Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Cipla Limited, Perrigo Company plc, Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited, Cipla USA, Inc., Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Perrigo Pharma International DAC and Cadila Healthcare Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01673
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gary E. Hood, Helena Berezowskyj, and Mark T. Deming for Perrigo Company plc and Perrigo Pharma International DAC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
December 19, 2018 Filing 68 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 12/19/2018 (nms).
December 19, 2018 Filing 67 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Apotex to respond to Anacor's Cross Motion to Stay All Cases Against All Defendants (D.I. 46) to January 9, 2019 - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Haney, Megan)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #61 STIPULATION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2018. (nms)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #58 STIPULATION for Extension of Time (*Set Briefing Schedule: #46 Cross-Motion to Stay All Cases Against All Defendants. Answering Brief due 1/9/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2018. (nms)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #63 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2018. (nms)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #62 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Motion to Stay to January 9, 2019, filed by Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2018. (nms)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #68 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2018. (nms)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #66 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2018. (nms)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #65 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2018. (nms)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #67 STIPULATION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2018. (nms)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #64 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary J. Speier, Samuel T. Lockner and Megan E. Hingtgen, filed by Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2018. (nms)
December 18, 2018 Filing 66 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to File Answer - filed by Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 12/19/2018 (nms).
December 18, 2018 Filing 65 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited. (Capuzzi, Kevin) Modified on 12/19/2018 (nms).
December 18, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary J. Speier, Samuel T. Lockner and Megan E. Hingtgen - filed by Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
December 18, 2018 Filing 63 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to File Answer - filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc.. (Cole, Jeremy) Modified on 12/19/2018 (nms).
December 18, 2018 Filing 62 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Motion to Stay to January 9, 2019 - filed by Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Myer, R.) Modified on 12/18/2018 (nms).
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary E. Hood, Mark T. Deming, and Helena Berezowskyj, filed by Perrigo Pharma International DAC, Perrigo Company plc. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/2018. (nms)
December 18, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Barry P. Golob for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
December 18, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney W. Blake Coblentz for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
December 18, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Keri L. Schaubert for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
December 18, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kerry B. McTigue for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
December 18, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Aaron S. Lukas for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
December 17, 2018 Filing 61 STIPULATION for Extension of Time - filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 12/18/2018 (nms).
December 17, 2018 Filing 60 ANSWER to #38 Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaims, by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 12/18/2018 (nms).
December 17, 2018 Filing 59 ANSWER to #35 Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaim, by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 12/18/2018 (nms).
December 17, 2018 Filing 58 STIPULATION for Extension of Time - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 12/18/2018 (nms).
December 17, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary E. Hood, Mark T. Deming, and Helena Berezowskyj - filed by Perrigo Company plc, Perrigo Pharma International DAC. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel)(Higgins, James)
December 17, 2018 Filing 56 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying filed by Cipla USA, Inc.. (Cole, Jeremy)
December 17, 2018 Filing 54 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying filed by Cipla Limited. (Cole, Jeremy) Modified on 12/17/2018 (nms).
December 17, 2018 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc., by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc..(Cole, Jeremy) Modified on 12/17/2018 (nms).
December 17, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George J. Barry, III and Attorney Timothy H. Kratz - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 17, 2018 Filing 51 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Corporate Parent Orbicular Pharmaceutical Technologies Pvt Ltd. for Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited, Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited filed by Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Capuzzi, Kevin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 50 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIM against Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc., by Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Capuzzi, Kevin) Modified on 12/17/2018 (nms).
