Genentech, Inc. v. Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Genentech, Inc. and City of Hope
Defendant: Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01363
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Referring Judge: Gregory M Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 161 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s)6,331,415 ;7,923,221 ;6,407,213 ;7,846,441 ;7,892,549; 6,627,196 ;7,371,379 ;6,339,142 ;6,417,335 ;9,249,218; 8,574,869 ;7,993,834 ;8,076,066 ;8,425,908 ;8,440,402; 6,610,516 ;7,390,660 ;7,485,704 ;7,807,799 ;8,512,983; 9,714,293. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Dismissal)(nmf)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 SO ORDERED, re #159 STIPULATION of Dismissal. (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/1/2019. (nmf)
June 28, 2019 Filing 159 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER, Whereas the Court has read the parties' Joint Status Report filed on June 24, 2019 and whereas the Court had determined that live expert testimony will be necessary to resolve the issue of indefiniteness with respect to the following fermentation claim limitation, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall each submit by July 3, 2019 a letter limited to 350 words and in 14-point font that addresses whether such live testimony should be adduced at a hearing in September 2019 or at trial. The parties shall specifically address in their letters the extent to which the case would be streamlined (or not streamlined) and resources would be saved (or not saved) were the Court to address before trial the question of whether the claim limitation is indefinite. See HIP, Inc. v. Hormel Foods Corp. et al., 2019 WL 2579266 (D. Del. June 24, 2019) (dismissing case in its entirety because of ruling that claim limitation was indefinite). Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/28/2019. (nmf)
June 24, 2019 Filing 158 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Court's Markman Orders by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Silver, Daniel)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER re claim construction. Setting Deadlines: ( Status Report due by 6/24/2019.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/14/2019. (fms)
June 14, 2019 Filing 156 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/14/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(fms)
June 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Rana Sawaya for Genentech, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf)
June 10, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark D. McBriar for Genentech, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 7, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laura Logsdon for Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher J. Glancy for Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
May 30, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stephanie Lin for Genentech, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
May 29, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chang Hoon Choi on June 7, 2019 and June 8, 2019 filed by Genentech, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
May 29, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Taehuei Lee on June 6, 2019 and June 7, 2019 filed by Genentech, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
May 29, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ki Tae Bong on June 5, 2019 and June 6, 2019 filed by Genentech, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
May 29, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hyejung Na on May 31, 2019 and June 1, 2019 filed by Genentech, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
May 29, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chul Kim on May 29, 2019 and May 30, 2019 filed by Genentech, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
May 29, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's: (1) Responses to Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.'s First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-20) and (2) Responses to Defendant's First Set of Common Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-100) filed by Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
May 29, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories [Confidential Discovery Material - Subject to Protective Order]; and Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission [Confidential Discovery Material-Subject to Protective Order] filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Moore, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paul McDonald on May 31, 2019 filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Moore, David)
May 29, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yoonseok Lee on May 30 and 31, 2019 filed by Genentech, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
May 28, 2019 Filing 146 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephanie Lin - filed by Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #145 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Logsdon of White & Case LLP filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/28/2019. (fms)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #146 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephanie Lin filed by Genentech, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/28/2019. (fms)
May 23, 2019 Filing 145 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Logsdon of White & Case LLP - filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.. (Moore, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tae-Soo Lee on May 24, 2019 and May 25, 2019 filed by Genentech, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
May 22, 2019 Filing 143 REDACTED VERSION of #138 Notice (Other) Notice of Subpoena by Genentech, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
May 22, 2019 Filing 142 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicole Fontaine Dooley of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP - filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #139 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher J. Glancy Of Counsel to White & Case LLP filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/22/2019. (fms)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #141 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark D. McBriar, Ph.D. and Laura Macro. Ph.D. filed by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/22/2019. (fms)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #142 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicole Fontaine Dooley of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP filed by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/22/2019. (fms)
May 21, 2019 Filing 141 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark D. McBriar, Ph.D. and Laura Macro. Ph.D. - filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
May 21, 2019 Filing 140 REDACTED VERSION of #136 Notice (Other) of Subpoena by Genentech, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
