Thomas-Fish v. Avborne Accessory Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Helen Thomas-Fish
Defendant: RBC Sargent Airtomic, Dover Corporation, Sargent Industries, Inc., RBC Bearings Incorporated, Dover Engineered Systems, Inc., Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc., Avborne Accessory Group, Inc. and Sargent Aerospace & Defense, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01195
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 58 REPLY BRIEF re #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Avborne Accessory Group, Inc., Dover Corporation, Dover Engineered Systems, Inc., RBC Bearings Incorporated, RBC Sargent Airtomic, Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc., Sargent Aerospace & Defense, LLC, Sargent Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ableman, Peggy)
September 26, 2018 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #57 . (lih)
September 25, 2018 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #51 Opening Brief in Support, filed by Helen Thomas-Fish.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(deBruin, David)
September 25, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, the memorandum in opposition previously filed as D.I. 57 has been deleted. Counsel will file a revised version of the document shortly. (lih)
September 24, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Peggy L. Ableman on behalf of Avborne Accessory Group, Inc., Dover Corporation, Dover Engineered Systems, Inc., Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc., Sargent Aerospace & Defense, LLC, Sargent Industries, Inc. (Ableman, Peggy)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 11/6/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 10/31/2018. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/21/2018. (lih)
September 20, 2018 Filing 55 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from David W. deBruin, Esq. regarding Plaintiff's Statement of the Case Status - re #48 Order. (deBruin, David) Modified on 9/20/2018 (lih).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #54 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set Briefing Schedule: re #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Answering Brief due 9/24/2018.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/14/2018. (lih)
September 6, 2018 Filing 54 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff's to File an Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to September 24, 2018 - filed by Helen Thomas-Fish. (deBruin, David)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #53 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jacqueline G. Badders. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/6/2018. (lih)
September 5, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jacqueline G. Badders - filed by Helen Thomas-Fish. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jacqueline G. Badders, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(deBruin, David)
September 5, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. deBruin on behalf of Helen Thomas-Fish (deBruin, David)
August 21, 2018 Filing 51 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Avborne Accessory Group, Inc., Dover Corporation, Dover Engineered Systems, Inc., Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc., Sargent Aerospace & Defense, LLC, Sargent Industries, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Faben, Janine)
August 21, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Avborne Accessory Group, Inc., Dover Corporation, Dover Engineered Systems, Inc., Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc., Sargent Aerospace & Defense, LLC, Sargent Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Faben, Janine)
August 21, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Janine L. Faben on behalf of Avborne Accessory Group, Inc., Dover Corporation, Dover Engineered Systems, Inc., Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc., Sargent Aerospace & Defense, LLC, Sargent Industries, Inc. (Faben, Janine)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of September 6, 2018: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/17/2018. (lih)
August 15, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
August 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 7, 2018 Filing 47 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/6/2018. (nmf)
August 7, 2018 Filing 46 Record of case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number in Other District: 1:17-cv-10648. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER Severing the claims against Defendants Avborne Accessory Group, Inc.; Dover Corporation; Dover Engineered Systems, Inc.; RBC Bearings, Incorporated; Sargent Aerospace & Defense, LLC; Sargent Industries, Inc.; RBC Sargent Airtomic; and Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. and TRANSFERRING those claims to the District of Delaware. The Court will hold a telephonic pre-motion conference on September 7, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/7/18. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 44 Letter from Defendants' counsel with consent from Plaintiff to adjourn Rule 16 Conference re 43 Order,, Set Hearings,. (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER The Court hereby resets the in-person Initial Conference previously set for January 11, 2018. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is August 9, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/1/18. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Denying #35 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/31/18. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 41 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/31/18. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 40 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #35 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Amber Long, Esq., #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(LONG, AMBER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
