Lewandowski v. GE Healthcare Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sean Lewandowski
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, General Electric Company and GE Healthcare Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01641
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael L. O'Donnell, Esq., James E. Hooper, Jr., Esq., and Jeremy A. Moseley, Esq., filed by General Electric Company, GE Healthcare Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/13/2018. (nms)
December 13, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael L. O'Donnell, Esq., James E. Hooper, Jr., Esq., and Jeremy A. Moseley, Esq. - filed by GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael L. O'Donnell, Esq., #2 Certification of James E. Hooper, Jr., Esq., #3 Certification of Jeremy A. Moseley, Esq.)(Dalton, Michael)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 APPLICATION of Attorney to Appear as Counsel for Defendant Without Association With Delaware Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/11/2018. (nms)
December 11, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 14 has been recoded to reflect the filing is a motion. (nms)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Attorney to Appear as Counsel for Defendant Without Association With Delaware Counsel, by Victor William Scarpato, III on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scarpato, Victor) Modified on 12/11/2018 (nms).
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by McKesson Corporation. (Scarpato, Victor)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, by McKesson Corporation.(Scarpato, Victor) Modified on 12/11/2018 (nms).
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company. (Dalton, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, by GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company.(Dalton, Michael) Modified on 12/10/2018 (nms).
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bartholomew J. Dalton on behalf of GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company (Dalton, Bartholomew)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Caulfield Dalton on behalf of GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company (Dalton, Michael)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Lewandowski. General Electric Company served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (McGee, Kyle)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Lewandowski. GE Healthcare Inc. served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (McGee, Kyle)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Lewandowski. McKesson Corporation served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (McGee, Kyle)
November 26, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 5, 6 and 7 have been removed from the docket as they were filed using the incorrect code. Counsel shall refile the documents and use the Summons Returned Executed filing event code. (nms)
November 20, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Todd A. Walburg for Sean Lewandowski and Todd A. Walburg for Debra Javens added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01030-RGA, 1:18-cv-01641-RGA(ceg)
November 19, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to GE Healthcare Inc. on 11/19/2018; General Electric Company on 11/19/2018; McKesson Corporation on 11/19/2018. (sar)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd A. Walburg, filed by Sean Lewandowski. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/16/2018. (nms)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd A. Walburg - filed by Sean Lewandowski. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Todd A. Walburg)(McGee, Kyle)
October 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Margot Cutter,Curtis Brooks Cutter for Sean Lewandowski added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney C. Brooks Cutter, Esq. and Margot P. Cutter, Esq., filed by Sean Lewandowski. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/26/2018. (nms)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney C. Brooks Cutter, Esq. and Margot P. Cutter, Esq. - filed by Sean Lewandowski. (Attachments: #1 Certification of C. Brooks, Cutter, Esq., #2 Certification of Margot P. Cutter, Esq.)(McGee, Kyle)
October 24, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 23, 2018 No Summons Issued. (rwc)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company, McKesson Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2486519.) - filed by Sean Lewandowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewandowski v. GE Healthcare Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Victor William Scarpato, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Michael Caulfield Dalton
Represented By: Bartholomew J. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Michael Caulfield Dalton
Represented By: Bartholomew J. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Lewandowski
Represented By: Kyle John McGee
Represented By: Todd A. Walburg
Represented By: Margot Cutter
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?