Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee v. Abbott Vascular, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01070
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Referring Judge: Mary Pat Thynge
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel T. Acker, Esq. filed by Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee, #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney E. Sawyer Neely, Esq. filed by Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee, #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark S. Werbner, Esq. filed by Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/5/2018. (fms)
September 5, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark S. Werbner, Esq. - filed by Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Hogan, Daniel)
September 5, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney E. Sawyer Neely, Esq. - filed by Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Hogan, Daniel)
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel T. Acker, Esq. - filed by Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Hogan, Daniel)
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants Reply In Further Support Of Their Motion To Dismiss filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Vascular, Inc.. (Coen, Kevin)
August 31, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee. (McDaniel, Garvan)
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/31/2018. (McDaniel, Garvan)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Vascular, Inc.. (Cumings, Alexandra)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Abbott Laboratories for Abbott Vascular, Inc. filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Vascular, Inc.. (Cumings, Alexandra)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Vascular, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/24/2018. (Cumings, Alexandra)
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Vascular, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Cumings, Alexandra)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint served on Abbott Laboratories on 07/23/2018, filed by Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Signed summons and complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Proof of service)(Hogan, Daniel)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee. Abbott Vascular, Inc. served on 7/20/2018, answer due 8/10/2018. (Hogan, Daniel)
July 26, 2018 ***NOTE: If the parties jointly consent to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge's jurisdiction to conduct all proceedings in this case, then the Pretrial Conference and Trial will be presided over by Judge Thynge consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636. Otherwise, in accordance with the District Court's procedures for "Assignment of Cases to Visiting Judges" (issued May 26, 2017 and available on the District Court's website), upon the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., a motion to dismiss, a motion for judgment on the pleadings, a motion for summary judgment, or initiation of the claim construction process in a patent case), VAC cases will be reassigned to a visiting District Judge, and any further dates in the Scheduling Order, including the Pretrial Conference and Trial dates, may be adjusted dependent on the availability of the visiting District Judge. (fms)
July 25, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) (rjb)
July 25, 2018 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 19, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Abbott Laboratories on 7/19/2018; Abbott Vascular, Inc. on 7/19/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Vascular, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2422439.) - filed by Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee v. Abbott Vascular, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Kevin Michael Coen
Represented By: Alexandra M. Cumings
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Coen
Represented By: Alexandra M. Cumings
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tendyne Holdings, Inc. Securityholder's Representative Committee
Represented By: Daniel K. Hogan
Represented By: Garvan F. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?