Bianchi v. B & G Machine, Inc

Plaintiff: John Bianchi
Defendant: B & G Machine, Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv01492
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of by B & G Machine, Inc re #21 Order Setting Scheduling Conference, Notice Pursuant to LR 81.2 (Casarino, Marc)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Setting Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 12/4/2018 at 04:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Colm F. Connolly. If the parties have no issues to discuss at the scheduling conference other than dates, they may request a telephonic scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/13/2018. (nmf)
October 25, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Charles Herr on behalf of John Bianchi (Herr, Daniel)
October 23, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Robert Wynn on behalf of B & G Machine, Inc (Wynn, Nicholas)
October 23, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Stephen Casarino on behalf of B & G Machine, Inc (Casarino, Marc)
October 3, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 27, 2018 Filing 17 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/29/2018. (crb)
September 27, 2018 Filing 16 Record of case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number in Other District: 2:18-cv-01049. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Defendant's #7 Motion to Transfer Venue. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer the file in this matter to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Pursuant to LCR 3(i), this case will be sent to the U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware by electronic transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Lawrence Ronald Cock for Plaintiff John Bianchi. (Cock, Lawrence) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY, filed by Defendant B & G Machine, Inc, TO RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Change Venue (Diamond, Kenneth) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 11 DECLARATION of John Bianchi filed by Plaintiff John Bianchi re #7 MOTION to Change Venue (Marks-Dias, Blake) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff John Bianchi, to #7 MOTION to Change Venue . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marks-Dias, Blake) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Blake Edward Marks-Dias on behalf of Plaintiff John Bianchi. (Marks-Dias, Blake) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint; by B & G Machine, Inc.(Diamond, Kenneth) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Change Venue , filed by Defendant B & G Machine, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/17/2018, (Diamond, Kenneth) Modified to add filer on 7/26/2018 (SWT). [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant B&G Machine Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Diamond, Kenneth) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant B&G Machine Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Diamond, Kenneth) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff John Bianchi (Tamblyn, George) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent H-E Parts International Inc. for B&G Machine Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by B&G Machine Inc (Diamond, Kenneth) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-17671-9 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5399856), filed by B&G Machine Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Diamond, Kenneth) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/27/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bianchi v. B & G Machine, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bianchi
Represented By: Daniel Charles Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & G Machine, Inc
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Wynn
Represented By: Marc Stephen Casarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?