, 2019 Filing 336 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Discovery and Precluding Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. from Launching at Risk by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
January 29, 2019 Filing 335 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants First Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-13) filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
January 28, 2019 Filing 334 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Biopharma to Substantially Complete its Document Production to February 15, 2019 - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
January 28, 2019 Filing 333 [SEALED] MOTION to Seal Limited Sections of Transcript - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ewing, Alexandra)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letter of January 17 (D.I. 324) and subsequent joint status report (D.I. 330), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) the parties' proposed schedule leading to a preliminary injunction motion hearing (D.I. 324 at 1-2) is ADOPTED; (2) the preliminary injunction hearing will be held on June 21 beginning at 9:00 a.m.; each side will be allocated three (3) hours for its presentation; in the unlikely event more time is necessary, the Court will work with the parties to extend the time of the hearing; (3) no later than June 11, each party participating in the preliminary injunction hearing shall submit a letter advising the Court of how it intends to use its three hours (or portion thereof), including specifically identifying which witness(es), if any, it will call to testify live; and (4) with respect to discovery, the Court appreciates the parties' update, suspects that the parties have not adequately met and conferred, and in any event directs the parties to use the Court's Discovery Matters Procedures should they seek any relief - if that occurs, the Court will be inclined to grant in its entirety the position of the party or parties who have conducted themselves most reasonably. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/28/19. (ntl)
January 28, 2019 Filing 331 REDACTED VERSION of #296 Letter by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
January 25, 2019 Filing 330 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Interim Status Report - re #216 Scheduling Order,,. (Silver, Daniel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 329 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Sarah K. Tsou as co-counsel.. (Hoeschen, Nathan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 328 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) and (2) Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for Production (Nos. 1-30) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
January 24, 2019 Filing 327 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stamatios Stamoulis (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 24, 2019 Filing 326 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Helathcare Limited's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 325 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Aurobindo's Supplemental Paragraph 3 Disclosures; (2) Aurobindo's Supplemental Responses to First Set of Common Interrogatories; and (3) Aurobindo's Supplemental Response to First Set of Common Requests for Production filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #320 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Discovery and Precluding Breckenridge from Launching at Risk; #321 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Deadline for the Parties to Submit a Proposal for the Length of Briefing and the Format of a Preliminary Injunction Hearing to Thursday, January 17, 2019 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/17/19. (ntl)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #318 Stipulation and Order Staying the Case as to Biocon. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/17/19. (ntl)
January 17, 2019 Filing 324 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Preliminary Injunction Briefing and Related Issues - re #216 Scheduling Order,,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Silver, Daniel)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #317 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Teva to Substantially Complete Document Production to February 5, 2019 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/15/19. (ntl)
January 15, 2019 Filing 323 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants HEC Pharm Co., Ltd. and HEC Pharm USA Inc.s Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories 1, 3-7, HEC Pharm Co., Ltd. and HEC Pharm USA Inc.s Fed. R. CIv. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Amended), and Defendants HEC Pharm Group and HEC Pharm USA, Inc.s Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things 1-30 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 15, 2019 Filing 322 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Discovery Disclosures Pursuant to the District of Delaware's Default Standard for Discovery filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
January 15, 2019 Filing 321 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Deadline for the Parties to Submit a Proposal for the Length of Briefing and the Format of a Preliminary Injunction Hearing to Thursday, January 17, 2019 - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
January 15, 2019 Filing 320 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Discovery and Precluding Breckenridge from Launching at Risk by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
January 15, 2019 Filing 319 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Third Supplemental Responses to First Set of Common Interrogatories and (2) Second Supplemental Responses to First Set of Common Requests for Production filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 15, 2019 Filing 318 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying the Case as to Biocon by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 317 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Teva to Substantially Complete Document Production to February 5, 2019 - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 316 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limited's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 315 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limited's Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 314 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Amended Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
January 11, 2019 Filing 313 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.'s Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
January 11, 2019 Filing 312 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Accord Healthcare, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things [Nos. 1-30] (No. 25); (2) Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things [Nos. 1-30] (No. 25); and (3) Defendants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things [Nos. 1-30] (No. 25) filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #309 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Discovery and Precluding Glenmark from Launching at Risk. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/10/19. (ntl)
January 10, 2019 Filing 311 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1). BIONPHARMAS SECOND AMENDED INITIAL PARAGRAPH 3 DISCLOSURES; (2). BIONPHARMAS SECOND AMENDED RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION (NOS. 1-30); (3). BIONPHARMAS SECOND AMENDED RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 1-7); (4) HETEROS SECOND AMENDED INITIAL PARAGRAPH 3 DISCLOSURES; (5) HETEROS SECOND AMENDED RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION (NOS. 1-30); (6) HETEROS SECOND AMENDED RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 1-7); (7) PRINSTONS SECOND AMENDED INITIAL PARAGRAPH 3 DISCLOSURES; (8) PRINSTONS SECOND AMENDED RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION (NOS. 1-30); AND (9). PRINSTONS SECOND AMENDED RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 1-7) filed by Bionpharma Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 10, 2019 Filing 310 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.'s Amended Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
January 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kimberly A. Beis for Biocon Limited and Biocon Pharma, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
January 9, 2019 Filing 309 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Discovery and Precluding Glenmark from Launching at Risk by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 Filing 308 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on December 21, 2018 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2019.(bpg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 307 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Accord Healthcare Inc.'s (1) Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 3 and 7); and (2) Amended Delaware Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Accord Healthcare Inc..(Ormerod, Eve)
January 4, 2019 Filing 306 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Nos. 14-19) filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
December 28, 2018 Filing 305 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendants' Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery; 2) Defendants' Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for Production (Nos. 7-16, 18, 20, 22-25); and 3) Defendants' Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1, 3-7) filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #302 Stipulation and Order Staying the Case as to Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc., Emcure Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/26/18. (ntl)
December 21, 2018 Filing 304 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Response to First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 21, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 12/21/2018. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
December 20, 2018 Filing 303 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Novartiss Objections and Responses to Defendants Third Joint Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Nos. 65-76) filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
December 19, 2018 Filing 302 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying the Case as to Heritage and Emcure by Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Haney, Megan)
December 18, 2018 Filing 301 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Eve H. Ormerod regarding Responsive Position with respect to Discovery Dispute - re 289 Order,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-11)(Ormerod, Eve)
December 18, 2018 Filing 300 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Accord Healthcare, Inc.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things [Nos. 1-30]; (2) Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things [Nos. 1-30]; and (3) Defendants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things [Nos. 1-30] filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
