6115187 Canada, Inc. v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: 6115187 Canada, Inc.
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc., and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01631
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 Stipulation (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. answer due 3/19/2019; LG Electronics, Inc., answer due 3/19/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/10/2018. (dlw)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to March 19, 2019 by 6115187 Canada, Inc.. (Butler, Dennis)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by 6115187 Canada, Inc.. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Simmons, John)
November 16, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01630-MN, 1:18-cv-01631-MN (rjb)
October 24, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01630-LPS, 1:18-cv-01631-LPS (rjb)
October 19, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. on 10/19/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate 9116-6371 Qubec Inc. for 6115187 Canada, Inc. filed by 6115187 Canada, Inc.. (nmg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,844,990 B2. (nmg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2485211.) - filed by 6115187 Canada, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 6115187 Canada, Inc. v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 6115187 Canada, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis James Butler
Represented By: John David Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?