Modern Telecom Systems, LLC v. Netgear, Inc.

Plaintiff: Modern Telecom Systems, LLC
Defendant: Netgear, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01159
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Christopher J Burke
Referring Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to respond to the Complaint to October 29, 2018 filed by Netgear, Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/25/2018. (dlb)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to respond to the Complaint to October 29, 2018 - filed by Netgear, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 24, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel S. Carlineo for Modern Telecom Systems, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 09/28/2018 filed by Modern Telecom Systems, LLC. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/23/2018. (dlb)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to 09/28/2018 - filed by Modern Telecom Systems, LLC. (Brennecke, Sean)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel S. Carlineo filed by Modern Telecom Systems, LLC. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/23/2018. (dlb)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel S. Carlineo - filed by Modern Telecom Systems, LLC. (Brennecke, Sean)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL REFERRAL ORDER: This case will be governed by Judge Stark's Revised Procedures for Managing Patent Cases (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). In accordance with the Revised Procedures, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. any and all matters relating to scheduling, including entry of a Scheduling Order, are referred to Magistrate Judge Burke; 2. any and all motions to dismiss, stay, and/or transfer venue, relating to all or any part of the case, whenever such motions may be filed, are referred to Judge Burke for disposition or report and recommendation, to the full extent permitted by the Constitution, statute, and rule; and 3. within seven (7) days of the date of this Referral Order, the plaintiff(s) shall file the Procedures Order, which is found on Judge Stark's website (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/10/18. (ntl)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Modern Telecom Systems, LLC. Netgear, Inc. served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018. (Brennecke, Sean)
August 8, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 8, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Netgear, Inc. on 8/8/2018. (jcs)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,504,886 . (Brennecke, Sean)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Glocom, Inc. for Modern Telecom Systems, LLC filed by Modern Telecom Systems, LLC. (Brennecke, Sean)
August 3, 2018 No Summons Issued. (crb)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Netgear, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2432615.) - filed by Modern Telecom Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modern Telecom Systems, LLC v. Netgear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netgear, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modern Telecom Systems, LLC
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Daniel S. Carlineo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?