December 17, 2018 Filing 299 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Alkem's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for Production filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 14, 2018 Filing 298 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Zydus's Response to Plaintiff's December 12, 2018 Letter - re #287 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Phillips, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 297 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Kenneth L. Dorsney regarding Discovery Dispute - re #287 Letter. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 14, 2018 Filing 296 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Regarding Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Response to Novartis Concerning Redaction Dispute - re #286 Letter. (Cottrell, Frederick)
December 14, 2018 Filing 295 DECLARATION re #294 Letter -- executed by George J. Barry III -- by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 14, 2018 Filing 294 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Kenneth L. Dorsney regarding Aurobindo's responsive discovery dispute letter. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 13, 2018 Filing 293 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Consolidated Invalidity Contentions Regarding U.S. Patent No. 9,187,405 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
December 13, 2018 Filing 292 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Accord Healthcare Inc.'s Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Accord Healthcare Inc..(Ormerod, Eve)
December 13, 2018 Filing 291 DECLARATION re #290 Letter of Paul Torchia by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Silver, Daniel)
December 13, 2018 Filing 290 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Plaintiffs Dispute with Accord, Dr. Reddy's, and Torrent - re 289 Order,,,,. (Silver, Daniel)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter (D.I. 271), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for December 21, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than December 17, 2018, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than December 18, 2018, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/13/18. (ntl)
December 12, 2018 Filing 288 DECLARATION re #287 Letter of Paul Torchia by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-17)(Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2018 Filing 287 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Plaintiffs Disputes with Zydus, Aurobindo, Hetero, Bionpharma and Prinston. (Silver, Daniel)
December 12, 2018 Filing 286 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Plaintiffs Dispute with Mylan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B, #2 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 285 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories (1-3) filed by Ezra Ventures, LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
December 10, 2018 Filing 284 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories (1-3) filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
December 10, 2018 Filing 283 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. [Nos. 1-3] filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
December 10, 2018 Filing 282 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 1-3 filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly)
December 10, 2018 Filing 281 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Accord Healthcare, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3); (2) Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3); and (3) Defendants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
December 10, 2018 Filing 280 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Teva and Actavis (Nos. 1-3) filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Keller, Karen)
December 10, 2018 Filing 279 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) to Emcure Pharmaceuticals and Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Haney, Megan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 278 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Biocon Limited and Biocon Pharma, Inc.'s Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories 1-7; and (2) Defendants Biocon Limited and Biocon Pharma, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Biocon (1-3) filed by Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc..(Haney, Megan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 277 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (1-3) to Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limited filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 276 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Glenmark (Nos. 1- 3) filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited.(Poff, Adam)
December 10, 2018 Filing 275 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bionpharma, Hetero and Prinston's responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) filed by Bionpharma Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 10, 2018 Filing 274 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 10, 2018 Filing 273 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alkem's responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter (See D.I. 243, 265, 266, 267), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for December 21, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than December 12, 2018, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than December 14, 2018, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/10/18. (ntl)
December 10, 2018 Filing 271 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Request the Scheduling of a Discovery Teleconference. (Silver, Daniel)
December 6, 2018 Filing 270 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to All Defendants (Nos. 1-30) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
December 6, 2018 Filing 269 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants (Nos. 1-7) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
December 6, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bryan D. Beel for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #268 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bryan D. Beel filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/6/18. (ntl)
December 5, 2018 Filing 268 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bryan D. Beel - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
December 5, 2018 Filing 267 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Scheduling a Discovery Conference. (Silver, Daniel)
December 5, 2018 Filing 266 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Scheduling a Discovery Conference. (Silver, Daniel)
December 4, 2018 Filing 265 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Scheduling a Discovery Teleconference. (Silver, Daniel)
December 3, 2018 Filing 264 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants HEC Pharm Co., Ltd. and HEC Pharm USA Inc.s First Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things 1-30 and Defendants HEC Pharm Co., Ltd and HEC Pharm USA Inc.s First Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories 1-7 filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 30, 2018 Filing 263 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alkem's First Supplemental Responses to First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 29, 2018 Filing 262 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Duces Tecum served on Peter Arthur Calabresi, M.D. on November 26, 2018, filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Ormerod, Eve)
November 28, 2018 Filing 261 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) and Defendant Accord Healthcare Inc.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
November 26, 2018 Filing 260 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Novartiss Objections and Responses to Defendants Second Joint Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Nos. 60-64) filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
November 20, 2018 Filing 259 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Joint Requests for Production (Nos. 65-76) filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Bionpharma Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 20, 2018 Filing 258 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Peter Arthur Calabresi, M.D. filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Subpoena, #2 Exhibit A to Subpoena)(Ormerod, Eve)
November 20, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alan H. Pollack for Accord Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 257 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
November 19, 2018 Filing 256 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Bionpharma, Hetero and Prinston's Amended Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 7); and (2) Bionpharma, Hetero and Prinston's Amended Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for Production (Nos. 8-10, 18) filed by Bionpharma Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 255 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding Regarding Order on Discovery Dispute Request - re 239 Order,. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 16, 2018 Filing 254 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Bionpharma, Hetero and Prinston's Amended Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Bionpharma Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 253 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Request for Relief - re #244 Letter. (Silver, Daniel)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #249 Stipulation and Order to Stay Between Plaintiff and Sun. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/15/18. (ntl)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #250 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alan H. Pollack filed by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Accord Healthcare Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/15/18. (ntl)
November 14, 2018 Filing 252 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Ezra Ventures LLCs Amended Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to All Defendants and Defendant Ezra Ventures LLCs Amended Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants filed by Ezra Ventures, LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 14, 2018 Filing 251 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Novartiss Objections and Responses to Accord, DRL, and Torrents Document Requests Nos. 1-3 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
November 14, 2018 Filing 250 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alan H. Pollack - filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Ormerod, Eve)
November 14, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected documents added to D.I. 247 & 248 per request of counsel. (ntl)
November 14, 2018 Filing 249 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Stay Between Plaintiff and Sun by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
November 14, 2018 Filing 248 REDACTED VERSION of #247 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Kenneth L. Dorsney responding to Plaintiff's Novenber 13, 2018 letter regarding meet and confer with Alkem by Alkem Laboratories Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Main Document 248 replaced on 11/14/2018) (ntl).