May 21, 2019 Filing 139 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher J. Glancy Of Counsel to White & Case LLP - filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.. (Moore, David)
May 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Discovery Conference held on 5/16/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01407-CFC, 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(nmf)
May 15, 2019 Filing 138 [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Genentech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rawnsley, Jason)
May 15, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Laird on May 16, 2019 filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Moore, David)
May 14, 2019 Filing 136 [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Genentech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Rawnsley, Jason)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 SO ORDERED, re (133 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Stipulation filed by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope. Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: ( Fact Discovery completed by 6/10/2019., Opening Expert Reports due by 7/26/2019., Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 9/6/2019., Reply Expert Reports due by 9/20/2019, Expert Discovery due by 10/11/2019.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/14/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(fms)
May 13, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Samsung's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Confidential Discovery Material - Subject to Protective Order) filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Palapura, Bindu)
May 10, 2019 Filing 133 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadlines for Fact and Expert Discovery by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
May 10, 2019 Filing 132 REDACTED VERSION of #128 Notice (Other) of Subpoena Directed to Sigma-Aldrich Corp. by Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
May 10, 2019 Filing 131 REDACTED VERSION of #127 Notice (Other) of Subpoena Directed to Hyclone Laboratories, Inc. by Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
May 8, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Shak on May 11, 2019 filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Moore, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sharon Baughman on May 9, 2019 filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Moore, David)
May 3, 2019 Filing 128 [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena Directed to Sigma-Aldrich Corp. by Genentech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Subpoena)(Rawnsley, Jason)
May 3, 2019 Filing 127 [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena Directed to Hyclone Laboratories, Inc. by Genentech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Subpoena)(Rawnsley, Jason)
May 3, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas upon Scripps Memorial Hospital by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. (O'Byrne, Stephanie)
May 3, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas upon Providence Medical Center by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. (O'Byrne, Stephanie)
May 3, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas upon The University of California San Francisco by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. (O'Byrne, Stephanie)
May 3, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas upon Memorial Sloan-Kettering Cancer Center by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. (O'Byrne, Stephanie)
May 3, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas upon Southwest Washington Medical Center by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. (O'Byrne, Stephanie)
May 2, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoenas upon Brian Leyland-Jones by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. (O'Byrne, Stephanie)
May 2, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yung-Hsiang Kao on May 3, 2019 filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Palapura, Bindu)
April 29, 2019 Filing 119 REDACTED VERSION of #109 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal with Respect to Certain Asserted Patents and City of Hope by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
April 29, 2019 Filing 118 REDACTED VERSION of #108 Letter to Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Stipulation and [Proposed] Order regarding Claim Construction by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
April 29, 2019 Filing 117 REDACTED VERSION of #107 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Claim Construction of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,627,196, 7,371,379, 7,485,704 snf 10,160,811 by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
April 29, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice filed by Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
April 29, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Samsung's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Palapura, Bindu)
April 29, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Leon Miniovich for Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
April 25, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leon Miniovich of White & Case LLP - filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.. (O'Byrne, Stephanie)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #114 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leon Miniovich of White & Case LLP filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/25/2019. (fms)
April 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Markman Hearing held on 4/24/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(nmf)
April 23, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 [SEALED] SO ORDERED re #109 [SEALED] STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal With Respect to Certain Asserted Patents and City of Hope. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/22/2019.This order has been emailed to local counsel. (nmf)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 [SEALED] SO ORDERED re #107 [SEALED] STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Claim Construction of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,627,196, 7,371,379, 7,485,704 and 10,160,811. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/22/2019.This order has been emailed to local counsel. (nmf)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Rescheduling Hearings: In light of the parties' resolution of certain issues, the Markman hearing will now begin at 11:00 A.M. on 4/24/2019 in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/23/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(nmf)
April 22, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Corrected Responses and Objections to First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-8) filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