March 9, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Document #38 appears to be filed in error and has been sealed by the Clerk to protect the confidential information. PLEASE DISREGARD. The correct Brief in Opposition is entry #39 . This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 39 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AVBORNE ACCESSORY GROUP, INC, DOVER CORPORATION, DOVER ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC., RBC SONIC, ROLLER BEARING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC., SARGENT AEROSPACE & DEFENSE, LLC, SARGENT INDUSTRIES, INC. re #35 MOTION to Remand corrected filing, includes Declaration of Service (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 38 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AVBORNE ACCESSORY GROUP, INC, DOVER CORPORATION, DOVER ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC., RBC SONIC, ROLLER BEARING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC., SARGENT AEROSPACE & DEFENSE, LLC, SARGENT INDUSTRIES, INC. re #35 MOTION to Remand including Declaration of Service (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
March 8, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised the Notice of Filing of Transcript #37 submitted by Defendants on 3/7/2018 is not filed pursuant to the Policy on the Electronic Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. The Clerk's Office has restricted access to this document pursuant to the procedure of the Court and at the Court's direction. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE by AVBORNE ACCESSORY GROUP, INC, DOVER CORPORATION, DOVER ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC., ROLLER BEARING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC., SARGENT AEROSPACE & DEFENSE, LLC, SARGENT INDUSTRIES, INC. Of Filing of Transcript of Oral Argument of 2-15-18 Oral Argument of Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of Oral Argument of Motion to Transfer Venue, 2/15/18)(SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 36 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jacqueline Badders to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LONG, AMBER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 4/2/2018 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief, #2 Declaration Declaration of Amber Long, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(LONG, AMBER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jacqueline Badders, Esq. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/15/2018. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
February 15, 2018 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Motion Hearing held on 2/15/2018. Hearing on #24 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Delaware in response to 12/12/17 Order to Show Cause filed by AVBORNE ACCESSORY GROUP, INC, DOVER CORPORATION, ROLLER BEARING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC., DOVER ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC., SARGENT INDUSTRIES, INC., SARGENT AEROSPACE & DEFENSE, LLC, RBC BEARINGS INCORPORATED. Ordered plaintiff leave to file a Motion to Remand on or before 2/26/18, reply due by 3/8/18 and any reply due by 3/15/18. Hearing on #32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacqueline Badders, Esq. filed by HELEN THOMAS-FISH. Ordered motion granted as unopposed by Avborne Accessory Group, Inc. defendants. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter Ted Formaroli) (ar1, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
February 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacqueline Badders, Esq.. Motion set for 3/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
February 12, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacqueline Badders, Esq. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Jacqueline Badders, #2 Certification Certification of Amber Long, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(LONG, AMBER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER. In light of #30 adjournment request on consent, oral argument on #24 Motion to Transfer Venue is hereby RESCHEDULED to Thursday, February 15, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall kindly mark their calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/9/2018. (Bumb, Renee) Modified on 2/9/2018 (ar1). [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 30 Letter from Amber Long, Esq. to the Hon. Renee Marie Bumb. (LONG, AMBER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER. Oral argument on #24 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Delaware shall be held in Courtroom 3D at 10:00 a.m. on February 14, 2018. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/30/2018. (Bumb, Renee) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 28 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AVBORNE ACCESSORY GROUP, INC, DOVER CORPORATION, DOVER ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC., ROLLER BEARING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC., SARGENT AEROSPACE & DEFENSE, LLC, SARGENT INDUSTRIES, INC. re #24 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Delaware in response to 12/12/17 Order to Show Cause (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 27 BRIEF in Opposition filed by HELEN THOMAS-FISH re #24 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Delaware in response to 12/12/17 Order to Show Cause (LONG, AMBER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER. The Court has reviewed the parties' responses to the Court's Order to Show Cause issued December 12, 2017. The response by Defendants Avborne et al [Dkt 24], filed as a formal Motion to Transfer, shall be construed as such. Accordingly, Plaintiff's opposition to the motion shall be filed in accordance with the governing rules. If Plaintiff wishes to stand on her submission at Dkt No. 25, she shall timely file a letter stating as such. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 01/10/2018. (Bumb, Renee) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
January 8, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #24 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Delaware in response to 12/12/17 Order to Show Cause. Motion set for 2/5/2018 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (LONG, AMBER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Delaware in response to 12/12/17 Order to Show Cause by AVBORNE ACCESSORY GROUP, INC, DOVER CORPORATION, DOVER ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC., RBC BEARINGS INCORPORATED, ROLLER BEARING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC., SARGENT AEROSPACE & DEFENSE, LLC, SARGENT INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In response to 12/12/17 Order to Show Cause Regarding Change of Venue)(SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated December 20, 2017 from William D. Sanders, Esquire, counsel for defendants, with the consent of counsel for plaintiff, the Court hereby GRANTS the request to adjourn the in-person Initial Conference previously set for January 11, 2018, pending the outcome of the Order to Show Cause. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/27/17. (Ramos, Nicole) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