November 14, 2018 Filing 247 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Kenneth L. Dorsney regarding response to Plaintiff's November 13, 2018 letter concerning meet and confer. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Main Document 247 replaced on 11/14/2018) (ntl).
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #237 Stipulation and Order to Stay Between Plaintiff and Apotex. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/8/18. (ntl)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #235 Stipulation of Dismissal -- Party MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Nostrum Laboratories Inc., Nostrum Laboratories Inc., Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC, MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Laboratories Private Limited terminated. Attorney David J. Austin and David L. Finger terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/8/18. (ntl)
November 13, 2018 Filing 246 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Emcure Pharmaceuticals and Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Supplemental Disclosures Pursuant to Delaware Default Standard for Discovery Paragraph 3 filed by Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Haney, Megan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 245 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
November 13, 2018 Filing 244 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Meet and Confer with Defedant Alkem Laboratories Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Silver, Daniel)
November 9, 2018 Filing 243 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Discovery Dispute Teleconference. (Silver, Daniel)
November 8, 2018 Filing 242 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Defendants Biocon Limited and Biocon Pharma Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc..(Haney, Megan)
November 8, 2018 Filing 241 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories (1-3) to Defendants filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
November 7, 2018 Filing 240 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Ezra Ventures LLC filed by Ezra Ventures, LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters (D.I. 234, 236), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and, no later than November 16, advise the Court by joint letter whether any party believes a ripe discovery dispute requires judicial resolution. Thereafter, the Court will determine whether to schedule a discovery dispute teleconference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/7/18. (ntl)
November 6, 2018 Filing 238 OBJECTIONS by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO STAY AND FOR JOINDER IN APOTEXS MOTION TO STAY BY THE SUN DEFENDANTS (D.I. 33 IN C.A. NO. 18-1040-LPS). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silver, Daniel)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #229 Stipulated Amendment to Protective Order Between Novartis and Glenmark re #217 Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/5/18. (ntl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 237 STIPULATION -- Stipulation and Proposed Order to Stay Between Plaintiff and Apotex by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
November 5, 2018 Filing 236 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Responsive Letter - re #234 Letter. (Silver, Daniel)
November 5, 2018 Filing 235 STIPULATION of Dismissal Against Defendants Nostrum Laboratories, Inc., Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC, MSN Laboratories Private Limited, and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
November 5, 2018 Filing 234 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding Requesting Discovery Dispute Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 2, 2018 Filing 233 REDACTED VERSION of #224 Letter by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
November 2, 2018 Filing 232 REDACTED VERSION of #219 Letter, by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Telephone Conference is set for 12/3/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/2/2018. (dlb)
November 2, 2018 Filing 230 REDACTED VERSION of #220 Letter, by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
November 1, 2018 Filing 229 STIPULATION Stipulated Amendment to Protective Order Between Novartis and Glenmark re #217 Protective Order by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
October 31, 2018 Filing 228 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Defendants HEC Pharm Co., Ltd and HEC Pharm USA Inc. filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
October 31, 2018 Filing 227 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Actavis Elizabeth LLC'S Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production (No. 1) filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC.(Hoeschen, Nathan)
October 31, 2018 Filing 226 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Preliminary Infringement Contentions for Defendants filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
October 26, 2018 Filing 225 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Responsive Letter - re #219 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
October 26, 2018 Filing 224 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding response to Novartis's letter of October 25, 2018 - re #220 Letter,. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 26, 2018 Filing 223 REDACTED VERSION of #207 Declaration by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Ewing, Alexandra)
October 26, 2018 Filing 222 REDACTED VERSION of #206 Reply Brief by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
October 26, 2018 Filing 221 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.'s Supplemental Initial Disclosures filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly)
October 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert F. Vroom for Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
October 25, 2018 Filing 220 [SEALED] Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver regarding Opposition to Motion to Dismiss on Venue Grounds by Mylan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - I, #2 Declaration of Richard Trenchard, #3 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
October 25, 2018 Filing 219 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding supplemental letter brief - re 209 Order,, #118 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue , #119 Opening Brief in Support. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 25, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak)
October 25, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Referral for ADR to Judge Thynge was made in error. (cak)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY, INCLUDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION("ESI"). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/25/2018. (etg)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/25/2018. (etg)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Fact Discovery completed by 6/4/2019. Status Report due by 1/25/2019. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 2/28/2019. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 4/2/2019. A Markman Hearing is set for 4/23/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/6/2020. A Pretrial Conference is set for 2/21/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Bench Trial is set for 3/2/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/25/2018. (etg)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' most recent submission relating to scheduling and the protective order (see C.A. No. 18-1038 D.I. 47), and considering the parties' earlier related submissions and the Court's discussion of the issues with the parties on October 16, the Court will today be docketing the scheduling order, protective order, and ESI order to govern these cases. The Court has exercised its discretion in the fashion it believes most reasonable to all involved, balancing important competing interests on each side. In particular, with respect to scheduling: the Court agrees with Novartis that there should be some time limit on Rule 30(b)(6) deposition hours but believes Novartis' proposed limit is too short; the Court agrees with Defendants' to allow lengthier depositions of inventors; and the Court agrees with Novartis to allow lengthier depositions of expert(s) who provide opinions on both infringement and validity. With respect to the protective order, the Court believes that good cause has been shown to preclude Plaintiffs' counsel who are in receipt of Defendants' protected information from participating in the drafting, crafting, or amending of any patent claims, and the Court believes its combination of provisions proposed by both sides has resulted in a mechanism for, when needed, the sharing and potential use of one Defendant's information against another Defendant, while providing adequate protections to all parties and not unduly risking burdening the Court. Ordered by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/25/2018. (etg)
October 23, 2018 Filing 214 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Rule 16 Teleconference. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Proposed Protective Order, #3 Proposed ESI Order)(Silver, Daniel)
October 23, 2018 Filing 213 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Set of Joint Requests for Production to Novartis (Nos. 60-64) filed by Bionpharma Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 23, 2018 Filing 212 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on October 16, 2018 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2019.(bpg)
October 23, 2018 Filing 211 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Supplemental Discovery Disclosures Pursuant to the District of Delaware's Default Standard for Discovery filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
October 22, 2018 Filing 210 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORAL ORDER: The briefing on Defendant's motion to dismiss for improper venue having been completed, and the Court having recently issued an opinion granting a similar motion in another case (see Bristol-Meyers Squibb Co. v. Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., No. 17-374 (D. Del. Oct. 18, 2018) ("BMS")), D.I. 382), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall provide supplemental letter briefs addressing the impact of the Court's BMS decision on the pending motion, according to the following schedule: (i) opening briefs not to exceed three pages each due on Thursday, October 25; and (ii) answering briefs not to exceed two pages each due on Friday, October 26. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/22/18. (ntl)
October 22, 2018 Filing 208 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas and Discovery Requests filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Mylan Specialty L.P., #2 Subpoena to Therese Guariano Fresconi)(Silver, Daniel)
October 22, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David J. Austin for MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Nostrum Laboratories Inc., Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
October 19, 2018 Filing 207 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #206 Reply Brief (Declaration of Brandon M. White) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Cottrell, Frederick)
October 19, 2018 Filing 206 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #118 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #204 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen P. Benson and Kimberly A. Beis filed by Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc., #202 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert F. Vroom filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/18/18. (ntl)
