Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. v. Backer EHP, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V.
Defendant: Backer EHP, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01693
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eric Y. Choi,Kevin C. May,Daniel M. Terhune,Thomas Earl Williams for Backer EHP, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME, Set Briefing Schedule: re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Answering Brief due 1/24/2019., Reply Brief due 2/7/2019.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/27/2018. (nmf)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME On NOvember 13, 2018 an Order was Entered Extending Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiffs Complaint to December 20, 2018 (D.I. 6); December 19, 2018 Defendant Filed a Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (D.I. 7) and Its Opening Brief (D.I. 8) to Plaintiff Shall File Answering Brief to Motion through and Including January 24, 2019; Defendant shall file any Reply Brief in Support of Motion is Extend and Including Feburary 7, 2019 - filed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V.. (Enerio, Patricia)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas E. Williams, Kevin C. May, Eric Y. Choi and Daniel M. Terhune filed by Backer EHP, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/20/2018. (fms)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas E. Williams, Kevin C. May, Eric Y. Choi and Daniel M. Terhune - filed by Backer EHP, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent NIBE Industrier AB (publ) for Backer EHP, Inc. filed by Backer EHP, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Backer EHP, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/2/2019. (Rovner, Philip)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Backer EHP, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
November 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Philip Ducker,Stephen J Akerley,Adrian Kwan,Daniel J. Herling for Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 20, 2018 filed by Backer EHP, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Backer EHP, Inc. answer due 12/20/2018. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/13/2018. (fms)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 20, 2018 - filed by Backer EHP, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Herling, Steven J. Akerley, Philip C. Ducker and Adrian Kwan filed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/9/2018. (fms)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Herling, Steven J. Akerley, Philip C. Ducker and Adrian Kwan - filed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V.. (Enerio, Patricia)
October 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V.. Backer EHP, Inc. served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Enerio, Patricia)
October 29, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Backer EHP, Inc. on 10/29/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Zoppas Industries SpA for Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. filed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. (crb)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Backer EHP, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2491433.) - filed by Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V. v. Backer EHP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoppas Industries de Mexico S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Aaron M. Nelson
Represented By: Patricia L. Enerio
Represented By: Stephen J Akerley
Represented By: Philip Ducker
Represented By: Daniel J. Herling
Represented By: Adrian Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backer EHP, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Y. Choi
Represented By: Thomas E. Williams
Represented By: Kevin C. May
Represented By: Daniel M. Terhune
Represented By: Philip A. Rovner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?