Gracenote, Inc. v. Free Stream Media Corp.
Plaintiff: Gracenote, Inc.
Defendant: Free Stream Media Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01608
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gracenote, Inc.. Free Stream Media Corp. served on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019. (Moore, David)
December 10, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Free Stream Media Corp. on 12/10/2018. (lak)
December 10, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven Yovits for Gracenote, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
November 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven Yovtis,Mark J. Scott,Rao Malavika,Clifford E. Katz for Gracenote, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Yovits, Mark J. Scott, Clifford Katz, and Malavika Rao of Kelley Drye & Warren LLP, filed by Gracenote, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/29/2018. (nms)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Yovits, Mark J. Scott, Clifford Katz, and Malavika Rao of Kelley Drye & Warren LLP - filed by Gracenote, Inc.. (Moore, David)
October 24, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Nielsen Holding and Finance B.V. for Gracenote, Inc. filed by Gracenote, Inc.. (nmg)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,066,114 ;9,479,831 ;9.407.962 ;8,171,030. (nmg)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Free Stream Media Corp. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2483384.) - filed by Gracenote, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
October 17, 2018 No Summons Issued. (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gracenote, Inc. v. Free Stream Media Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Free Stream Media Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gracenote, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie E. O'Byrne
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: Mark J. Scott
Represented By: Steven Yovtis
Represented By: Rao Malavika
Represented By: Steven Yovits
Represented By: Clifford E. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?