October 17, 2018 Filing 205 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-13) and (2) Novartis's Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Joint Requests for Production to Novartis (Nos. 1-59) filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
October 16, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery/Scheduling teleconference held on 10/16/2018 (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS (ntl)
October 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christie R.W. Matthaei for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
October 16, 2018 Filing 204 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen P. Benson and Kimberly A. Beis - filed by Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Stephen P. Benson, #2 Certification of Kimberly A. Beis)(Haney, Megan)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Discovery/Scheduling teleconference today will begin at 3:15 p.m. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/16/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS (ntl)
October 16, 2018 Filing 202 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert F. Vroom - filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #200 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J. Austin filed by Nostrum Laboratories Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited, Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC, MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/16/18. (ntl)
October 15, 2018 Filing 201 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Accord Healthcare, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things [Nos. 1-3] filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
October 15, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stephen R. Auten,Roshan Shrestha for Alkem Laboratories Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
October 15, 2018 Filing 200 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J. Austin - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Nostrum Laboratories Inc., Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David J. Austin)(Finger, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 199 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Opening Discovery Dispute Letter - re (38 in 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 196 in 1:18-cv-01043-LPS, 27 in 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 25 in 1:18-cv-01040-LPS) Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 4)(Phillips, John)
October 12, 2018 Filing 198 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Response to Defendants' October 11, 2016 Letter - re (39 in 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 197 in 1:18-cv-01043-LPS, 26 in 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 28 in 1:18-cv-01039-LPS) Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Silver, Daniel)
October 12, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles A. Weiss for Bionpharma Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
October 11, 2018 Filing 197 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Defendants' Opening Dispute Letter. (Phillips, John)
October 11, 2018 Filing 196 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Disputes About the Proposed Scheduling Order and Proposed ESI and Protective Orders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Silver, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 195 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Biocon Limited and Biocon Pharma, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories 1-7; and (2) Defendants Biocon Limited and Biocon Pharma, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things 1-30 filed by Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc..(Haney, Megan)
October 11, 2018 Filing 194 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Response to Novartis' letter regarding Opposition to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue - re #191 Letter. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #189 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles A. Weiss filed by Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Bionpharma Inc., Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/11/2018. (etg)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #188 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christie R.W. Matthaei filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/11/2018. (etg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Ewing on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ewing, Alexandra)
October 10, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Shannon M. Bloodworth for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Teleconference set for 10/16/18 at 02:00 PM is RESCHEDULED for 10/16/2018 at 2:45 PM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Ordered by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/10/2018. (etg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 191 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Novartis Opposition to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue. (Silver, Daniel)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a discovery and scheduling teleconference is scheduled for October 16, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than October 11, 2018, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than October 12, 2018, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/9/2018. (etg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 189 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles A. Weiss - filed by Bionpharma Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 9, 2018 Filing 188 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christie R.W. Matthaei - filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited. (Poff, Adam)
October 8, 2018 Filing 187 ANSWER to #146 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim as to Defendants Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #180 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Mylan Pharmaceuticals to file reply brief in support of its Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue to October 19, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/5/18. (ntl)
October 5, 2018 Filing 186 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Emcure Pharmaceuticals Ltd. for Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Phillips, John)
October 5, 2018 Filing 185 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Phillips, John)
October 5, 2018 Filing 184 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limiteds Objections and Responses to: 1) Plaintiffs First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1 30); and 2) Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1- 7) filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited.(Poff, Adam)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #170 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation -- Party Par Pharmaceutical Inc. terminated. Attorney Tyler E. Cragg; David H. Silverstein; Aziz Burgy and Ricardo S. Camposanto terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/4/18. (ntl)
October 4, 2018 Filing 183 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to All Defendants [Nos. 1-30]; and (2) Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants [Nos. 1-7] filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
October 4, 2018 Filing 182 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to All Defendants filed by Ezra Ventures, LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
October 4, 2018 Filing 181 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to All Defendants filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
October 4, 2018 Filing 180 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Mylan Pharmaceuticals to file reply brief in support of its Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue to October 19, 2018 - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
October 4, 2018 Filing 179 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.'s: (1) Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things 1-30 and (2) Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories 1-7 filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly)
October 4, 2018 Filing 178 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s (1) Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things [Nos. 1-30]; and (2) Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories [Nos. 1-7] filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
October 4, 2018 Filing 177 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.'s (1) Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things [Nos. 1-30]; and (2) Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories [Nos. 1-7] filed by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
October 4, 2018 Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Accord Healthcare, Inc.'s (1) Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things [Nos. 1-30]; and (2) Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories [Nos. 1-7] filed by Accord Healthcare Inc..(Ormerod, Eve)
October 4, 2018 Filing 175 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Emcure Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories; and (2) Defendants Emcure Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things 1-30 filed by Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Haney, Megan)
October 4, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants; and (2) Defendants Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
October 4, 2018 Filing 173 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Aurobindo's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7); and (2) Aurobindo's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for Production (Nos. 1-30) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 4, 2018 Filing 172 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Responses to First Set of Common Requests for Production and (2) Responses to First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 4, 2018 Filing 171 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Bionpharma's responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7); (2) Bionpharma's responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for Production (Nos. 1-30); (3) Hetero's responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7); (4) Hetero's responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for Production (Nos. 1-30); (5) Prinston's responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7); and (6) Prinston's responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for Production (Nos. 1-30) filed by Bionpharma Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 4, 2018 Filing 170 STIPULATION of Dismissal Against Defendant Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
October 3, 2018 Filing 169 REDACTED VERSION of #164 Declaration of Robert W. Trenchard in support of Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
October 3, 2018 Filing 168 REDACTED VERSION of #163 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
October 3, 2018 Filing 167 ANSWER to #134 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim as to Defendant HEC Pharm Co., Ltd and HEC Pharm USA Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
October 1, 2018 Filing 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things as to Defendants HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc., and Ezra Ventures LLC filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