December 17, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael S. Weinstein for Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
December 17, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 55 has been removed from the docket as it was duplicative of the filing at D.I. #54 . The docket text for D.I. 54 has been amended to reflect the correct filer. (nms)
December 17, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The stipulation filed at D.I. 57 has been removed from the docket as it was tailored the incorrect Judge. Counsel will amend and refile the stipulation. (nms)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #52 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George J. Barry, III and Attorney Timothy H. Kratz, filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2018. (nms)
December 17, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The So Ordered entry relating to D.I. 57 has been removed from the docket as it was entered in error. (nms)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #49 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Weinstein, filed by Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/14/2018. (nms)
December 13, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Weinstein - filed by Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited. (Capuzzi, Kevin)
December 13, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barry P. Golob, Esquire, Kerry B. McTigue, Esquire, W. Blake Coblentz, Esquire, Aaron S. Lukas, Esquire, and Keri L. Schaubert, Esquire - filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Vrana, Robert)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #47 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Cross Motion to Stay All Cases Against All Defendants to January 9, 2019 (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #46 Cross-Motion to Stay All Cases Against All Defendants and Response to Defendant Flatwing's Motion to Stay Case. Answering Brief due 1/9/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/13/2018. (nms)
December 13, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The motion filed at D.I. 48 has been removed from the docket as it was tailored for a Judge no longer assigned to this matter. (nms) Modified on 12/13/2018 (nms).
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #48 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Barry P. Golob, Esq., Kerry B. McTigue, Esq., W. Blake Coblentz, Esq., Aaron S. Lukas, Esq., and Keri L. Schaubert, Esq., filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/13/2018. (nms)
December 12, 2018 Filing 47 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Cross Motion to Stay All Cases Against All Defendants (D.I. 46) to January 9, 2019 - filed by Perrigo Company plc, Perrigo Pharma International DAC. (Higgins, James)
December 10, 2018 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #46 Cross-Motion to Stay All Cases Against All Defendants and Response to Defendant Flatwing's Motion to Stay Case. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/24/2018. (nms)
December 10, 2018 Filing 46 Cross-Motion to Stay All Cases Against All Defendants and Response to Defendant Flatwing's Motion to Stay Case - filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 12/11/2018 (nms).
December 7, 2018 Filing 45 ANSWER to #30 Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaims, by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 12/7/2018 (nms).
December 7, 2018 Filing 44 ANSWER to #29 Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaim, by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 12/7/2018 (nms).
December 5, 2018 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Cipla Limited served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 3, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The "So Ordered" entry of 11/30/2018, has been modified to reflect that Cadila Heathcare Ltd's answer date has also been adjusted. (nms)
November 30, 2018 Filing 42 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 16, 2019 - filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 12/3/2018 (nms).
November 30, 2018 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.: For Cadila Healthcare Ltd. waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Dellinger, Megan)
November 30, 2018 Filing 40 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Cadila Healthcare Ltd. on 11/14/2018 by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 1/14/2019. (Dellinger, Megan)
November 30, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert S. Silver,Salvatore Guerriero for Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #42 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 16, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. answer due 1/16/2019; Cadila Healthcare Ltd. answer due 1/16/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/30/2018. (nms) Modified on 12/3/2018 (nms).
November 26, 2018 Filing 39 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., filed by Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 11/27/2018 (nms).
November 26, 2018 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc., by Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 11/27/2018 (nms).
November 26, 2018 Filing 37 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,582,621 B2 . (Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 26, 2018 Filing 36 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Aurobindo Pharma Limited for Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 26, 2018 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc., by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Limited.(Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 11/27/2018 (nms).
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #34 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert Silver and Salvatore Guerriero of Caesar Rivise, PC, filed by Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/26/2018. (nms)
November 20, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert Silver and Salvatore Guerriero of Caesar Rivise, PC - filed by Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Myer, R.)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #33 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer complaint to November 30, 2018 filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/20/2018. (ksr, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 33 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer complaint to November 30, 2018 - filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan)
November 19, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Manish K. Mehta - filed by Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited. (Capuzzi, Kevin)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Manish K. Mehta, filed by Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/19/2018. (nms)
November 16, 2018 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Apotex Holdings, Inc. for Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Phillips, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc., by Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp..(Phillips, John) Modified on 11/16/2018 (nms).
November 16, 2018 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc., by Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Myer, R.) Modified on 11/16/2018 (nms).
