Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust v. McKenney et al
Plaintiff: Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust
Defendant: Theodore H. Bunting, Jr., Pamela H. Godwin, Ronald P. O'Hanley, Timothy F. Keaney, John F. McGarry, E. Michael Caulfield, Edward J. Muhl, Gloria C. Larson, Daniel J. Waxenberg, Francis J. Shammo, Cynthia L. Egan, Steve Zabel, Joseph J. Echevarria, Thomas R. Watjen, Kevin T. Kabat and Richard P. McKenney
Nominal Defendant: Unum Group
Case Number: 1:2018cv01509
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 1, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Timothy F. Keaney served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Steve Zabel served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Kevin T. Kabat served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. E. Michael Caulfield served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Gloria C. Larson served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Daniel J. Waxenberg served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. John F. McGarry served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Richard P. McKenney served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Theodore H. Bunting, Jr served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Cynthia L. Egan served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Ronald P. O'Hanley served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Francis J. Shammo served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Joseph J. Echevarria served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Thomas R. Watjen served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Pamela H. Godwin served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Edward J. Muhl served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. Unum Group served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
September 28, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Theodore H. Bunting, Jr on 9/28/2018; E. Michael Caulfield on 9/28/2018; Joseph J. Echevarria on 9/28/2018; Cynthia L. Egan on 9/28/2018; Pamela H. Godwin on 9/28/2018; Kevin T. Kabat on 9/28/2018; Timothy F. Keaney on 9/28/2018; Gloria C. Larson on 9/28/2018; John F. McGarry on 9/28/2018; Richard P. McKenney on 9/28/2018; Edward J. Muhl on 9/28/2018; Ronald P. O'Hanley on 9/28/2018; Francis J. Shammo on 9/28/2018; Unum Group on 9/28/2018; Thomas R. Watjen on 9/28/2018; Daniel J. Waxenberg on 9/28/2018; Steve Zabel on 9/28/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Theodore H. Bunting, Jr, E. Michael Caulfield, Joseph J. Echevarria, Cynthia L. Egan, Pamela H. Godwin, Kevin T. Kabat, Timothy F. Keaney, Gloria C. Larson, John F. McGarry, Richard P. McKenney, Edward J. Muhl, Ronald P. O'Hanley, Francis J. Shammo, Unum Group, Thomas R. Watjen, Daniel J. Waxenberg, Steve Zabel - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2469444.) - filed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust v. McKenney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore H. Bunting, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela H. Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald P. O'Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy F. Keaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. McGarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Michael Caulfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J. Muhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria C. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Waxenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis J. Shammo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia L. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Zabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Echevarria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Watjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin T. Kabat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard P. McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Unum Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?