Reigrod v. Zoe's Kitchen, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Reigrod
Defendant: Alec Taylor, Cordia Harrington, Thomas Baldwin, Greg Dollarhyde, Sue Collyns, Zoes Kitchen, Inc., Kevin Miles and Zoe's Kitchen, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01536
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #10 . (dlw)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jonathan Reigrod as to Voluntary Dismissal (Bennett, Blake)
October 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jonathan Reigrod: For Alec Taylor waiver sent on 10/8/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jonathan Reigrod: For Cordia Harrington waiver sent on 10/8/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jonathan Reigrod: For Greg Dollarhyde waiver sent on 10/8/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jonathan Reigrod: For Thomas Baldwin waiver sent on 10/8/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jonathan Reigrod: For Sue Collyns waiver sent on 10/8/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jonathan Reigrod: For Kevin Miles waiver sent on 10/8/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jonathan Reigrod: For Zoe's Kitchen, Inc. waiver sent on 10/8/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 4, 2018 No Summons Issued. (sar)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Thomas Baldwin, Sue Collyns, Greg Dollarhyde, Cordia Harrington, Kevin Miles, Alec Taylor, Zoe's Kitchen, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2473665.) - filed by Jonathan Reigrod. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reigrod v. Zoe's Kitchen, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alec Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordia Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Dollarhyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Collyns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoes Kitchen, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoe's Kitchen, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Reigrod
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?