November 16, 2018 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and related papers served on Apotex Inc. on November 15, 2018, filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to November 26, 2018 filed by Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/16/18. (ntl)
November 16, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01606-RGA, 1:18-cv-01673-RGA, 1:18-cv-01699-RGA (rjb)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC to answer the Complaint to January 16, 2019 filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/14/18. (ntl)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to December 17, 2018 filed by Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited, #23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Limited and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 26, 2018 filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Limited, #26 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which defendants Cipla Limited and Cipla USA, Inc. may respond to the Complaint to December 17, 2018 filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/15/18. (ntl)
November 14, 2018 Filing 27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to November 26, 2018 - filed by Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
November 14, 2018 Filing 26 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which defendants Cipla Limited and Cipla USA, Inc. may respond to the Complaint to December 17, 2018 - filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan)
November 14, 2018 Filing 25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to December 17, 2018 - filed by Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited. (Capuzzi, Kevin)
November 14, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Capuzzi on behalf of Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Capuzzi, Kevin)
November 14, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Limited and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 26, 2018 - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 13, 2018 Filing 22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC to answer the Complaint to January 16, 2019 - filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Gaza, Anne)
November 5, 2018 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.: For Perrigo Company plc waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 5, 2018 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Perrigo Company plc on 11/2/2018 by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 12/3/2018. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 5, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.: For Perrigo Pharma International DAC waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 5, 2018 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Perrigo Pharma International DAC on 11/2/2018 by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 12/3/2018. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Hetero FZCO for Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Myer, R.)
November 2, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Touhey Myer on behalf of Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Myer, R.)
November 1, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 14 was removed from the docket per request of counsel (filed in wrong case). (ntl)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (7 in 1:18-cv-01699-LPS, 15 in 1:18-cv-01673-LPS, 10 in 1:18-cv-01606-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron P. Maurer, David I. Berl, David M. Horniak and Anthony Sheh of Williams & Connolly LLP filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/1/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01606-LPS, 1:18-cv-01673-LPS, 1:18-cv-01699-LPS (ntl)
October 31, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron P. Maurer, David I. Berl, David M. Horniak and Anthony Sheh of Williams & Connolly LLP - filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Mailing to Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 11/28/2018 (nms).
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Mailing to Perrigo Pharma International DAC, by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan) Modified on 11/28/2018 (nms).
October 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01673-LPS, 1:18-cv-01699-LPS (rjb)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Cipla USA, Inc. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Apotex Corp. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (nmg)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,459,938 B2 ;9,566,289 B2 ;9,566,290 B2 ;9,572,823 B2. (nmg)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: SEE ATTACHED. Date of Expiration of Patent: 2/16/2026. (nmg)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Cipla Limited, Cipla USA, Inc., Perrigo Company plc, Perrigo Pharma International DAC, Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2489591.) - filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)
October 25, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited on 10/25/2018; Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC on 10/25/2018; Apotex Corp. on 10/25/2018; Apotex Inc. on 10/25/2018; Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 10/25/2018; Aurobindo Pharma Limited on 10/25/2018; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. on 10/25/2018; Cadila Healthcare Ltd. on 10/25/2018; Cipla Limited on 10/25/2018; Cipla USA, Inc. on 10/25/2018; Perrigo Company plc on 10/25/2018; Perrigo Pharma International DAC on 10/25/2018; Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. on 10/25/2018; Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. on 10/25/2018; Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. on 10/25/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cipla Limited
Represented By: Jeremy S. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Company plc
Represented By: Mark T. Deming
Represented By: Helena Berezowskyj
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Represented By: Gary E. Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleor Dermaceuticals Limited
Represented By: Kevin M. Capuzzi
Represented By: Michael S. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cipla USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy S. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascent Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: R. Touhey Myer
Represented By: Robert S. Silver
Represented By: Salvatore Guerriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Limited
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taro Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Represented By: Aaron S. Lukas
Represented By: W. Blake Coblentz
Represented By: Kerry B. McTigue
Represented By: Barry P. Golob
Represented By: Keri L. Schaubert
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Pharma International DAC
Represented By: Mark T. Deming
Represented By: Helena Berezowskyj
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Represented By: Gary E. Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadila Healthcare Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?