In re: Paragon Offshore PLC et al.

Defendant: Paragon Offshore PLC et al.
Appellee: Noble Holding International (Luxembourg) S.A.R.L., Michael A. Cawley, Jon A. Marshall, Gordon T. Hall, Mary P. Ricciardello, Noble Corporation Holdings LTD., Julie H. Edwards, James A. MacLennan, Noble Holding International (Luxembourg NHIL) S.A.R.L., David W. Williams, Julie J. Robertson, Noble FDR Holdings Limited, Noble Corporation and Noble Corporation PLC
Appellant: Paragon Litigation Trust
Case Number: 1:2018cv01345
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2018 16 Appellee's BRIEF by Michael A. Cawley, Julie H. Edwards, Gordon T. Hall, James A. MacLennan, Jon A. Marshall, Noble Corporation, Noble Corporation Holdings LTD., Noble Corporation PLC, Noble FDR Holdings Limited, Noble Holding International (Luxembourg NHIL) S.A.R.L., Noble Holding International (Luxembourg) S.A.R.L., Mary P. Ricciardello, Julie J. Robertson, David W. Williams. Appellant Reply Brief due by 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificiate of Service)(Clark, Anthony)
October 10, 2018 15 Appellant's BRIEF by Paragon Litigation Trust. Appellee Brief due by 10/29/2018. (Neiburg, Michael)
October 4, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER re (18 in 1:18-cv-01277-LPS)(12 in 1:18-cv-01345-LPS) MOTION to Seal Document: Apellants-Cross-Appellees Unopposed Motion For Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 105 And 107(B) And Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(f) And 8013 Accepting Under Seal Documents Designated For Inclusion In Record On Appeal
October 4, 2018 13 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: Having received a recommendation (D.I. #15 in 18-1277 and D.I. #9 in 18-1345) from Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge that this matter be withdrawn from the mandatory referral for mediation and proceed through the appellate process of this Court, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the recommendation is ACCEPTED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/4/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01277-LPS, 1:18-cv-01345-LPS (ntl)
October 1, 2018 12 MOTION to Seal Document: Apellants-Cross-Appellees Unopposed Motion For Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 105 And 107(B) And Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(f) And 8013 Accepting Under Seal Documents Designated For Inclusion In Record On Appeal - filed by Michael A. Cawley, Julie H. Edwards, Gordon T. Hall, James A. MacLennan, Jon A. Marshall, Noble Corporation, Noble Corporation Holdings LTD., Noble Corporation PLC, Noble FDR Holdings Limited, Noble Holding International (Luxembourg NHIL) S.A.R.L., Noble Holding International (Luxembourg) S.A.R.L., Mary P. Ricciardello, Julie J. Robertson, David W. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Clark, Anthony)
October 1, 2018 11 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Michael A. Cawley, Julie H. Edwards, Gordon T. Hall, James A. MacLennan, Jon A. Marshall, Noble Corporation, Noble Corporation Holdings LTD., Noble Corporation PLC, Noble FDR Holdings Limited, Noble Holding International (Luxembourg NHIL) S.A.R.L., Noble Holding International (Luxembourg) S.A.R.L., Mary P. Ricciardello, Julie J. Robertson, David W. Williams Appellants-Cross-Appellees Designation Of Additional Items To Be Included In The Record On Appeal (Clark, Anthony)
September 24, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (16 in 1:18-cv-01277-LPS) Stipulation and Order Establishing Briefing Schedule for Bankruptcy Appeal. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01277-LPS, 1:18-cv-01345-LPS (ntl)
September 21, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (10 in 1:18-cv-01277-LPS, 4 in 1:18-cv-01345-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James O. Johnston, Gregory M. Shumaker, and David S. Torborg filed by Paragon Litigation Trust. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/21/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01277-LPS, 1:18-cv-01345-LPS (ntl)
September 19, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01277-LPS, 1:18-cv-01345-LPS (rjb)
September 17, 2018 10 STIPULATION And Proposed Order Establishing Briefing Schedule For Bankruptcy Appeal by Michael A. Cawley, Julie H. Edwards, Gordon T. Hall, James A. MacLennan, Jon A. Marshall, Noble Corporation, Noble Corporation Holdings LTD., Noble Corporation PLC, Noble FDR Holdings Limited, Noble Holding International (Luxembourg NHIL) S.A.R.L., Noble Holding International (Luxembourg) S.A.R.L., Mary P. Ricciardello, Julie J. Robertson, David W. Williams. (Clark, Anthony)
September 17, 2018 9 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/14/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01277-CFC, 1:18-cv-01345-CFC(cak)
September 17, 2018 8 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Paragon Litigation Trust // Appellee and Cross-Appellant the Paragon Litigation Trust's Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues on Cross-Appeal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Neiburg, Michael)
September 14, 2018 7 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: The parties are to file their proposed briefing schedule for review by Judge Connolly. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/14/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01277-CFC, 1:18-cv-01345-CFC(cak)
September 14, 2018 6 Appellee's BRIEF by Michael A. Cawley, Julie H. Edwards, Gordon T. Hall, James A. MacLennan, Jon A. Marshall, Noble Corporation, Noble Corporation Holdings LTD., Noble Corporation PLC, Noble FDR Holdings Limited, Noble Holding International (Luxembourg NHIL) S.A.R.L., Noble Holding International (Luxembourg) S.A.R.L., Mary P. Ricciardello, Julie J. Robertson, David W. Williams. Appellant Reply Brief due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clark, Anthony)
September 14, 2018 5 OBJECTIONS by Paragon Litigation Trust // The Paragon Litigation Trust's Response to Appellants' Brief in Support of the Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Mediation and Scheduling (related to D.I. 8 in Civ. Act. No. 18-cv-1277). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Neiburg, Michael)
September 11, 2018 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James O. Johnston, Gregory M. Shumaker, and David S. Torborg - filed by Paragon Litigation Trust. (Neiburg, Michael)
September 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 4, 2018 3 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Tuesday, September 25, 2018, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerk's Office of the District Court. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/4/2018. (fms)
August 30, 2018 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Cross-Appeal. (ceg) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/30/2018) (ceg).
August 30, 2018 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (ceg)
August 30, 2018 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (ceg)
August 30, 2018 1 Featured Case Notice of CROSS-APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 8/6/2018 by Judge Christopher S. Sontchi in Bankruptcy case number 16-10386 CSS. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Paragon Litigation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Opinion, #2 Order, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Paragon Offshore PLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragon Offshore PLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Noble Holding International (Luxembourg) S.A.R.L.
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael A. Cawley
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jon A. Marshall
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gordon T. Hall
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mary P. Ricciardello
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Noble Corporation Holdings LTD.
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Julie H. Edwards
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: James A. MacLennan
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Noble Holding International (Luxembourg NHIL) S.A.R.L.
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: David W. Williams
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Julie J. Robertson
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Noble FDR Holdings Limited
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Noble Corporation
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Noble Corporation PLC
Represented By: Anthony W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Paragon Litigation Trust
Represented By: Pauline K. Morgan
Represented By: Jaime Luton Chapman
Represented By: Joel Alan Waite
Represented By: Michael Sean Neiburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?