Bank of America, N.A. v. Ackie
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Ahmard Ackie
Case Number: 1:2018cv01228
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, denying request to proceed informa pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee within 30-days or the case shall be dismissed.. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/12/2018. (jcs)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, Plaintiff shall submit IFP long form application and complete all questions. Failure to timely comply with this order may result in denial of the application to proceed without prepayment of fees. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/6/2018. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/16/2018. (nmg) Modified on 8/17/2018 (nmg).
August 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N18L-03-122 DCS - filed by Ahmard Ackie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Ahmard Ackie. (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Ackie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Janet Z. Charlton
Represented By: Chase N. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmard Ackie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?