September 28, 2018 Filing 165 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFFS VENUE-RELATED REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS TO MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.; (2) PLAINTIFFS VENUE-RELATED INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.; (3) NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF VENUE-RELATED 30(B)(6) DEPOSITION OF MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.; (4) SUBPOENAS TO MYLAN HOLDINGS INC. ; AND (5) SUBPOENAS TO MYLAN SECURITIZATION LLC filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
September 28, 2018 Filing 164 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #163 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
September 28, 2018 Filing 163 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #118 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
September 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin A. Katzenellenbogen for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Howard S. Suh for Bionpharma Inc., Hetero USA Inc., and Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William R. Zimmerman and Kimberly A. Kennedy for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Forrest M. McClellen for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #152 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Zimmerman, Benjamin A. Katzenellenbogen, Kimberly A. Kennedy and Forrest M. McClellan filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/25/18. (ntl)
September 24, 2018 Filing 162 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding request to schedule a Rule 16 Conference. (Phillips, John)
September 21, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven J. Udick for HEC Pharm Co., Ltd. and HEC Pharm USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 19, 2018 Filing 161 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bionpharma, Hetero and Prinston's 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Bionpharma Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 19, 2018 Filing 160 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendants' Initial Disclosures; and 2) Glenmark's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited.(Poff, Adam)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #138 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporations deadline to respond to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue to September 28, 2018 filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/18/18. (ntl)
September 17, 2018 Filing 159 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Discovery Standard filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 17, 2018 Filing 158 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(A)(1) and Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Ezra Ventures, LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 17, 2018 Filing 157 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Requesting a Discovery Teleconference. (Silver, Daniel)
September 17, 2018 Filing 156 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and Discovery Disclosures Pursuant to the District of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
September 17, 2018 Filing 155 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly)
September 17, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFFS INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a)(1) and (2) PLAINTIFFS RULE 3 DISCLOSURES filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
September 17, 2018 Filing 153 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) and Cadila Healthcare Limited's Fed.R.Civ.P. 36(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; and (2) Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limited's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 152 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Zimmerman, Benjamin A. Katzenellenbogen, Kimberly A. Kennedy and Forrest M. McClellan - filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited. (Poff, Adam)
September 17, 2018 Filing 151 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Par Pharmaceutical Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Par Pharmaceutical Inc..(Cragg, Tyler)
September 17, 2018 Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Emcure Pharmaceuticals and Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Delaware Default Standard for Discovery Paragraph 3; and (2) Initial Disclosures of Defendants Emcure Pharmaceuticals and Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc. Pursuant to Fed. Ri. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Haney, Megan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 149 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Par Pharmaceutical Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Par Pharmaceutical Inc..(Cragg, Tyler)
September 17, 2018 Filing 148 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Accord Healthcare, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Delaware Paragraph 3 Disclosures and Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
September 17, 2018 Filing 147 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited. (Poff, Adam)
September 17, 2018 Filing 146 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited.(Poff, Adam)
September 17, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Initial Disclosures of Defendants Biocon Limited and Biocon Pharma Inc.; and (2) Initial Disclosures of Defendants Biocon Limited and Biocon Pharma Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc..(Haney, Megan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' First Joint Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-13); and (2) Defendants' First Joint Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-59) filed by Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc., Cadila Healthcare Limited, Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 143 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Aurobindo's 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; and (2) Aurobindo's Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 17, 2018 Filing 142 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 17, 2018 Filing 141 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Alkem Laboratories Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 17, 2018 Filing 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragrah 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and (2) Initial Disclosures Purusant to F.R.C.P. 26(a) for Patent No. '405 filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 17, 2018 Filing 139 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bionpharma, Hetero and Prinston's Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Bionpharma Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 14, 2018 Filing 138 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporations deadline to respond to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.s Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue to September 28, 2018 - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
September 14, 2018 Filing 137 REDACTED VERSION of #120 Declaration of Keith Meckstroth by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rawnsley, Jason)
September 14, 2018 Filing 136 REDACTED VERSION of #119 Opening Brief in Support of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #115 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven J. Udick filed by HEC Pharm Group, HEC Pharm USA Inc., HEC Pharm Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/14/18. (ntl)
September 12, 2018 Filing 135 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent HEC Pharm Group for HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc. filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 12, 2018 Filing 134 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by HEC Pharm USA Inc., HEC Pharm Group, HEC Pharm Co., Ltd..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 11, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bicon's Abbreviated New Drug Application filed by Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc..(Haney, Megan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited's Abbreviated New Drug Application filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited.(Poff, Adam)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #122 STIPULATION and Order to Remove Defendant HEC Pharm Group and Amend Caption to Reflect Same -- HEC Pharm Group terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/10/18. (ntl)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER re #117 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/10/18. (ntl)
September 11, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Abbreviated New Drug Application filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 10, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc.'s ANDA production, Bates stamped BPI-FINGO-000001 to BPI-FINGO-018645 filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 128 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Abbreviated New Drug Application filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Haney, Megan)
September 10, 2018 Filing 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Abbreviated New Drug Application filed by Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Haney, Megan)
September 10, 2018 Filing 126 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Accord Healthcare, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Abbreviated New Drug Applications filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
September 10, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Abbreviated New Drug Application filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
September 7, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Abbreviated New Drug Application filed by Ezra Ventures, LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 7, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Abbreviated New Drug Application filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 7, 2018 Filing 122 STIPULATION to Remove Defendant HEC Pharm Group and Amend Caption to Reflect Same by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm Group, HEC Pharm USA Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 7, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Par Pharmaceutical's Abbreviated New Drug Application filed by Par Pharmaceutical Inc..(Cragg, Tyler)
September 7, 2018 Filing 120 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #118 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue , #119 Opening Brief in Support of Keith Meckstroth by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rawnsley, Jason)
September 7, 2018 Filing 119 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #118 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/21/2018. (Rawnsley, Jason)
September 7, 2018 Filing 118 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rawnsley, Jason)
September 7, 2018 Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rawnsley, Jason)
September 7, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alkem Laboratories, Ltd.'s ANDA production filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 7, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected document added to D.I. 115 per request of counsel. (ntl)
September 5, 2018 Filing 115 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven J. Udick - filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm Group, HEC Pharm USA Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Main Document 115 replaced on 9/7/2018) (ntl).
