Sycamore Partners Management, L.P. et al v. Endurance American Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Sycamore Partners, L.P., Sycamore Partners Management, L.P. and Sycamore Partners A, L.P.
Defendant: Starr Idemnity & Liability Company, Continental Casualty Company, Endurance American Insurance Company, Ironshore Idemnity Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company, Everest National Insurance Company and Argonaut Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01650
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Nathan R. Lander re #26 Answering Brief in Opposition by Sycamore Partners A, L.P., Sycamore Partners Management, L.P., Sycamore Partners, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12)(Baldwin, David) Modified on 12/19/2018 (dlw).
December 18, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of New York filed by Sycamore Partners A, L.P., Sycamore Partners Management, L.P., Sycamore Partners, L.P..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/26/2018. (Baldwin, David)
December 14, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sycamore Partners A, L.P., Sycamore Partners Management, L.P., Sycamore Partners, L.P.. (Baldwin, David)
December 7, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael P. Duffy for Argonaut Insurance Company,Michael F. Perlis for Markel American Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
December 7, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Scarlett M. Rajbanshi for Argonaut Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
December 7, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Cary J. Economou for Markel American Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Duffy and Attorney Scarlett M. Rajbanshi filed by Argonaut Insurance Company, #21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael F. Perlis and Attorney Cary J. Economou filed by Markel American Insurance Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/6/2018. (dlw)
December 5, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Duffy and Attorney Scarlett M. Rajbanshi - filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Norman, Elena)
December 4, 2018 Filing 23 JOINDER by Markel American Insurance Company, joining in #19 Answering Brief in Opposition, #6 Motion to Remand to State Court . (Norman, Elena)
December 4, 2018 Filing 22 JOINDER by Markel American Insurance Company, joining in #17 Opening Brief in Support,,, #16 Motion to Transfer Case . (Norman, Elena)
December 4, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael F. Perlis and Attorney Cary J. Economou - filed by Markel American Insurance Company. (Norman, Elena)
December 4, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel J. Layden for Ironshore Idemnity Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
December 3, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ronald P. Schiller for Ironshore Idemnity Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
December 3, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Felice on behalf of Everest National Insurance Company (Felice, David)
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Starr Idemnity & Liability Company.Reply Brief due date per Stipulation is 12/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Klayman, Barry) Modified on 12/3/2018 (dlw).
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiffs to file their Opposition to the Motion to Transfer and Defendant Starr Indemnity to Reply in Support of Their Motion to Transfer to December 18, 2018 and January 8, 2019 respectively (Set Briefing Schedule: re #16 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of New York - Answering Brief due 12/18/2018. Reply Brief due 1/8/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/29/2018. (dlw)
November 29, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiffs to file their Opposition to the Motion to Transfer; and Defendant Starr Indemnity to Reply in Support of Their Motion to Transfer to December 18, 2018; and January 8, 2019 respectively - filed by Sycamore Partners A, L.P., Sycamore Partners Management, L.P., Sycamore Partners, L.P.. (Baldwin, David)
November 20, 2018 Filing 17 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #16 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of New York filed by Starr Idemnity & Liability Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Barry M. Klayman in Support of Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit A & B to Declaration of Barry M. Klayman, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Argonaut Insurance (P. McGinley), #4 Affidavit Declaration of Continental Casualty (L. Ledo), #5 Affidavit Declaration of Great American Insurance (M. Hvisdock), #6 Affidavit Declaration of Markel American Insurance (C. Butler), #7 Affidavit Declaration of Starr Indemnity & Liability (R. Robak), #8 Affidavit Declaration of XL Specialty Insurance (M. Phelps), #9 Affidavit Declaration of Zurich American Insurance (N. Krull), #10 Affidavit Declaration of Endurance American Insurance (C. Caliendo))(Klayman, Barry)
November 20, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of New York - filed by Starr Idemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Barry)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Layden and Ronald P. Schiller filed by Ironshore Idemnity Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/20/2018. (dlw)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Layden and Ronald P. Schiller - filed by Ironshore Idemnity Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Keener, Carmella)
November 20, 2018 Filing 14 Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by Sycamore Partners A, L.P., Sycamore Partners Management, L.P., Sycamore Partners, L.P. (Baldwin, David) Modified on 11/20/2018 (dlw).
