Sharma v. Wesley et al
Plaintiff: Amit Sharma
Defendant: Delaware Department of Correction, Julie Petroff, Geoffrey Klopp, Janet Durkee, Christopher Klein, Jennifer Biddle, Carole Evans, Perry Phelps, Marc Richman, Robert Coupe, Steven Wesley, Michael Merson and Correctional Officers Association of Delaware
Case Number: 1:2018cv01250
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jennifer Biddle, Robert Coupe, Delaware Department of Correction, Janet Durkee, Carole Evans, Christopher Klein, Geoffrey Klopp, Michael Merson, Julie Petroff, Perry Phelps, Marc Richman, Steven Wesley.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/18/2018. (Davis, Wilson) Modified on 9/13/2018 (dlw).
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Jennifer Biddle, Robert Coupe, Delaware Department of Correction, Janet Durkee, Carole Evans, Christopher Klein, Geoffrey Klopp, Michael Merson, Julie Petroff, Perry Phelps, Marc Richman, Steven Wesley. (Davis, Wilson) Modified on 9/13/2018 (dlw).
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilson Buckmaster Davis on behalf of Jennifer Biddle, Robert Coupe, Delaware Department of Correction, Janet Durkee, Carole Evans, Christopher Klein, Geoffrey Klopp, Michael Merson, Julie Petroff, Perry Phelps, Marc Richman, Steven Wesley (Davis, Wilson)
August 22, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 16, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Main Document to D.I. 1 has been removed and replaced at the request of counsel. (crb)
August 15, 2018 Remark : Copy of Docket Sheet mailed to Pro-Se Plaintiff. (rwc)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents - from DE Superior CT, Case Number N18C-01-091 ALR (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2440584)- filed by Perry Phelps, Correctional Officers Association of Delaware, Steven Wesley, Janet Durkee, Michael Merson, Carole Evans, Jennifer Biddle, Christopher Klein, Geoffrey Klopp, Robert Coupe, Delaware Department of Correction, Marc Richman, Julie Petroff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/16/2018) (crb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharma v. Wesley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amit Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Department of Correction
Represented By: Adria Benner Martinelli
Represented By: Wilson Buckmaster Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Petroff
Represented By: Adria Benner Martinelli
Represented By: Wilson Buckmaster Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Klopp
Represented By: Adria Benner Martinelli
Represented By: Wilson Buckmaster Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Durkee
Represented By: Adria Benner Martinelli
Represented By: Wilson Buckmaster Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Klein
Represented By: Adria Benner Martinelli
Represented By: Wilson Buckmaster Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Biddle
Represented By: Adria Benner Martinelli
Represented By: Wilson Buckmaster Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carole Evans
Represented By: Adria Benner Martinelli
Represented By: Wilson Buckmaster Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Phelps
Represented By: Adria Benner Martinelli
Represented By: Wilson Buckmaster Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Richman
Represented By: Adria Benner Martinelli
Represented By: Wilson Buckmaster Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Coupe
Represented By: Adria Benner Martinelli
Represented By: Wilson Buckmaster Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wesley
Represented By: Adria Benner Martinelli
Represented By: Wilson Buckmaster Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Merson
Represented By: Adria Benner Martinelli
Represented By: Wilson Buckmaster Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officers Association of Delaware
Represented By: Adria Benner Martinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?