September 4, 2018 Filing 114 ANSWER to #85 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim as to Defendant Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #108 Stipulation and Order Staying the Case as to Strides. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/4/18. (ntl)
September 4, 2018 Filing 113 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to All Defendants; and (2) Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 31, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures of Accused Products and Asserted Patents; and (2) The File History for the Asserted Patent filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 31, 2018 Filing 111 ANSWER to #80 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, as to Defendants Nostrum Laboratories Inc., Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC, MSN Laboratories Private Limited, and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 110 ANSWER to #69 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim as to Defendant Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, and Hetero Labs Limited by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 109 ANSWER to #69 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim as to Defendant Aurobindo Pharma Limited by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 108 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying the Case as to Strides by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
August 29, 2018 Filing 107 ANSWER to #62 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim as to Defendants Biocon Limited and Biocon Pharma, Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 29, 2018 Filing 106 ANSWER to #33 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim as to Defendant Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 29, 2018 Filing 105 ANSWER to #41 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim as to Defendant Ezra Ventures LLC by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 29, 2018 Filing 104 ANSWER to #35 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim as to Defendant Bionpharma Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 28, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Louis H. Weinstein for Accord Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #102 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Louis H. Weinstein filed by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Accord Healthcare Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/28/18. (ntl)
August 27, 2018 Filing 103 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Proposed Scheduling Order)(Silver, Daniel)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #101 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation -- Party First Time US Generics LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/24/18. (ntl)
August 24, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael J. Gaertner,David B. Abramowitz,Carolyn A. Blessing for Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
August 24, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Cindy Chang for Emcure Pharmaceuticals added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
August 23, 2018 Filing 102 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Louis H. Weinstein - filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Ormerod, Eve)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #100 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Cottler filed by Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc., Emcure Pharmaceuticals, #99 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elaine Herrmann Blais and Cindy Chang filed by Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc., Emcure Pharmaceuticals. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/23/18. (ntl)
August 22, 2018 Filing 101 STIPULATION of Dismissal Against Defendant First Time US Generics LLC by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
August 22, 2018 Filing 100 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Cottler - filed by Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Haney, Megan)
August 22, 2018 Filing 99 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elaine Herrmann Blais and Cindy Chang - filed by Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Haney, Megan)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #98 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George J. Barry III and Attorney Timothy H. Kratz filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Limited. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/22/18. (ntl)
August 21, 2018 Filing 98 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George J. Barry III and Attorney Timothy H. Kratz - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 21, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brandon M. White for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
August 20, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sarah E. Spires,Mieke Malmberg,Paul J. Skiermont for HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm Group, HEC Pharm USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #97 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mieke Malmerg, Paul Skiermont, and Sarah Spires filed by HEC Pharm Group, HEC Pharm USA Inc., HEC Pharm Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/20/18. (ntl)
August 17, 2018 Filing 97 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mieke Malmerg, Paul Skiermont, and Sarah Spires - filed by HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm Group, HEC Pharm USA Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 17, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C. Haney on behalf of Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Haney, Megan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Phillips, Jr on behalf of Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Phillips, John)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #89 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Dismissing Without Prejudice Defendant Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and Amending Caption to Reflect Same -- Party Intas Pharmaceuticals Limited terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/16/18. (ntl)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #91 Joint STIPULATION Extend Time To Respond to the Complaint to September 12, 2018 for Defendants HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm Group and HEC Pharm USA Inc. filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/16/18. (ntl)
August 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jonathan B. Turpin for Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan B. Turpin filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Cadila Healthcare Limited, #94 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shannon M. Bloodworth and Brandon M. White filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/16/18. (ntl)
August 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alejandro Menchaca,Aaron F. Barkoff for Ezra Ventures, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
August 15, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shannon M. Bloodworth and Brandon M. White - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
August 15, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Emily L. Savas for Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan B. Turpin - filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Haney, Megan)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #90 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen R. Auten, Attorney Richard T. Ruzich, Attorney Jaimin H. Shah and Attorney Roshan P. Shrestha filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd., #92 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Gaertner, David B. Abramowitz, Carolyn A. Blessing and Emily L. Savas filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Cadila Healthcare Limited. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/15/18. (ntl)
August 15, 2018 Filing 92 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Gaertner, David B. Abramowitz, Carolyn A. Blessing and Emily L. Savas - filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Haney, Megan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 91 Joint STIPULATION Extend Time To Respond to the Complaint to September 12, 2018 for Defendants HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm Group and HEC Pharm USA Inc. by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
August 14, 2018 Filing 90 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen R. Auten, Attorney Richard T. Ruzich, Attorney Jaimin H. Shah and Attorney Roshan P. Shrestha - filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 14, 2018 Filing 89 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Dismissing Without Prejudice Defendant Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and Amending Caption to Reflect Same by Accord Healthcare Inc., Intas Pharmaceuticals Limited. (Belgam, Neal)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron F. Barkoff and Alejandro Menchaca filed by Ezra Ventures, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/14/18. (ntl)
August 13, 2018 Filing 88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron F. Barkoff and Alejandro Menchaca - filed by Ezra Ventures, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 13, 2018 Filing 87 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Pensa Pharma S.A. for Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc. filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
August 13, 2018 Filing 86 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
August 13, 2018 Filing 85 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly)
August 10, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ricardo S. Camposanto,Aziz Burgy,David H. Silverstein for Par Pharmaceutical Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than August 27, 2018. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, New Patent Procedures). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/10/18. (ntl)
August 10, 2018 Filing 83 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Emcure Pharmaceuticals made on July 19, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #30 Stipulation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #72 Stipulation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, #31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to September 7, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #45 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re Answer to Complaint to through and including August 13, 2018 filed by Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/10/18. (ntl)
August 10, 2018 Filing 82 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Nostrum Laboratories Inc., Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Finger, David)
August 10, 2018 Filing 81 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent MSN Laboratories Private Limited for MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Finger, David)