April 22, 2019 Filing 109 [SEALED] STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal With Respect to Certain Asserted Patents and City of Hope by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 22, 2019 Filing 108 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Stipulation and Order regarding claim construction - re #107 Stipulation. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 22, 2019 Filing 107 [SEALED] STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Claim Construction of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,627,196, 7,371,379, 7,485,704 and 10,160,811 by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 106 REDACTED VERSION of #92 Notice to Take Deposition of Samsung Bioepis Ltd. by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
April 15, 2019 Filing 105 RESPONSE to Order re Oral Order, REDLINE Version of Joint Claim Construction Brief. (Silver, Daniel)
April 15, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs Genentech, Inc. and City of Hope (Nos. 1-100) filed by Amgen Inc..(Ormerod, Eve)
April 15, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.'s First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs Genentech, Inc. and City of Hope (Confidential Subject to Protective Order) filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Palapura, Bindu)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 SO ORDERED, re (130 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 98 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Stipulation and Order on Coordinated Discovery filed by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/15/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(fms)
April 12, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Genentech, Inc. and City of Hope's (1) First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Samsung Bioepis Ltd., (2) Second Set of Interrogatories to Samsung Bioepis Ltd., and (3) Third Request for Production of Documents and Things to Samsung Bioepis Ltd. (70-74) filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
April 12, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Genentech, Inc. on a date or dates to be determined as mutually convenient for both parties filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Moore, David)
April 11, 2019 Filing 99 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding filing of revised claim construction submissions - re (116 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 91 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Letter. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 11, 2019 Filing 98 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order on Coordinated Discovery by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope. (Silver, Daniel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 97 DECLARATION re (121 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (94 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief Revised Declaration of Susan Sharfstein, Ph.D. by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
April 10, 2019 Filing 96 DECLARATION re (121 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (94 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief Revised Declaration of Jeffrey Chalmers, Ph.D. by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
April 10, 2019 Filing 95 APPENDIX re (60 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 48 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Claim Construction Chart, Revised Appendix C to Joint Claim Construction Chart by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix C Volume I, #2 Appendix C Volume II, #3 Appendix C Volume III)(Rawnsley, Jason)
April 10, 2019 Filing 94 Joint CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
April 10, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-8) filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
April 9, 2019 Filing 92 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Samsung Bioepis Ltd. on pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
April 4, 2019 Filing 91 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding revision to claim construction submissions. (Cottrell, Frederick)
March 28, 2019 Filing 90 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Bindu A. Palapura regarding April 24, 2019 Markman Hearing. (Palapura, Bindu)
March 22, 2019 Filing 89 Second DECLARATION re (101 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (78 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief (Nancy Lynn Schroeder) by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
March 22, 2019 Filing 88 DECLARATION re (101 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (78 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief (Amit H. Thakore) by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cottrell, Frederick)
March 22, 2019 Filing 87 DECLARATION re (101 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (78 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief (Eamonn Gardner) by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16)(Cottrell, Frederick)
March 22, 2019 Filing 86 DECLARATION re (101 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (78 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief (John A. Glaspy, M.D., M.P.H.) by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
March 22, 2019 Filing 85 DECLARATION re (101 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (78 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief (Susan Sharfstein, Ph.D.) by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 4-9, #3 Exhibit 10-19; 21, 36)(Cottrell, Frederick)
March 22, 2019 Filing 84 DECLARATION re (101 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (78 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief (Michael F. Press, M.D., Ph.D.) by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cottrell, Frederick)
March 22, 2019 Filing 83 DECLARATION re (101 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (78 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief (Jeffrey Chalmers, Ph.D.) by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 7-8, #3 Exhibit 9 (Part 1), #4 Exhibit 9 (Part 2), #5 Exhibit 10-15)(Cottrell, Frederick)
March 22, 2019 Filing 82 DECLARATION re (101 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (78 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief (Michelle S. Rhyu) by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Cottrell, Frederick)
March 22, 2019 Filing 81 DECLARATION re (101 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (78 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief (Dr. Hansjorg Hauser) by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
March 22, 2019 Filing 80 DECLARATION re (101 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (78 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief (Dr. Holly Prentice) by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
March 22, 2019 Filing 79 DECLARATION re (101 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (78 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief (Nancy Lynn Schroeder) by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Cottrell, Frederick)
