Speakman et al v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Fickes, Brendan Leach, Senior Firefighter Terrance Tate, Aryelle Hope, Kelli Zullo, Simone Cummings, Firefighter Brad Speakman, Alexis Lee, Lieutenant John Cawthray, Benjamin Fickes, David Lee and Laura Fickes
Defendant: Dennis P. Williams, City of Wilmington Delaware, William Patrick, Jr., James M. Baker and Anthony S. Goode
Case Number: 1:2018cv01252
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #32 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to October 15, 2018 filed by Dennis P. Williams. (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Dennis P. Williams answer due 10/15/2018). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/11/2018. (dlw)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SO ORDERED WITH MODIFICATIONS re #31 Stipulation Regarding Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Since the parties did not give the Court any reason why the City of Wilmington should get additional pages for its briefing, the Court reduced the number of pages requested by the City. SEE STIPULATION FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/11/2018. (dlw)
October 11, 2018 Filing 32 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Complaint to October 15, 2018 - filed by Dennis P. Williams. (Perkins, Scott)
October 11, 2018 Filing 31 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by City of Wilmington Delaware. (Kelly, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Nicole Petaja on behalf of Dennis P. Williams (Petaja, Danielle)
October 11, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott W. Perkins on behalf of Dennis P. Williams (Perkins, Scott)
October 11, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by James Darlington Taylor, Jr on behalf of Dennis P. Williams (Taylor, James)
September 19, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Complaint to October 15, 2018 filed by Anthony S. Goode, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Anthony S. Goode answer due 10/15/2018. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/7/2018. (nmf)
September 6, 2018 Filing 27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Complaint to October 15, 2018 - filed by Anthony S. Goode. (Noa, Jesse)
September 5, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Leon Noa on behalf of Anthony S. Goode (Noa, Jesse)
September 5, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Furey McDonough on behalf of Anthony S. Goode (McDonough, Kathleen)
September 5, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The motions for extension of time to respond (D.I. #12 , #19 , #21 ) are GRANTED, but not the extend requested. The time to respond is EXTENDED TO OCTOBER 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/4/2018. (nms)
September 4, 2018 Filing 23 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Mark L. Reardon regarding Defendant Baker's Motion for Extension to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Reardon, Mark)
September 4, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION for Extension of Time, and #19 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by John Cawthray, Simone Cummings, Benjamin Fickes, Joshua Fickes, Laura Fickes, Aryelle Hope, Brendan Leach, Alexis Lee, David Lee, Brad Speakman, Terrance Tate, Kelli Zullo. (Attachments: #1 Tab A, #2 Tab B, #3 Tab C)(Neuberger, Stephen) Modified on 9/4/2018 (nms).
August 31, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by James M. Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Reardon, Mark) Modified on 9/4/2018 (nms).
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORAL ORDER: Plaintiffs are to file a response to Defendant's motion (D.I. #19 ) no later than September 4, 2018. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/31/2018. (nms)
August 30, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by William Patrick, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Shandler, Chad) Modified on 8/31/2018 (nms).
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Kathleen Pedi on behalf of William Patrick, Jr (Pedi, Nicole)
August 30, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Michael Shandler on behalf of William Patrick, Jr (Shandler, Chad)
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Malcolm Cochran, IV on behalf of William Patrick, Jr (Cochran, C.)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORAL ORDER: Plaintiffs are to file a response to Defendant's motion (D.I. #12 ) no later than September 4, 2018. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/30/2018. (nms)
August 30, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 15 has been removed from the docket as it was duplicative of the notice at D.I. #14 . (nms)
August 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L. Reardon on behalf of James M. Baker (Reardon, Mark)
August 29, 2018 Filing 13 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Steven P. Wood, Esq., regarding Emergent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (D.I. #12 ). (Wood, Steven) Modified on 8/30/2018 (nms).
August 29, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint - filed by City of Wilmington Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 7.1.1. Certification)(Wood, Steven) Modified on 8/30/2018 (nms).
