Price v. Scarborough et al
Plaintiff: Millard E. Price
Defendant: Deputy Warden Scarborough, Jane/John Doe and Marc Richman
Case Number: 1:2018cv01056
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Gregory M Sleet
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 CASE CLOSED (jcs)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, The plaintiffs complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the court's July 26, 2018 order (D.I. #4 ).. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/7/2018. (jcs)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, Plaintiff shall submit to the Clerk of the Court, a request to proceed in forma pauperis and a certified copy of his trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form). Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/27/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/26/2018. (ceg)
July 25, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 Supplemental Letter - re #1 Complaint. (jcs)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 against Jane/John Doe, Marc Richman, Deputy Warden Scarborough - filed by Millard E. Price. (No Fee Paid, No IFP).(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Scarborough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millard E. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?