March 22, 2019 Filing 78 Joint CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
March 20, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Claim Construction Sur Reply Brief; (2) Declaration of Eamonn Gardner in Support of Defendants' Claim Construction Sur-Reply Brief; (3) Declaration of Amit H. Thakore in Support of Defendants' Claim Construction Sur-Reply Brief; and (4) all exhibits thereto filed by Amgen Inc..(Ormerod, Eve)
March 18, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Samsung's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Confidential Discovery Material - Subject to Protective Order) filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Palapura, Bindu)
March 12, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Palapura, Bindu)
March 6, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Reply Claim Construction Brief; (2) Declaration of Nancy Lynn Schroeder In Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Silver, Daniel)
February 22, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael F. Press, M.D., Ph.D. on February 28, 2019 filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
February 22, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Jeffrey Chalmers on February 28, 2019 filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
February 22, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John A. Glaspy, M.D. on February 24, 2019 filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
February 22, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Susan Sharfstein on March 1, 2019 filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
February 21, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Samsung Bioepis Ltd. filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
February 21, 2019 Filing 68 ANSWER to #66 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim [Plaintiffs Genentech, Inc. and City of Hope's Answer to Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.'s Counterclaims] by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
February 19, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Answering Claim Construction Brief; (2) Declaration of Susan Sharfstein, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Answering Claim Construction Brief; (3) Declaration of Michelle S. Rhyu in Support of Defendants' Answering Claim Construction Brief; (4) Declaration of Michael F. Press, M.D., Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Answering Claim Construction Brief; (5) Declaration of John A. Glaspy, M.D., M.P.H. in Support of Defendants' Answering Claim Construction Brief; (6) Declaration of Jeffrey Chalmers, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Answering Claim Construction Brief; and (7) all exhibits thereto filed by Amgen Inc..(Ormerod, Eve)
February 1, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney John P. Padro for Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
January 31, 2019 Filing 66 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #63 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Palapura, Bindu)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #65 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John P. Padro of White & Case LLP filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/25/2019. (fms)
January 24, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John P. Padro of White & Case LLP - filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.. (Moore, David)
January 23, 2019 Filing 64 REDACTED VERSION of #59 Letter by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.. (Palapura, Bindu)
January 17, 2019 Filing 63 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.- filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-U)(nmf)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SO ORDERED, re #56 STIPULATION and Order Regarding Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/17/2019. (nmf)
January 17, 2019 PATENT REPORT NOTICE: Please note that if patents are being added to this case, the filing party should complete the Report to Commissioner of Patents & Trademarks, and enter it on the docket using the PATENT/TRADEMARK REPORT event in the OTHER DOCUMENT list. The patent report form can be found at www.ded.uscourts.gov under the Clerk's Office FORMS button. (nmf)
January 15, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rana Sawaya, Ph.D. - filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #61 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rana Sawaya, Ph.D. filed by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/15/2019. (fms)
January 14, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-76) filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
January 14, 2019 Filing 59 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Bindu A. Palapura regarding case status. (Palapura, Bindu)
January 11, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Opening Claim Construction Brief, Declaration of Nancy Lynn Schroeder and Exhibits, Declaration of Dr. Hauser and Declaration of Dr. Prentice filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
January 11, 2019 Filing 57 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Supplemental Joint Claim Construction Chart - re (48 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC, 60 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) Claim Construction Chart,. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Cottrell, Frederick)
January 11, 2019 Filing 56 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Amended Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A-U to Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Cottrell, Frederick)
January 4, 2019 Filing 55 ANSWER to #51 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Cottrell, Frederick)
January 4, 2019 Filing 54 REDACTED VERSION of #47 Declaration, by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Ewing, Alexandra)
January 2, 2019 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of the SEALED DECLARATION re 46 Opening Brief in Support, 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dismiss Count IX of Defendant's Counterclaims Regarding Unenforceability of the '213 Patent) (Declaration of Andrew J. Danford) by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc. (D.I. 47). (fms)
December 27, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, D.I. 52 (Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1) filed on 12/21/2018 has been removed from the docket as it was filed in error. Also, the docket text of D.I. #51 has been adjusted to reflect that it is an AMENDED Answer. (fms)
December 26, 2018 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dismiss Count IX of Defendant's Counterclaims Regarding Unenforceability of the '213 Patent) filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.. (Palapura, Bindu)
December 21, 2018 Filing 51 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against City of Hope, Genentech, Inc. by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(O'Byrne, Stephanie) Modified on 12/27/2018 (fms).