August 10, 2018 Filing 80 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, for Declaratory Judgment, COUNTERCLAIM against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation by Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC, MSN Laboratories Private Limited, Nostrum Laboratories Inc., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Finger, David)
August 10, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C. Haney on behalf of Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Haney, Megan)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #76 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David H. Silverstein, Aziz Burgy, and Ricardo S. Camposanto filed by Par Pharmaceutical Inc., #68 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard S. Suh filed by Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Bionpharma Inc., Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/10/18. (ntl)
August 10, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C. Haney on behalf of Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc. (Haney, Megan)
August 9, 2018 Filing 77 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Par Pharmaceutical Inc. filed by Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Cragg, Tyler)
August 9, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David H. Silverstein, Aziz Burgy, and Ricardo S. Camposanto - filed by Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Cragg, Tyler)
August 9, 2018 Filing 75 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, and Defenses by Par Pharmaceutical Inc..(Cragg, Tyler)
August 9, 2018 Filing 74 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent No parent company for Cadila Healthcare Limited filed by Cadila Healthcare Limited. (Phillips, John)
August 9, 2018 Filing 73 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cadila Healthcare Limited for Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Phillips, John)
August 9, 2018 Filing 72 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
August 9, 2018 Filing 71 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, and Affirmative Defenses by Cadila Healthcare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Phillips, John)
August 9, 2018 Filing 70 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Aurobindo Pharma Limited for Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 9, 2018 Filing 69 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Limited.(Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 9, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard S. Suh - filed by Bionpharma Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 9, 2018 Filing 67 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Hetero Drugs Limited, Corporate Parent Hetero Labs Limited for Hetero USA Inc. filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 9, 2018 Filing 66 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation by Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero Labs Limited.(Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 8, 2018 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on MSN Laboratories Private Limited made on July 18, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 64 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent No parent company for Biocon Limited; Corporate Parent Biocon Limited for Biocon Pharma, Inc. filed by Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc.. (Phillips, John)
August 8, 2018 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Nostrum Laboratories Inc., USA made on July 19, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 62 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation by Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc..(Phillips, John)
August 8, 2018 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Hetero Labs Limited made on July 19, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V made on July 19, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on HEC Pharm USA Inc. made on July 23, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on HEC Pharm Group made on July 19, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on HEC Pharm Co., Ltd. made on July 18, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited made on July 18, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA made on July 18, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Ezra Ventures, LLC made on July 18, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. made on July 18, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 52 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Torrent Private Ltd. for Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.; Corporate Parent Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. for Torrent Pharma Inc. filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Belgam, Neal)
August 8, 2018 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Dr, Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. made on July 18, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 50 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd. for Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc. filed by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd.. (Belgam, Neal)
August 8, 2018 Filing 49 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Intas Pharmaceuticals Limited for Accord Healthcare Inc. filed by Accord Healthcare Inc.. (Belgam, Neal)
August 8, 2018 Filing 48 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, and Additional Defenses by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
August 8, 2018 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, and Additional Defenses by Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
August 8, 2018 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, and Additional Defenses by Accord Healthcare Inc..(Ormerod, Eve)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #26 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd. -- Party S&B Pharma, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/8/18. (ntl)
August 8, 2018 Filing 45 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME re Answer to Complaint to through and including August 13, 2018 - filed by Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Complaint to September 17, 2018 filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/8/18. (ntl)
August 8, 2018 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. made on July 18, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ezra Innovations LLC for Ezra Ventures, LLC filed by Ezra Ventures, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 8, 2018 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc. made on July 18, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Ezra Ventures, LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 8, 2018 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Biocon Limited made on July 18, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 Stipulation and Order filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/8/18. (ntl)
August 8, 2018 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Aurobindo Pharma Limited made on July 19, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Alkem Laboratories, Ltd. made on July 19, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 37 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Bionpharma Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 8, 2018 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Accord Healthcare Inc. made on July 19, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Bionpharma Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 8, 2018 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. for Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 8, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 8, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Cottrell, III on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Cottrell, Frederick)
August 8, 2018 Filing 31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to September 7, 2018 - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to September 7, 2018 filed by Strides Global Pharma Private Limited, Strides Pharma, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/8/18. (ntl)
August 8, 2018 Filing 30 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
August 7, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert W. Trenchard for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS(ceg)
August 7, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Stipulation filed at D.I. 27 was removed from the docket as duplicative of D.I. 26. (ntl)
August 6, 2018 Filing 29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to September 7, 2018 - filed by Strides Global Pharma Private Limited, Strides Pharma, Inc.. (Rychlicki, Helena)
August 6, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Helena C. Rychlicki on behalf of Strides Global Pharma Private Limited, Strides Pharma, Inc. (Rychlicki, Helena)
August 6, 2018 Filing 26 STIPULATION of Dismissal of S&B Pharma, Inc. without prejudice and Amending Caption by Alkem Laboratories Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 3, 2018 Filing 25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Complaint to September 17, 2018 - filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 3, 2018 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding Service on Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. made on July 18, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 3, 2018 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding Service on Torrent Pharma Inc. made on July 18, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 3, 2018 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Strides Pharma, Inc. made on July 18, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 3, 2018 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Strides Global Pharma Private Limited made on July 18, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 3, 2018 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Mailing Regarding Service on Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. made on July 19, 2018 by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Silver, Daniel)
August 3, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order as to Defendant First Time US Generics LLC by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
July 27, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jane M. Love for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS(dmp, )
July 27, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew Blythe for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS(dmp, )
July 24, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Bionpharma Inc. served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. S&B Pharma, Inc. served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Hetero USA Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Par Pharmaceutical Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. First Time US Generics LLC served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Biocon Pharma, Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (6 in 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 6 in 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 6 in 1:18-cv-01043-LPS, 6 in 1:18-cv-01040-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jane M. Love, Robert Trenchard, Paul E. Torchia, and Andrew P. Blythe filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/24/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS (ntl)