November 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stacey E. Rufe,David M. Gische for XL Specialty Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to twenty (20) days after an order deciding the Remand Motion filed by Endurance American Insurance Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/15/2018. (dlw)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to twenty (20) days after an order deciding the Remand Motion - filed by Endurance American Insurance Company. (Casarino, Marc)
November 15, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael R Davisson for Starr Idemnity & Liability Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (Set Briefing Schedule: re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court - Answering Brief due 11/30/2018; Reply Brief due 12/14/2018). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/15/2018. (dlw)
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file its Opposition to the Motion to Remand to November 30, 2018 - filed by Starr Idemnity & Liability Company. (Klayman, Barry)
November 15, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Evan Shapiro for Zurich American Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Gische filed by XL Specialty Insurance Company, #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Evan Shapiro filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stacey Rufe filed by XL Specialty Insurance Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/9/2018. (dlw)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stacey Rufe - filed by XL Specialty Insurance Company. (McCullough, Bruce)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Gische - filed by XL Specialty Insurance Company. (McCullough, Bruce)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Evan Shapiro - filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (McCullough, Bruce)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Katzenstein on behalf of Continental Casualty Company (Katzenstein, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sycamore Partners A, L.P., Sycamore Partners Management, L.P., Sycamore Partners, L.P..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baldwin, David)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by Sycamore Partners A, L.P., Sycamore Partners Management, L.P., Sycamore Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baldwin, David)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 Stipulation. All defendants are deemed served on October 16, 2018; all defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before November 16, 2018 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Argonaut Insurance Company answer due 11/16/2018; Continental Casualty Company answer due 11/16/2018; Endurance American Insurance Company answer due 11/16/2018; Everest National Insurance Company answer due 11/16/2018; Great American Insurance Company answer due 11/16/2018; Ironshore Idemnity Inc. answer due 11/16/2018; Markel American Insurance Company answer due 11/16/2018; Starr Idemnity & Liability Company answer due 11/16/2018; Zurich American Insurance Company answer due 11/16/2018). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/1/2018. (dlw)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael R. Davisson filed by Starr Idemnity & Liability Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/1/2018. (dlw)
October 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION extending deadline to respond to Complaint by XL Specialty Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company. (McCullough, Bruce) Modified on 11/1/2018 (dlw).
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce W. McCullough on behalf of XL Specialty Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company (McCullough, Bruce)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael R. Davisson - filed by Starr Idemnity & Liability Company. (Klayman, Barry)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior CT, Case Number N18C-09-211 AML (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2487633)- filed by Starr Idemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sycamore Partners Management, L.P. et al v. Endurance American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sycamore Partners, L.P.
Represented By: David J. Baldwin
Represented By: Carla Michelle Jones
Represented By: Tracey E. Timlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sycamore Partners Management, L.P.
Represented By: David J. Baldwin
Represented By: Carla Michelle Jones
Represented By: Tracey E. Timlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sycamore Partners A, L.P.
Represented By: David J. Baldwin
Represented By: Carla Michelle Jones
Represented By: Tracey E. Timlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Idemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Barry M. Klayman
Represented By: Michael R. Davisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert J. Katzenstein
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance American Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc Stephen Casarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Idemnity Inc.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Represented By: Daniel J. Layden
Represented By: Ronald P. Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Stacey E. Rufe
Represented By: Bruce W. McCullough
Represented By: David M. Gische
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markel American Insurance Company
Represented By: Elena C. Norman
Represented By: Cary J. Economou
Represented By: Michael F. Perlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce W. McCullough
Represented By: Evan Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company
Represented By: David A. Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Represented By: Elena C. Norman
Represented By: Scarlett M. Rajbanshi
Represented By: Michael P. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?