Ethicon LLC et al v. Intuitive Surgical Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Ethicon LLC and Ethicon US, LLC
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical Holdings, LLC, Intuitive Surgical Inc. and Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01325
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Telephone Conference is set for 11/26/2018 at 12:00 PM before Judge Christopher J. Burke to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/25/2018. (dlb)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), to hear and resolve all discovery disputes. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/25/18. (ntl)
October 23, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Discovery due by 11/22/2019. Status Report due by 9/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/23/2020. An Oral Argument is set for 6/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 6/14/2019. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 7/12/2019. A Markman Hearing is set for 9/23/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/21/2020. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A 7-day Jury Trial is set for 10/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/22/18. (ntl)
October 9, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Identification of Accused Products, Asserted Patents, and Damages Model filed by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Ethicon LLC, Ethicon US, LLC.(Egan, Brian)
October 8, 2018 Filing 16 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian P. Egan regarding proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Egan, Brian)
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 Remark: Counsel shall be prepared at the hearing on Monday to address the Motion for a Conference with the Court and Limited Discovery (in 18-1325) as well as the motion to strike (in 17-871). Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00871-LPS, 1:18-cv-01325-LPS (ntl)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding request for hearing or conference - re #8 MOTION for Hearing -- Ethicon's Motion for a Conference with the Court and Limited Discovery Before the Parties' Rule 26(F) Conference --. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth S. Weiswasser, Anish R. Desai, Christopher T. Marando, Christopher M. Pepe, Matthew D. Sieger and Diane P. Sullivan filed by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Ethicon LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/21/18. (ntl)
September 19, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Intuitive Surgical Holdings, LLC, Intuitive Surgical Inc., Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc..(Fry, David)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION for Hearing -- Ethicon's Motion for a Conference with the Court and Limited Discovery Before the Parties' Rule 26(F) Conference -- filed by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Ethicon LLC, Ethicon US, LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Hearing -- Ethicon's Motion for a Conference with the Court and Limited Discovery Before the Parties' Rule 26(F) Conference -- filed by Intuitive Surgical Holdings, LLC, Intuitive Surgical Inc., Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/21/2018. (Shaw, John)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth S. Weiswasser, Anish R. Desai, Christopher T. Marando, Christopher M. Pepe, Matthew D. Sieger and Diane P. Sullivan - filed by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Ethicon LLC, Ethicon US, LLC. (Egan, Brian)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' response to Plaintiff's motion (D.I. 8) is due no later than September 14. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/7/18. (ntl)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Hearing -- Ethicon's Motion for a Conference with the Court and Limited Discovery Before the Parties' Rule 26(F) Conference -- - filed by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Ethicon LLC, Ethicon US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7)(Egan, Brian)
August 29, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon LLC, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc.. Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon LLC, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc.. Intuitive Surgical Inc. served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon LLC, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc.. Intuitive Surgical Holdings, LLC served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 27, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Intuitive Surgical Holdings, LLC on 8/27/2018; Intuitive Surgical Inc. on 8/27/2018; Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. on 8/27/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Ethicon LLC, Ethicon US, LLC filed by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Ethicon LLC, Ethicon US, LLC. (sar)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,844,369 B2 ;7,490,749 B2 ;8,602,288 B2 ;8,602,287 B2 ;9,326,770 B2. (sar)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infrengement filed with Jury Demand against Intuitive Surgical Holdings, LLC, Intuitive Surgical Inc., Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2447670.) - filed by Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon LLC, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar) Modified on 8/27/2018 (sar).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ethicon LLC et al v. Intuitive Surgical Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethicon US, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David M. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical Inc.
Represented By: David M. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?