Thompson-El v. Basher et al

Plaintiff: Ricky Thompson-El
Defendant: Chris Basher, Robin Roberts, Greater Dover Boys and Girls Club and Trish Moses
Case Number: 1:2018cv01426
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting D.I. #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/25/2018. (nmg)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Ricky Thompson-El. (jcs)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff shall submit IFP long form application. Failure to submit items within 21 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice (*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/11/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/20/18. (rwc) Modified on 9/21/2018 (nms).
September 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Chris Basher, Greater Dover Boys and Girls Club, Trish Moses, Robin Roberts - filed by Rickey Thompson-El. (NO IFP)(NO FEE PAID)(Attachments: #1 State of Delaware Right to Sue Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson-El v. Basher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Basher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Dover Boys and Girls Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Thompson-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?