December 17, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-76) filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Moore, David)
December 12, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Samsung's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things and Samsung's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Palapura, Bindu)
December 11, 2018 Filing 48 CLAIM Construction Chart by Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix C, Vol 1, #2 Appendix C, Vol 2, #3 Appendix C, Vol 3, #4 Appendix C, Vol 4, #5 Appendix C, Vol 5, #6 Appendix C, Vol 6, #7 Appendix C, Vol 7A, #8 Appendix C, Vol 7B, #9 Appendix C, Vol 8, #10 Appendix C, Vol 9, #11 Appendix C, Vol 10A, #12 Appendix C, Vol 10B, #13 Appendix C, Vol 11, #14 Appendix C, Vol 12)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 10, 2018 Filing 47 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #46 Opening Brief in Support, #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dismiss Count IX of Defendant's Counterclaims Regarding Unenforceability of the '213 Patent) (Declaration of Andrew J. Danford) by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Rawnsley, Jason)
December 10, 2018 Filing 46 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dismiss Count IX of Defendant's Counterclaims Regarding Unenforceability of the '213 Patent) filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/24/2018. (Rawnsley, Jason)
December 10, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dismiss Count IX of Defendant's Counterclaims Regarding Unenforceability of the '213 Patent) - filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rawnsley, Jason)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (44 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC, 95 in 1:18-cv-00095-CFC, 59 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a Joint Claim Construction Chart to December 11, 2018 filed by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope, Hoffmann-La Roche Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/10/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00095-CFC, 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(fms)
December 7, 2018 Filing 44 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a Joint Claim Construction Chart to December 11, 2018 - filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen)
December 3, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 5(b)(ii) of the ESI Order of Plaintiffs' Non-Inventor Custodians and Non-Custodial Data Sources filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
December 3, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.'s Identification of Custodians and Non-Custodial Data Sources filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Palapura, Bindu)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 [SEALED] ORDER. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/30/2018.This order has been emailed to local counsel. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00095-CFC, 1:17-cv-01672-CFC, 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01025-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(nmf)
November 28, 2018 Filing 40 ORAL ORDER: This matter has been referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for ADR. Counsel are to advise on or before Wednesday, December 12, 2018, by email to Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Ms. Kennedy, as well as opposing counsel, their clients interest in mediation and the timing when mediation is preferred with a very brief explanation why. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/28/18. (cak)Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01672-CFC, 1:18-cv-00095-CFC, 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01025-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER For Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/27/2018. (fms)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/26/2018. (fms)
November 21, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.'s Proposed Constructions filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Palapura, Bindu)
November 21, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 8 of the Scheduling Order of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Claim Constructions filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra)
November 20, 2018 Filing 35 PROPOSED ORDER -- For Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
November 20, 2018 Filing 34 PROPOSED ORDER -- Stipulated Protective Order by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Cottrell, Frederick)
November 19, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against City of Hope, Genentech, Inc. by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Moore, David)
November 15, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 8 of the Scheduling Order of Terms for Construction filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
November 15, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd's Identification of Claim Terms/Phrases for Construction filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Palapura, Bindu)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a Proposed Protective Order and a Proposed ESI Order to November 20, 2018 filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/15/2018. (fms)
November 14, 2018 Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a Proposed Protective Order and a Proposed ESI Order to November 20, 2018 - filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.. (Moore, David)
November 7, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories to Defendant and Plaintiffs' First Requests for Production of Documents filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
November 5, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
November 5, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd..(Moore, David)
