Digi Portal LLC v. LinkedIn Corporation

Plaintiff: Digi Portal LLC
Defendant: LinkedIn Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01484
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
0 Judge: Christopher J Burke
1 Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #9 Proposed Procedures Order filed by Digi Portal LLC. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/11/2018. (dlb)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER Procedures Order by Digi Portal LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
October 5, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Bennett for Digi Portal LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01485-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-01484-LPS-CJB(crb)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORAL REFERRAL ORDER: This case will be governed by Judge Stark's Revised Procedures for Managing Patent Cases (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). In accordance with the Revised Procedures, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. any and all matters relating to scheduling, including entry of a Scheduling Order, are referred to Magistrate Judge Burke; 2. any and all motions to dismiss, stay, and/or transfer venue, relating to all or any part of the case, whenever such motions may be filed, are referred to Judge Burke for disposition or report and recommendation, to the full extent permitted by the Constitution, statute, and rule; and 3. within seven (7) days of the date of this Referral Order, the plaintiff(s) shall file the Procedures Order, which is found on Judge Stark's website (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/4/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01484-LPS, 1:18-cv-01485-LPS (ntl)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to December 17, 2018 filed by LinkedIn Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/4/18. (ntl)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett filed by Digi Portal LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/3/18. (ntl)
October 3, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01484-LPS, 1:18-cv-01485-LPS (rjb)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to December 17, 2018 - filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Digi Portal LLC. LinkedIn Corporation served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (Devlin, Timothy)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Digi Portal LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Digi Portal LLC. (Devlin, Timothy)
September 26, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to LinkedIn Corporation on 9/26/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (jcs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,352,854 B2. (jcs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against LinkedIn Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2467704.) - filed by Digi Portal LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digi Portal LLC v. LinkedIn Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LinkedIn Corporation
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digi Portal LLC
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: David R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?