Fisher v. Alles et al

Plaintiff: Susan Fisher
Defendant: Mark J. Alles, Michael W. Bonney, Michael A. Friedman, Peter N. Kellogg, Hans E. Bishop, Patricia A. Hemingway Hall, James J. Loughlin, Richard W. Barker, Gilla Kaplan, Jacqualyn A. Fouse, Michael D. Casey, John H. Weiland, Ernest Mario, Carrie S. Cox, Julia A. Haller and Robert J. Hugin
Nominal Defendant: Celgene Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01624
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #24 . (dlw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice and Proposed Order by Susan Fisher. (Bennett, Blake) Modified on 11/13/2018 (dlw).
October 29, 2018 Filing 23 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint,, by Celgene Corporation. (Moritz, Garrett)
October 29, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett B. Moritz on behalf of Celgene Corporation (Moritz, Garrett)
October 24, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 23, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. John H. Weiland served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Ernest Mario served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. James J. Loughlin served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Peter N. Kellogg served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Gilla Kaplan served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Robert J. Hugin served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Patricia A. Hemingway Hall served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Julia A. Haller served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Michael A. Friedman served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Jacqualyn A. Fouse served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Carrie S. Cox served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Michael D. Casey served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Michael W. Bonney served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Hans E. Bishop served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Richard W. Barker served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Mark J. Alles served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Fisher. Celgene Corporation served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - granting #1 Motion to Seal Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/22/18. (rwc)
October 19, 2018 Remark : Exit copies to Duty Judge (LPS). (rwc)
October 19, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Mark J. Alles on 10/19/2018; Richard W. Barker on 10/19/2018; Hans E. Bishop on 10/19/2018; Michael W. Bonney on 10/19/2018; Michael D. Casey on 10/19/2018; Celgene Corporation on 10/19/2018; Carrie S. Cox on 10/19/2018; Jacqualyn A. Fouse on 10/19/2018; Michael A. Friedman on 10/19/2018; Julia A. Haller on 10/19/2018; Patricia A. Hemingway Hall on 10/19/2018; Robert J. Hugin on 10/19/2018; Gilla Kaplan on 10/19/2018; Peter N. Kellogg on 10/19/2018; James J. Loughlin on 10/19/2018; Ernest Mario on 10/19/2018; John H. Weiland on 10/19/2018. (rwc)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 [SEALED] VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Mark J. Alles, Richard W. Barker, Hans E. Bishop, Michael W. Bonney, Michael D. Casey, Carrie S. Cox, Jacqualyn A. Fouse, Michael A. Friedman, Julia A. Haller, Patricia A. Hemingway Hall, Robert J. Hugin, Gilla Kaplan, Peter N. Kellogg, James J. Loughlin, Ernest Mario, John H. Weiland, Celgene Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 30481.) - filed by Susan Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc) Modified on 10/19/2018 (rwc).
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal - filed by Susan Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Alles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Alles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W. Bonney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter N. Kellogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans E. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Hemingway Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilla Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqualyn A. Fouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Weiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Mario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie S. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia A. Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Hugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Fisher
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Celgene Corporation
Represented By: Garrett B. Moritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?