Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc. v. OW Bunker Panama S.A.
Plaintiff: Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc.
Defendant: OW Bunker Panama S.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01659
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 09:207
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of William M. Kelleher, Esq. re #6 Proposed Order, #11 Order, #1 Complaint, #5 Proposed Order, #8 Disclosure Statement, #10 Letter, #3 MEMORANDUM in Support, #12 Order, #13 Order, #7 Application for Writ filed by Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kelleher, William)
November 2, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of William M. Kelleher, Esq. re #13 Order, #7 Application for Writ filed by Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kelleher, William)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick F. Lennon filed by Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/2/2018. (dlw)
November 2, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick F. Lennon - filed by Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc.. (Giordano, Phillip)
October 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 29, 2018 Remark : Three Original Issued Writs and Copies of Orders (DI 11, 12 & 13) are available for pick-up at the Clerk's Office until 4:00 pm today. Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (rwc)
October 29, 2018 WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT issued as to OW Bunker Panama S.A. (c/o Citibank N.A. and/or Integr8 Fuels America LLC). (rwc)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Directing Clerk to Issue Process of Maritime Attachment and Appointing Special Process Server, re #4 MOTION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/29/18. (rwc)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Appointing Special Process Server Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(c). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/29/18. (rwc)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Expediting Case and Issuing Ex Parte Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/29/18. (rwc)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 Letter to John A. Cerino from William M. Kelleher regarding Request for the Court to Assign this Matter to an Individual Judge on an Expedited Basis - re #6 Proposed Order, #4 MOTION for, #1 Complaint, #5 Proposed Order, #7 Application for Writ, #3 MEMORANDUM in Support. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelleher, William)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 Remark : Case submitted for routine judicial case assignment (10/31/18). Counsel can submit a letter requesting Expedited Handling and the reasons therefor. Bound paper courtesy copies would be required to be submitted to the Clerk's Office as soon as practicable after such request has been made. (rwc)
October 25, 2018 No Summons Issued. (rwc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc. (rwc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Writ of of Attachment and Garnishment - filed by Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc. (rwc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER Directing Clerk to Issue Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment and Appointing Process Server - re #4 Affidavit, filed by Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc. (rwc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER Appointing Special Process Server Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 4(c) re #4 Affidavit, by Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc. (rwc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Patrick F. Lennon in support of Plaintiff's Claim for Recognition and Enforcement of Foreign Arbitration Awards Under the New York Convention and in support of Plaintiff's Prayer/MOTION for an Order of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment - filed by Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(rwc) Modified on 10/25/2018 (rwc).
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of in Support re #1 Complaint to Confirm Arbitration Awards - filed by Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc. (rwc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT - filed against OW Bunker Panama S.A. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2488800.) - filed by Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc. v. OW Bunker Panama S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navig8 Chemicals Pool, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Giordano
Represented By: William M. Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OW Bunker Panama S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?