Clacher v. Resources for Human Development, Inc.

Plaintiff: Angela Clacher
Defendant: Resources for Human Development, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01301
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests Directed to Defendant filed by Angela Clacher.(Fletcher, William)
October 10, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents filed by Resources for Human Development, Inc..(Barkasy, Richard)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Resources for Human Development, Inc..(Barkasy, Richard)
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1) filed by Angela Clacher.(Fletcher, William)
October 10, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The discovery filed at D.I. 15 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall refer to Local Rule 5.4(b) when filing discovery materials. (nms)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 12/5/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2018. Fact Discovery completed by 4/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/6/2019. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/6/2019, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A 3 day Jury Trial is set to start 9/23/2019, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/5/2018. (nms)
October 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 10/5/2018. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) (ksr, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Resources for Human Development, Inc.. (Barkasy, Richard) Modified on 10/4/2018 (nms).
October 1, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Dianna E. Louder, on behalf of Angela Clacher. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service)(Fletcher, William) Modified on 10/1/2018 (nms).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORAL ORDER: The request to appear telephonically for the Rule 16(b) Conference (D.I. #10 ) is APPROVED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/24/2018. (nms)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from William D. Fletcher, Jr., Esq., regarding request to participate by telephone at the R16(b) Conference. (Fletcher, William) Modified on 9/24/2018 (nms).
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/5/2018, at 2:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/21/2018. (nms)
September 20, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jo Bennett,Samantha Banks for Resources for Human Development, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Pereira on behalf of Resources for Human Development, Inc. (Barkasy, Richard) Modified on 9/20/2018 (nms).
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samantha Banks, filed by Resources for Human Development, Inc., and #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jo Bennett, filed by Resources for Human Development, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/18/2018. (nms)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jo Bennett - filed by Resources for Human Development, Inc.. (Barkasy, Richard)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samantha Banks - filed by Resources for Human Development, Inc.. (Barkasy, Richard)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Resources for Human Development, Inc.. (Barkasy, Richard)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, by Resources for Human Development, Inc..(Barkasy, Richard) Modified on 9/17/2018 (nms).
August 29, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Clacher. Resources for Human Development, Inc. served on 8/24/2018, answer due 9/14/2018. (Fletcher, William)
August 23, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Resources for Human Development, Inc. on 8/23/2018. (rwc)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Resources for Human Development, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 30209.) - filed by Angela Clacher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clacher v. Resources for Human Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resources for Human Development, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Alan Barkasy
Represented By: Daniel M. Pereira
Represented By: Jo Bennett
Represented By: Samantha Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Clacher
Represented By: William D. Fletcher, Jr.
Represented By: Dianna E. Louder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?