Standard Insurance Company v. Deptula et al

Plaintiff: Standard Insurance Company
Defendant: Ashley L. (Buchanan) Deptula, John Doe, Guardian of Libby Serene Deptula, Estate of Ronald S. Deptula, Ronald M. Deptula, Doherty Funeral Homes, Inc., John Doe, Guardian of L.D. and Estate of R.D.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01667
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by Standard Insurance Company. (Rhoads, Melissa)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER: Answers were due to be filed on 11/28/2018 (see D.I. #4 ; D.I. #5 ; D.I. #6 ), and to date none have been filed. Now the Plaintiff shall file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/13/2018. (nms)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED Order re #7 MOTION For Interpleader Relief, by Standard Insurance Company. (Rhoads, Melissa) Modified on 11/26/2018 (nms).
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION For Interpleader Relief, filed by Standard Insurance Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rhoads, Melissa) Modified on 11/26/2018 (nms).
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION For Interpleader Relief - filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Rhoads, Melissa) Modified on 11/26/2018 (nms).
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Standard Insurance Company. Ronald M. Deptula served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Rhoads, Melissa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Standard Insurance Company. Doherty Funeral Homes, Inc. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Rhoads, Melissa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Standard Insurance Company. Ashley L. (Buchanan) Deptula served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Rhoads, Melissa)
November 5, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brooks R. Magratten for Standard Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brooks R. Magratten, Esq., filed by Standard Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/1/2018. (nms)
October 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brooks R. Magratten, Esquire - filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Brooks R. Magratten, Esquire, #2 Proposed Order)(Rhoads, Melissa)
October 26, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Doherty Funeral Homes, Inc. on 10/26/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb)
October 26, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Ashley L. (Buchanan) Deptula on 10/26/2018; Ronald M. Deptula on 10/26/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Ashley L. (Buchanan) Deptula, Ronald M. Deptula, Doherty Funeral Homes, Inc., Estate of R.D., John Doe, Guardian of L.D. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2489457.) - filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standard Insurance Company v. Deptula et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley L. (Buchanan) Deptula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, Guardian of Libby Serene Deptula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Ronald S. Deptula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald M. Deptula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doherty Funeral Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, Guardian of L.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of R.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Lynn Rhoads
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?