Commtech IP LLC v. Black Box Corporation

Plaintiff: Commtech IP LLC
Defendant: Black Box Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01428
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 18, 2018 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Black Box Corporation answer due 12/18/2018). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/8/2018. (dlw)
November 7, 2018 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 18, 2018 - filed by Commtech IP LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
October 2, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to November 18, 2018 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Black Box Corporation answer due 11/18/2018). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/2/2018. (dlw)
October 2, 2018 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to November 18, 2018 - filed by Black Box Corporation. (Anderson, Jeremy)
September 25, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Bennett for Commtech IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01428-MN, 1:18-cv-01429-MN, 1:18-cv-01430-MN, 1:18-cv-01431-MN, 1:18-cv-01432-MN(ceg)
September 24, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett filed by Commtech IP LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/24/2018. (dlw)
September 23, 2018 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Commtech IP LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01428-MN, 1:18-cv-01429-MN, 1:18-cv-01430-MN, 1:18-cv-01431-MN, 1:18-cv-01432-MN (rjb)
September 14, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Black Box Corporation on 9/14/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg)
September 13, 2018 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Commtech IP LLC. (ceg)
September 13, 2018 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,557,715 B1. (ceg)
September 13, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Black Box Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2459566.) - filed by Commtech IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commtech IP LLC v. Black Box Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Box Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy Douglas Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commtech IP LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: David R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?