November 5, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01672-CFC, 1:18-cv-00095-CFC, 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01025-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(cak)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 4/5/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 4/5/2019. Discovery due by 5/13/2019. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 3/22/2019. A Markman Hearing is set for 4/24/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/14/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Bench Trial is set for 12/9/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/31/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01672-CFC, 1:18-cv-00095-CFC, 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01025-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(nmf)
October 24, 2018 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER -- Proposed Scheduling Order (following Rule 16 Conference) by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Silver, Daniel)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (66 in 1:18-cv-00095-CFC, 24 in 1:18-cv-01363-CFC, 42 in 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 31 in 1:18-cv-01025-CFC, 46 in 1:17-cv-01672-CFC) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Scheduling Order to October 24, 2018 filed by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/24/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01672-CFC, 1:18-cv-00095-CFC, 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01025-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(fms)
October 23, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Scheduling Order to October 24, 2018 - filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra)
October 16, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Scheduling Conference held on 10/16/2018, Status Conference held on 10/16/2018. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01672-CFC, 1:18-cv-00095-CFC, 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01025-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(nmf)
October 11, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Ewing on behalf of City of Hope, Genentech, Inc. (Ewing, Alexandra)
October 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Amit H. Thakore,Dimitrios T. Drivas,Scott T. Weingaertner,Holly Tao for Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
October 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nancy L. Schroeder for Genentech, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01672-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(ceg)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nancy Lynn Schroeder filed by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/10/2018. (fms)
October 10, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Joint Status Report filed on 10/9/2018 has been removed and replaced with a corrected version. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01672-CFC, 1:18-cv-00095-CFC, 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01025-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(fms)
October 9, 2018 Filing 22 Joint STATUS REPORT by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
October 9, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nancy Lynn Schroeder - filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/16/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly, A Status Conference is set for 10/16/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 10/9/2018. The parties shall submit one joint status report that encompasses all cases listed on this order. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/28/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01672-CFC, 1:18-cv-00095-CFC, 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01025-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC(nmf)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amit Thakore, Dimitrios Drivas, Scott Weingaertner, and Holly Tao of White & Case LLP filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/28/2018. (fms)
September 27, 2018 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Samsung BioLogics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.. (Palapura, Bindu)
September 27, 2018 Filing 18 Joint STATEMENT re Oral Order,,, Set Deadlines,, by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
September 27, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amit Thakore, Dimitrios Drivas, Scott Weingaertner, and Holly Tao of White & Case LLP - filed by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.. (Moore, David)
September 27, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bindu Ann George Palapura on behalf of Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. (Palapura, Bindu)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ellis Moore on behalf of Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. (Moore, David)
September 25, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew J. Danford, Robert M. Galvin, Robert J. Gunther, Jr, Timothy Cook, William F. Lee, Stephanie Neely, Nora Q.E. Passamaneck, Lisa J. Pirozzolo, Kevin S. Prussia, and Emily R. Whelan for City of Hope and Genentech, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Court hereby informs the parties that Judge Connolly had acted as plaintiffs' counsel in Baxalta Incorporated and Baxalta GMBH v. Genentech, Inc. and Chugai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., 1:17-cv-509-TBD. The parties are directed to inform the Court no later than September 27, 2018 if they have any objection (or no objection) to Judge Connolly handling this action. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/27/2018.) Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/24/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01407-CFC et al.(nmf)
