3Shape Trios A/S v. Align Technology, Inc.

Plaintiff: 3Shape Trios A/S
Defendant: Align Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01332
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2018 16 STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by 3Shape Trios A/S. (Grivner, Geoffrey)
October 19, 2018 15 MOTION to Withdraw #14 Letter, - filed by 3Shape Trios A/S. (Grivner, Geoffrey)
October 19, 2018 14 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Geoffrey G. Grivner regarding Proposed Scheduling Order and Status Conference Date - re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated and [Proposed] Briefing Schedule)(Grivner, Geoffrey)
October 17, 2018 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Shaw, John)
October 17, 2018 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Align Technology, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2018. (Shaw, John)
October 17, 2018 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaw, John)
September 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas Brown, Thomas A. Counts, Abigail H. Wald, Grant N. Margeson, and Noah B. Pinegar for Align Technology, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 25, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas A Counts, Thomas Brown, Abigail Wald, Grant Margeson and Noah Pinegar filed by Align Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/25/18. (ntl)
September 19, 2018 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas A Counts, Thomas Brown, Abigail Wald, Grant Margeson and Noah Pinegar - filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Shaw, John)
September 14, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER re #6 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Align Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/14/18. (ntl)
September 13, 2018 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Shaw, John)
September 13, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gretchen L. Jankowski for 3Shape Trios A/S added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
September 13, 2018 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by 3Shape Trios A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Grivner, Geoffrey)
September 12, 2018 6 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by Align Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Shaw, John)
September 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Derek Ludwin for 3Shape Trios A/S added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Wendelynne J. Newton for 3Shape Trios A/S added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 10, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ross Demain,Carrie G. Amezcua,Sonia Lahr-Pastor for 3Shape Trios A/S added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
September 5, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wendelynne J. Newton, Gretchen L. Jankowski, S. Lloyd Smith, Carrie G. Amezcua, Derek Ludwin, Ross Demain and Sonia Lahr-Pastor filed by 3Shape Trios A/S. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/5/18. (ntl)
August 29, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 28, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 3Shape Trios A/S. Align Technology, Inc. served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Grivner, Geoffrey)
August 28, 2018 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Clausen Engineering APS, Other Affiliate Deichmann Media APS for 3Shape Trios A/S filed by 3Shape Trios A/S. (Grivner, Geoffrey)
August 28, 2018 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wendelynne J. Newton, Gretchen L. Jankowski, S. Lloyd Smith, Carrie G. Amezcua, Derek Ludwin, Ross Demain and Sonia Lahr-Pastor - filed by 3Shape Trios A/S. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance of Carrie G. Amezcua, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Carrie G. Amezcua, #3 Certificate of Compliance of Ross Demain, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Ross Demain, #5 Certificate of Compliance of Gretchen L. Jankowski, #6 Text of Proposed Order for Gretchen L. Jankowski, #7 Certificate of Compliance of Sonia Lahr-Pastor, #8 Text of Proposed Order for Sonia Lahr-Pastor, #9 Certificate of Compliance of Derek Ludwin, #10 Text of Proposed Order for Derek Ludwin, #11 Certificate of Compliance of Wendelynne J. Newton, #12 Text of Proposed Order for Wendelynne J. Newton, #13 Certificate of Compliance of S. Lloyd Smith, #14 Text of Proposed Order for S. Lloyd Smith)(Grivner, Geoffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/28/2018) (nmg).
August 28, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Align Technology, Inc. on 8/28/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
August 28, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
August 28, 2018 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Align Technology, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2448302.) - filed by 3Shape Trios A/S. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3Shape Trios A/S v. Align Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3Shape Trios A/S
Represented By: Geoffrey Graham Grivner
Represented By: Sonia Lahr-Pastor
Represented By: Carrie G. Amezcua
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Represented By: Ross Demain
Represented By: Wendelynne J. Newton
Represented By: Gretchen L. Jankowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Align Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Noah B. Pinegar
Represented By: Thomas A. Counts
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Thomas Brown
Represented By: Abigail H. Wald
Represented By: Grant N. Margeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?