Smith v. Carrillo et al
Plaintiff: Keith Smith
Defendant: Ralph F. Devore, Lee Russell, Kent S. Siegel, Michael B. Croswell, Jr., Martin M. Van Brauman, Justin W. Furnace, Gene Scammahorn, Victor G. Carrillo, Paul Oroian, John M. Brown, William H. Avery, Dustin L. Guinn, The Estate of Yehezkel Druckman and Forrest A. Garb
Nominal Defendant: Zion Oil & Gas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01399
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 11/28/2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/5/2018. (nms)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Ewing on behalf of William H. Avery, John M. Brown, Victor G. Carrillo, Michael B. Croswell, Jr, Ralph F. Devore, Justin W. Furnace, Forrest A. Garb, Dustin L. Guinn, Paul Oroian, Lee Russell, Gene Scammahorn, Kent S. Siegel, The Estate of Yehezkel Druckman, Martin M. Van Brauman, Zion Oil & Gas, Inc. (Ewing, Alexandra)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Steven Hunter on behalf of William H. Avery, John M. Brown, Victor G. Carrillo, Michael B. Croswell, Jr, Ralph F. Devore, Justin W. Furnace, Forrest A. Garb, Dustin L. Guinn, Paul Oroian, Lee Russell, Gene Scammahorn, Kent S. Siegel, The Estate of Yehezkel Druckman, Martin M. Van Brauman, Zion Oil & Gas, Inc. (Hunter, Travis)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 11/28/2018 - filed by Keith Smith. (Farnan, Brian)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by Keith Smith. (Farnan, Brian)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORAL ORDER: An answer was due to be filed on 10/3/2018 (see D.I. #3 ), and to date none has been filed. Now the Plaintiff shall file a status letter with the Court within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/25/2018. (nms)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith Smith. Zion Oil & Gas, Inc. served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (Farnan, Brian)
September 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01399-RGA, 1:18-cv-01400-RGA (rjb)
September 10, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Zion Oil & Gas, Inc. on 9/10/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against William H. Avery, John M. Brown, Victor G. Carrillo, Michael B. Croswell, Jr, Ralph F. Devore, Justin W. Furnace, Forrest A. Garb, Dustin L. Guinn, Paul Oroian, Lee Russell, Gene Scammahorn, Kent S. Siegel, The Estate of Yehezkel Druckman, Martin M. Van Brauman - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2456444.) - filed by Keith Smith. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Carrillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph F. Devore
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Russell
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent S. Siegel
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Croswell, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin M. Van Brauman
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin W. Furnace
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Scammahorn
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor G. Carrillo
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Oroian
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Brown
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Avery
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin L. Guinn
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Yehezkel Druckman
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest A. Garb
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Smith
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Zion Oil & Gas, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?