Cherwaty v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Gina Cherwaty
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv01196
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 14, 2018 filed by United States of America, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: United States of America answer due 11/14/2018. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/27/2018. (fms)
September 26, 2018 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 14, 2018 - filed by United States of America. (Ibrahim, Alexander)
August 20, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gina Cherwaty. United States of America served on 8/15/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Wasserman, Adam)
August 20, 2018 3 Return of Service Executed by Gina Cherwaty. United States of America served on 8/14/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Wasserman, Adam)
August 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 8, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
August 7, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
August 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed against United States of America - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX030139.) - filed by Gina Cherwaty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherwaty v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Cherwaty
Represented By: Adam F. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?