July 23, 2018 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to HEC Pharm USA Inc. (jcs)
July 23, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jane M. Love, Robert Trenchard, Paul E. Torchia, and Andrew P. Blythe - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Jane M. Love, Robert Trenchard, Paul E. Torchia, and Andrew P. Blythe)(Silver, Daniel)
July 19, 2018 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (nmg)
July 19, 2018 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Accord Healthcare Inc., HEC Pharm Group, Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (nmg)
July 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS (rjb)
July 18, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Accord Healthcare Inc. on 7/18/2018; Alkem Laboratories Ltd. on 7/18/2018; Aurobindo Pharma Limited on 7/18/2018; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. on 7/18/2018; Biocon Limited on 7/18/2018; Biocon Pharma, Inc. on 7/18/2018; Bionpharma Inc. on 7/18/2018; Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc. on 7/18/2018; Cadila Healthcare Limited on 7/18/2018; Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc. on 7/18/2018; Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd. on 7/18/2018; Emcure Pharmaceuticals on 7/18/2018; Ezra Ventures, LLC on 7/18/2018; First Time US Generics LLC on 7/18/2018; Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA on 7/18/2018; Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited on 7/18/2018; HEC Pharm Co., Ltd. on 7/18/2018; HEC Pharm Group on 7/18/2018; HEC Pharm USA Inc. on 7/18/2018; Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 7/18/2018; Hetero Labs Limited on 7/18/2018; Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V on 7/18/2018; Hetero USA Inc. on 7/18/2018; Intas Pharmaceuticals Limited on 7/18/2018; MSN Laboratories Private Limited on 7/18/2018; MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 7/18/2018; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 7/18/2018; Nostrum Laboratories Inc. on 7/18/2018; Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC on 7/18/2018; Par Pharmaceutical Inc. on 7/18/2018; Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. on 7/18/2018; S&B Pharma, Inc. on 7/18/2018; Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. on 7/18/2018; Strides Global Pharma Private Limited on 7/18/2018; Strides Pharma, Inc. on 7/18/2018; Torrent Pharma Inc. on 7/18/2018; Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. on 7/18/2018; Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. on 7/18/2018. (sar)
July 16, 2018 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (nmg)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,187,405. (nmg)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: See Attached. Date of Expiration of Patent: 6/25/2027. (nmg)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Accord Healthcare Inc., Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc., Bionpharma Inc., Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Cadila Healthcare Limited, Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Emcure Pharmaceuticals, Ezra Ventures, LLC, First Time US Generics LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, HEC Pharm Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm Group, HEC Pharm USA Inc., Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc., Intas Pharmaceuticals Limited, MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Nostrum Laboratories Inc., Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., S&B Pharma, Inc., Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Strides Global Pharma Private Limited, Strides Pharma, Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2420075.) - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Accord Healthcare Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emcure Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Cindy Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biocon Limited
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly A. Beis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: James P. Barabas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Rutter
Represented By: Louis H. Weinstein
Represented By: Alan H. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEC Pharm Group
Represented By: Paul J. Skiermont
Represented By: Mieke Malmberg
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Sarah E. Spires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEC Pharm Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Paul J. Skiermont
Represented By: Mieke Malmberg
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Sarah E. Spires
Represented By: Steven J. Udick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Brandon M. White
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Shannon M. Bloodworth
Represented By: Bryan D. Beel
Represented By: Michael R. Laing
Represented By: Maria A. Stubbings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Gaertner
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: David B. Abramowitz
Represented By: Emily L. Savas
Represented By: Jonathan B. Turpin
Represented By: Carolyn A. Blessing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Louis H. Weinstein
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: James P. Barabas
Represented By: Alan H. Pollack
Represented By: Jennifer M. Rutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: James P. Barabas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Rutter
Represented By: Louis H. Weinstein
Represented By: Alan H. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezra Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Alejandro Menchaca
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Aaron F. Barkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&B Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN Laboratories Private Limited
Represented By: David L. Finger
Represented By: David J. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: James P. Barabas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Rutter
Represented By: Louis H. Weinstein
Represented By: Alan H. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nostrum Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: David L. Finger
Represented By: David J. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Christie R.W. Matthaei
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Kimberly A. Kennedy
Represented By: Forrest M. McClellen
Represented By: Benjamin A. Katzenellenbogen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Christie R.W. Matthaei
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Kimberly A. Kennedy
Represented By: Forrest M. McClellen
Represented By: Benjamin A. Katzenellenbogen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Robert F. Vroom
Represented By: Sara M. Metzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Time US Generics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biocon Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly A. Beis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEC Pharm USA Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Skiermont
Represented By: Mieke Malmberg
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Sarah E. Spires
Represented By: Steven J. Udick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strides Global Pharma Private Limited
Represented By: Helena C. Rychlicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadila Healthcare Limited
Represented By: Michael J. Gaertner
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: David B. Abramowitz
Represented By: Carolyn A. Blessing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Charles A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alkem Laboratories Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Stephen R. Auten
Represented By: Roshan Shrestha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero USA Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Howard S. Suh
Represented By: Charles A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Limited
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nostrum Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: David L. Finger
Represented By: David J. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: David L. Finger
Represented By: David J. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: David H. Silverstein
Represented By: Tyler E. Cragg
Represented By: Ricardo S. Camposanto
Represented By: Aziz Burgy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bionpharma Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Howard S. Suh
Represented By: Charles A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strides Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Helena C. Rychlicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Howard S. Suh
Represented By: Charles A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: James P. Barabas
Represented By: Jennifer M. Rutter
Represented By: Louis H. Weinstein
Represented By: Alan H. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Charles A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intas Pharmaceuticals Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Chemical & Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Sara M. Metzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Charles B. Klein
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Brown
Represented By: Eimeric Reig-Plessis
Represented By: Zachary L. Sorman
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz
Represented By: Amanda J. Hollis
Represented By: Gregory Springsted
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Sarah Tsou
Represented By: James H. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc.
Represented By: Charles B. Klein
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Brown
Represented By: Eimeric Reig-Plessis
Represented By: Zachary L. Sorman
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Dennis D. Gregory
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: Mary Procaccio-Flowers
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Diyang Liu
Represented By: Tung-On Kong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Dennis D. Gregory
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: Mary Procaccio-Flowers
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Diyang Liu
Represented By: Tung-On Kong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Represented By: Charles B. Klein
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Brown
Represented By: Eimeric Reig-Plessis
Represented By: Zachary L. Sorman
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: James H. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin A. Smyth
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Robert W. Trenchard
Represented By: Andrew Blythe
Represented By: Jane M. Love
Represented By: Jordan H. Bekier
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?