Redic Sr. v. Hallcon Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Jewel Redic Sr.
Defendant: Renzenberger, Inc. and Hallcon Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01234
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Defendants' First Interrogatories to Plaintiff, First Request for Production to Plaintiff, and Initial Disclosures along with documents Bates Stamped D000001-D000110 by Hallcon Corporation, Renzenberger, Inc. (DiRocco, Allyson)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julie A. Sims filed by Renzenberger, Inc., Hallcon Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/5/18. (ntl)
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julie A. Sims - filed by Hallcon Corporation, Renzenberger, Inc.. (DiRocco, Allyson)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying filed by Hallcon Corporation, Renzenberger, Inc.. (DiRocco, Allyson)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying filed by Hallcon Corporation, Renzenberger, Inc.. (DiRocco, Allyson)
September 19, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kimberly A. Jones for Hallcon Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kimberly A. Jones filed by Renzenberger, Inc., Hallcon Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/14/18. (ntl)
September 13, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Angeli Murthy for Jewel Redic Sr. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Williams on behalf of Hallcon Corporation, Renzenberger, Inc. (Williams, David)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hallcon Corporation, Renzenberger, Inc..(DiRocco, Allyson)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kimberly A. Jones - filed by Hallcon Corporation, Renzenberger, Inc.. (DiRocco, Allyson)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Britton DiRocco on behalf of Hallcon Corporation, Renzenberger, Inc. (DiRocco, Allyson)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Angeli Murthy, Esq. filed by Jewel Redic Sr. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/20/18. (ntl)
August 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by DLS Services, LLC by serving the registered agent for Defendant Renzenberger, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Jewel Redic Sr.. (Culley, David)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by DLS Services, LLC upon serving the registered agent for Defendant Hallcon Corporation Acknowledgement filed by Jewel Redic Sr.. (Culley, David)
August 13, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Hallcon Corporation on 8/13/2018; Renzenberger, Inc. on 8/13/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Angeli Murthy, Esq. - filed by Jewel Redic Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(sar) Modified on 8/20/2018 (ntl).
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Hallcon Corporation, Renzenberger, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2438103.) - filed by Jewel Redic Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redic Sr. v. Hallcon Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renzenberger, Inc.
Represented By: Allyson Britton DiRocco
Represented By: David H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallcon Corporation
Represented By: Allyson Britton DiRocco
Represented By: David H. Williams
Represented By: Kimberly A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewel Redic Sr.
Represented By: David G. Culley
Represented By: Angeli Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?