PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC et al v. RetailMeNot, Inc.

Plaintiff: Level 3 Communications, LLC and PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC
Defendant: RetailMeNot, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01416
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2018 Remark : Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in California Northern District as case 5:18-cv-05966, filed 09/28/2018. (rwc)
September 27, 2018 Case transferred electronically to District of Northern District of California (MDL 2834). (fms)
September 27, 2018 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) signed by the Clerk of the Panel, Jeffrey N. Luthi, United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01416-CFC, 1:18-cv-01417-CFC, 1:18-cv-01418-CFC, 1:18-cv-01419-CFC(fms)
September 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01416-CFC, 1:18-cv-01417-CFC, 1:18-cv-01418-CFC, 1:18-cv-01419-CFC (rjb)
September 18, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC, Level 3 Communications, LLC. RetailMeNot, Inc. served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Farnan, Brian)
September 13, 2018 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent CenturyLink, Inc., Corporate Parent Level 3 Financing, Inc. for Level 3 Communications, LLC filed by Level 3 Communications, LLC. (Farnan, Brian)
September 13, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to RetailMeNot, Inc. on 9/13/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg)
September 13, 2018 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US6928442; US7802310; US8099420. (ceg)
September 13, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against RetailMeNot, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2458788.) - filed by PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC, Level 3 Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC et al v. RetailMeNot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RetailMeNot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Level 3 Communications, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?