September 20, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01407-CFC, 1:17-cv-01471-CFC, 1:17-cv-01672-CFC, 1:18-cv-00095-CFC, 1:18-cv-00924-CFC, 1:18-cv-01025-CFC, 1:18-cv-01363-CFC (rjb)
September 19, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Lee, Robert J. Gunther, Jr., Robert M. Galvin, Lisa J. Pirozzolo, Kevin S. Prussia, Emily R. Whelan, Andrew J. Danford, Nora Q.E. Passamaneck, Timothy A. Cook and Stephanie Neely - filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Lee, Robert J. Gunther, Jr., Robert M. Galvin, Lisa J. Pirozzolo, Kevin S. Prussia, Emily R. Whelan, Andrew J. Danford, Nora Q.E. Passamaneck, Timothy A. Cook and Stephanie Neely filed by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/19/2018. (mdb)
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Governing Acceptance of Service of Process and Response Time to Complaint by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SO ORDERED - re (21 in 1:18-cv-01025-GMS, 37 in 1:17-cv-01672-GMS, 33 in 1:18-cv-00924-GMS, 55 in 1:18-cv-00095-GMS, 11 in 1:18-cv-01363-GMS) Proposed Order filed by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope, SCHEDULING ORDER: Claim Construction Opening Briefs due by 1/11/2019., Claim Construction Answering Briefs due by 2/8/2019., A Markman Hearing (full day) is set for 3/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Fact Discovery completed by 5/13/2019., A Status Conference is set for 10/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly to discuss the remaining case deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01672-GMS, 1:18-cv-00095-GMS, 1:18-cv-00924-GMS, 1:18-cv-01025-GMS, 1:18-cv-01363-GMS(mdb)
September 17, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daralyn J. Durie,Adam R. Brausa for Genentech, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order through Claim Construction and Fact Discovery re Scheduling Conference,, by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie and Adam R. Brausa filed by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/12/2018. (mdb)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie and Adam R. Brausa - filed by City of Hope, Genentech, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER - A Status Conference is set for Monday, October 15, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. The parties are further ordered to file a proposed scheduling order incorporating the deadlines and agreements set at the September 6, 2018 scheduling conference and the above date for a status conference. The proposed scheduling order is due by September 14, 2018. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/7/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01672-GMS, 1:18-cv-00095-GMS, 1:18-cv-00924-GMS, 1:18-cv-01025-GMS, 1:18-cv-01363-GMS(mdb)
September 6, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Scheduling Conference held on 9/6/2018. The court set a full day, consolidated Markman Hearing for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 at 9:30 AM. A scheduling conference was set for Wednesday, October, 17, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B, but this date will be rescheduled due to Judge Connolly's availability. An order will be issued accordingly. The defendants' request for production outlined in the joint agenda letter (DI 36 in C.A. No. 17-1672-GMS) is granted. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01672-GMS, 1:18-cv-00095-GMS, 1:18-cv-00924-GMS, 1:18-cv-01025-GMS, 1:18-cv-01363-GMS(mdb)
September 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by City of Hope. (nmg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Roche Holding Ltd., Subsidiary Roche Holdings, Inc. for Genentech, Inc. filed by Genentech, Inc. (nmg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,714,293. (nmg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,610,516 ;7,390,660 ;7,485,704 ;7,807,799 ;8,512,983. (nmg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,574,869 ;7,993,834 ;8,076,066 ;8,425,908 ;8,440,402. (nmg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,627,196 ;7,371,379 ;6,339,142 ;6,417,335 ;9,249,218. (nmg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,331,415 ;7,923,221 ;6,407,213 ;7,846,441 ;7,892,549. (nmg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2452666.) - filed by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
September 4, 2018 No Summons Issued. (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genentech, Inc. v. Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genentech, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Timothy Cook
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Robert M. Galvin
Represented By: Andrew J. Danford
Represented By: Robert J. Gunther, Jr.
Represented By: Stephanie Neely
Represented By: William F. Lee
Represented By: Adam R. Brausa
Represented By: Emily R. Whelan
Represented By: Kevin S. Prussia
Represented By: Nancy L. Schroeder
Represented By: Nora Q.E. Passamaneck
Represented By: Lisa J. Pirozzolo
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Stephanie Lin
Represented By: Rana Sawaya
Represented By: Mark D. McBriar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Hope
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Timothy Cook
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Robert M. Galvin
Represented By: Andrew J. Danford
Represented By: Robert J. Gunther, Jr.
Represented By: Stephanie Neely
Represented By: William F. Lee
Represented By: Emily R. Whelan
Represented By: Kevin S. Prussia
Represented By: Nora Q.E. Passamaneck
Represented By: Lisa J. Pirozzolo
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Holly Tao
Represented By: Amit H. Thakore
Represented By: Scott T. Weingaertner
Represented By: Dimitrios T. Drivas
Represented By: Stephanie E. O'Byrne
Represented By: John P. Padro
Represented By: Leon Miniovich
Represented By: Christopher J. Glancy
Represented By: Laura Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?