December 20, 2017 Filing 22 Letter from From Defendants' counsel with Plaintiff's consent requesting adjournment of Rule 16 Conference re #10 Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden). (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties shall show cause by written submission, filed on the docket by 1/5/2018, why this case should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/12/2017. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
December 7, 2017 Filing 20 Letter from Defendants' Counsel re #18 Letter, #17 Letter. (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
December 1, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by AMBER ROSE LONG on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LONG, AMBER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 18 Letter from Amber Long to Judge Bumb. (LONG, AMBER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 17 Letter from Amber Long. (LONG, AMBER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 27, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letters #15 and #16 filed by Defendants on 11/22/2017 were submitted incorrectly as Motions. For future reference, please file Letters using the "Letter" event found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Request for Pre-Motion Conference, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Request for Pre-Motion Conference by SARGENT INDUSTRIES, INC.. Responses due by 12/1/2017 (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Request for Pre-Motion Conference ( Responses due by 12/1/2017), MOTION to Dismiss Request for Pre-Motion Conference ( Responses due by 12/1/2017), MOTION to Change Venue Request for Pre-Motion Conference, MOTION for More Definite Statement Request for Pre-Motion Conference ( Responses due by 12/1/2017) by AVBORNE ACCESSORY GROUP, INC, DOVER CORPORATION, DOVER ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC., RBC BEARINGS INCORPORATED, RBC SARGENT AIRTOMIC, RBC SONIC, ROLLER BEARING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC., SARGENT AEROSPACE & DEFENSE, LLC. (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER. The Court has considered #13 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and hereby DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the motion. If, upon reading Defendants' 3-page submission, the Court determines that it needs further information, the Court will so indicate in a subsequent text order. The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to terminate the motion. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/21/2017. (Bumb, Renee) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 20, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for correspondence requesting Pre-Motion Conference by All Defendants. (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 8, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. MANDIA on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MANDIA, JOSEPH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 3, 2017 Clerk's Text Order - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SARGENT AEROSPACE & DEFENSE, LLC, DOVER ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC., SARGENT INDUSTRIES, INC., DOVER CORPORATION, ROLLER BEARING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC., AVBORNE ACCESSORY GROUP, INC, RBC SONIC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/22/2017. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants' Request for Extension of Time.. (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Initial Conference set for 1/11/2018 10:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/2/2017. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 9 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sargent Aerospace & Defense, LLC identifying Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DOVER CORPORATION. (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avborne Accessory Group identifying Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dover Engineered Systems, Inc. identifying Delaware Capital Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sargent Industries, Inc (a dissolved entity). (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sonic Industries, Inc. identifying Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. identifying RBC Bearings, Inc as Corporate Parent.. (SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sargent Aerospace & Defense, LLC, Dover Engineered Systems, Inc., Sargent Industries, Inc (a dissolved entity), DOVER CORPORATION, Avborne Accessory Group, Sonic Industries, Inc., Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. from Superior Court of New Jersey-Middlsex County, Law Division, case number MID-L-5635-17. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8217963), filed by Sargent Aerospace & Defense, LLC, Dover Engineered Systems, Inc., Sargent Industries, Inc (a dissolved entity), DOVER CORPORATION, Avborne Accessory Group, Sonic Industries, Inc., Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(SANDERS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas-Fish v. Avborne Accessory Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Sargent Airtomic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover Corporation
Represented By: Peggy L. Ableman
Represented By: Janine L. Faben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sargent Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Peggy L. Ableman
Represented By: Janine L. Faben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Bearings Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover Engineered Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Peggy L. Ableman
Represented By: Janine L. Faben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: Peggy L. Ableman
Represented By: Janine L. Faben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avborne Accessory Group, Inc.
Represented By: Peggy L. Ableman
Represented By: Janine L. Faben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sargent Aerospace & Defense, LLC
Represented By: Peggy L. Ableman
Represented By: Janine L. Faben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Thomas-Fish
Represented By: David W. deBruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?