Grinberger v. Energy XXI Gulf Coast, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rosa Grinberger
Defendant: Gary C. Hanna, Douglas E. Brooks, Gabriel L. Ellisor, Energy XXI Gulf Coast, Inc., Michael S. Bahorich, Charles W. Wampler and Stanford Springel
Case Number: 1:2018cv01233
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Rosa Grinberger (Murray, Daniel)
August 16, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Michael S. Bahorich on 8/16/2018; Douglas E. Brooks on 8/16/2018; Gabriel L. Ellisor on 8/16/2018; Energy XXI Gulf Coast, Inc. on 8/16/2018; Gary C. Hanna on 8/16/2018; Stanford Springel on 8/16/2018; Charles W. Wampler on 8/16/2018. (sar)
August 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01203-MN, 1:18-cv-01233-MN (rjb)
August 10, 2018 No Summons Issued. (rwc)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Michael S. Bahorich, Douglas E. Brooks, Gabriel L. Ellisor, Energy XXI Gulf Coast, Inc., Gary C. Hanna, Stanford Springel, Charles W. Wampler - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2437903.) - filed by Rosa Grinberger. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grinberger v. Energy XXI Gulf Coast, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary C. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas E. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel L. Ellisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy XXI Gulf Coast, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Bahorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Wampler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford Springel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Grinberger
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Murray
Represented By: Ryan M. Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?