United States of America v. Harrell

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Aline V. Harrell
Case Number: 1:2018cv01054
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Aline V. Harrell in the amount of $89,840.26 as of August 17, 2018 (with interest thereafter at the legal rate). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/7/2018. (dlw)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORAL ORDER - The referral of this action to the Magistrate Judge is hereby WITHDRAWN. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/7/2018. (dlw)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED CONSENT JUDGMENT Consent Judgment by United States of America. (Welsh, Jennifer)
August 31, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by United States of America. United States of America served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Welsh, Jennifer)
July 19, 2018 ***NOTE: If the parties jointly consent to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge's jurisdiction to conduct all proceedings in this case, then the Pretrial Conference and Trial will be presided over by Judge Thynge consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636. Otherwise, in accordance with the District Court's procedures for "Assignment of Cases to Visiting Judges" (issued May 26, 2017 and available on the District Court's website), upon the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., a motion to dismiss, a motion for judgment on the pleadings, a motion for summary judgment, or initiation of the claim construction process in a patent case), VAC cases will be reassigned to a visiting District Judge, and any further dates in the Scheduling Order, including the Pretrial Conference and Trial dates, may be adjusted dependent on the availability of the visiting District Judge. (fms)
July 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) (rjb)
July 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 17, 2018 No Summons Issued. (jcs)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Aline V. Harrell - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by United States of America. ($400 Filing Fee Waived) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcs) Modified on 7/18/2018 (jcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aline V. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer K. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?