In re: RMH Franchise Holdings, Inc. et al.

Appellee: RMH Franchise Holdings, Inc., RMH Illinois, LLC, Contex Restaurants, Inc., NuLnk, Inc. and RMH Franchise Corp.
Appellant: Applebee's Franchisor LLC, Dine Brands Global, Inc. and Applebees's Restaurants LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01557
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER re #9 Stipulation - The parties shall file a status letter (or dismissal) on or before 1/28/2019. No briefing schedule will be entered at this time. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/29/2018. (dlw)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule re #6 Order, by Applebee's Franchisor LLC, Applebees's Restaurants LLC, Contex Restaurants, Inc., Dine Brands Global, Inc., NuLnk, Inc., RMH Franchise Corp., RMH Franchise Holdings, Inc., RMH Illinois, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Cairns, Timothy)
October 31, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian P. Baggott for Applebee's Franchisor LLC, Applebees's Restaurants LLC, Dine Brands Global, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
October 31, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joel D. Siegel for Applebee's Franchisor LLC, Applebees's Restaurants LLC, Dine Brands Global, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joel D. Siegel, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian P. Baggott filed by Applebee's Franchisor LLC, Dine Brands Global, Inc., Applebees's Restaurants LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/31/2018. (dlw)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joel D. Siegel - filed by Applebee's Franchisor LLC, Applebees's Restaurants LLC, Dine Brands Global, Inc.. (Jones, Laura)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian P. Baggott - filed by Applebee's Franchisor LLC, Applebees's Restaurants LLC, Dine Brands Global, Inc.. (Jones, Laura)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation: The Recommendation is hereby ADOPTED. The parties are directed to submit a proposed briefing scheduling no later than 11/28/2018. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/29/2018. (dlw)
October 29, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 5 was replaced with a corrected copy. The CA number was incorrect. (cak)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/29/18. (cak) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/29/2018) (cak).
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Applebee's Franchisor LLC, Applebees's Restaurants LLC, Dine Brands Global, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Laura)
October 17, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 12, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Replaced DI#2 with corrected pdf (corrected typographical error). (rwc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Wednesday, October 24, 2018, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/10/18. (cak)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (rwc) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/12/2018) (rwc).
October 10, 2018 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (rwc)
October 10, 2018 NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (rwc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Opinion entered on 9/25/18 by the Honorable Brendan Linehan Shannon in Bankruptcy case number AP 18-50481. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Dine Brands Global, Inc., Applebee's Franchisor LLC, Applebees's Restaurants LLC. (Attachments: #1 Opinion dated 9/25/18, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: RMH Franchise Holdings, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RMH Franchise Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth John Enos
Represented By: M. Blake Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RMH Illinois, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth John Enos
Represented By: M. Blake Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Contex Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth John Enos
Represented By: M. Blake Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NuLnk, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth John Enos
Represented By: M. Blake Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RMH Franchise Corp.
Represented By: Kenneth John Enos
Represented By: M. Blake Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Applebee's Franchisor LLC
Represented By: Timothy P. Cairns
Represented By: Laura Davis Jones
Represented By: Brian P. Baggott
Represented By: Joel D. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dine Brands Global, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy P. Cairns
Represented By: Laura Davis Jones
Represented By: Brian P. Baggott
Represented By: Joel D. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Applebees's Restaurants LLC
Represented By: Timothy P. Cairns
Represented By: Laura Davis Jones
Represented By: Brian P. Baggott
Represented By: Joel D. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?