Anderson v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Marcia A. Anderson
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv01206
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Benderson, Heather)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Within fourteen (14) days from the entry of this Order, an entry of appearance shall be filed identifying the Special Assistant United States Attorney who will appear to defend the Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Within ninety (90) days from filing the entry of appearance, the Acting Commissioner of Social Security shall serve and file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and shall also file the transcript of Social Security proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/7/2018. (jcs)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting D.I. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/16/2018. (nmg)
August 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Nancy A. Berryhill - filed by Marcia A. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Marcia A. Anderson. (crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?