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Cawthray, Brendan Leach, Laura Fickes, Brad Speakman, Aryelle Hope, Kelli Zullo, Terrance Tate, Joshua Fickes, Alexis Lee, Simone Cummings, David Lee, Benjamin Fickes. Dennis P. Williams served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Crumplar, Thomas)
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Cawthray, Brendan Leach, Laura Fickes, Brad Speakman, Aryelle Hope, Kelli Zullo, Terrance Tate, Joshua Fickes, Alexis Lee, Simone Cummings, David Lee, Benjamin Fickes. (Crumplar, Thomas)
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Cawthray, Brendan Leach, Laura Fickes, Brad Speakman, Aryelle Hope, Kelli Zullo, Terrance Tate, Joshua Fickes, Alexis Lee, Simone Cummings, David Lee, Benjamin Fickes. (Crumplar, Thomas)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Cawthray, Brendan Leach, Laura Fickes, Brad Speakman, Aryelle Hope, Kelli Zullo, Terrance Tate, Joshua Fickes, Alexis Lee, Simone Cummings, David Lee, Benjamin Fickes. City of Wilmington Delaware served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (Crumplar, Thomas)
August 23, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The summons returned executed filed at D.I. 8, 9, and 10 have been removed from the docket as the incorrect filing event code was used for each. Also the incorrect service date (8/16/2018) was used for the summons relating to the City of Wilmington. Counsel will refile the summons using the "Summons Returned Executed" event code. (nms)
August 22, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 Letter to Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark and The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Steven P. Wood regarding Judicial Assignment. (Wood, Steven)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hayley J. Reese on behalf of City of Wilmington Delaware (Reese, Hayley)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Kurtz Crompton on behalf of City of Wilmington Delaware (Crompton, Dawn)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven P. Wood on behalf of City of Wilmington Delaware (Wood, Steven)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kelly on behalf of City of Wilmington Delaware (Kelly, Michael)
August 16, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to James M. Baker on 8/16/2018; City of Wilmington Delaware on 8/16/2018; Anthony S. Goode on 8/16/2018; William Patrick, Jr on 8/16/2018; Dennis P. Williams on 8/16/2018. (crb)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against James M. Baker, City of Wilmington Delaware, Anthony S. Goode, William Patrick, Jr, Dennis P. Williams - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2440947.) - filed by John Cawthray, Brendan Leach, Laura Fickes, Brad Speakman, Aryelle Hope, Kelli Zullo, Terrance Tate, Joshua Fickes, Alexis Lee, Simone Cummings, David Lee, Benjamin Fickes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(jcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speakman et al v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Fickes
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Represented By: Thomas S. Neuberger
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Stephen J. Neuberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan Leach
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Represented By: Thomas S. Neuberger
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Stephen J. Neuberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senior Firefighter Terrance Tate
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Represented By: Thomas S. Neuberger
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Stephen J. Neuberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aryelle Hope
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Represented By: Thomas S. Neuberger
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Stephen J. Neuberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Zullo
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Represented By: Thomas S. Neuberger
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Stephen J. Neuberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simone Cummings
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Represented By: Thomas S. Neuberger
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Stephen J. Neuberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firefighter Brad Speakman
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Represented By: Thomas S. Neuberger
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Stephen J. Neuberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Lee
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Represented By: Thomas S. Neuberger
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Stephen J. Neuberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lieutenant John Cawthray
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Represented By: Thomas S. Neuberger
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Stephen J. Neuberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Fickes
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Represented By: Thomas S. Neuberger
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Stephen J. Neuberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Represented By: Thomas S. Neuberger
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Stephen J. Neuberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Fickes
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Represented By: Thomas S. Neuberger
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Stephen J. Neuberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis P. Williams
Represented By: Scott W. Perkins
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Represented By: Danielle Nicole Petaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wilmington Delaware
Represented By: Steven P. Wood
Represented By: Dawn Kurtz Crompton
Represented By: Hayley J. Reese
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Patrick, Jr.
Represented By: Chad Michael Shandler
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Pedi
Represented By: C. Malcolm Cochran, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Baker
Represented By: Mark L. Reardon
Represented By: Brian E. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony S. Goode
Represented By: Jesse Leon Noa
Represented By: Kathleen Furey McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?