Martinson Industries, LLC v. North American Rescue, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Martinson Industries, LLC
Defendant: North American Rescue, LLC and North American Rescue Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01358
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME in which defendants North American Rescue, LLC and North American Rescue Holdings, LLC have to answer the Complaint to November 8, 2018 filed by Martinson Industries, LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: North American Rescue Holdings, LLC answer due 11/8/2018; North American Rescue, LLC answer due 11/8/2018. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/4/2018. (fms)
October 4, 2018 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME in which defendants North American Rescue, LLC and North American Rescue Holdings, LLC have to answer the Complaint to November 8, 2018 - filed by Martinson Industries, LLC. (Ying, Jennifer)
September 19, 2018 7 Return of Service Executed by Martinson Industries, LLC. North American Rescue Holdings, LLC served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Ying, Jennifer)
September 19, 2018 6 Return of Service Executed by Martinson Industries, LLC. North American Rescue, LLC served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Ying, Jennifer)
September 10, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean L. Sweeney of Tredecim LLC filed by Martinson Industries, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/10/2018. (fms)
September 10, 2018 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean L. Sweeney of Tredecim LLC - filed by Martinson Industries, LLC. (Ying, Jennifer)
September 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 31, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to North American Rescue Holdings, LLC on 8/31/2018; North American Rescue, LLC on 8/31/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (jcs)
August 31, 2018 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Martinson Industries, LLC. (jcs)
August 31, 2018 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,737,100 ;9,861,145. (jcs)
August 31, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs)
August 31, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against North American Rescue Holdings, LLC, North American Rescue, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2451608.) - filed by Martinson Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinson Industries, LLC v. North American Rescue, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martinson Industries, LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jennifer Ying
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Rescue, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Rescue Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?