Beck v. CafePress Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Henri Beck
Defendant: Kenneth T. McBride, Mary Ann Arico, Anthony C. Allen, Alan B. Howe, Fred E. Durham, III and CafePress Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01694
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #11 . (dlw)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Henri Beck as to Voluntary Dismissal (Bennett, Blake)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer Complaint to 12/21/2018 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Anthony C. Allen answer due 12/21/2018; Mary Ann Arico answer due 12/21/2018; CafePress Inc. answer due 12/21/2018; Fred E. Durham, III answer due 12/21/2018; Alan B. Howe answer due 12/21/2018; Kenneth T. McBride answer due 12/21/2018). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/20/2018. (dlw)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer Complaint to 12/21/2018 - filed by Anthony C. Allen, Mary Ann Arico, CafePress Inc., Fred E. Durham, III, Alan B. Howe, Kenneth T. McBride. (Fenton, Elizabeth)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Fenton on behalf of All Defendants (Fenton, Elizabeth)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henri Beck. Fred E. Durham, III served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henri Beck. Anthony C. Allen served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henri Beck. Kenneth T. McBride served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henri Beck. Alan B. Howe served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henri Beck. Mary Ann Arico served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henri Beck. CafePress Inc. served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Bennett, Blake)
October 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 29, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Anthony C. Allen on 10/29/2018; Mary Ann Arico on 10/29/2018; CafePress Inc. on 10/29/2018; Fred E. Durham, III on 10/29/2018; Alan B. Howe on 10/29/2018; Kenneth T. McBride on 10/29/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Anthony C. Allen, Mary Ann Arico, CafePress Inc., Fred E. Durham, III, Alan B. Howe, Kenneth T. McBride - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2491656.) - filed by Henri Beck. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. CafePress Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. McBride
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Fenton
Represented By: Selena E. Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Arico
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Fenton
Represented By: Selena E. Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony C. Allen
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Fenton
Represented By: Selena E. Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan B. Howe
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Fenton
Represented By: Selena E. Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred E. Durham, III
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Fenton
Represented By: Selena E. Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CafePress Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Fenton
Represented By: Selena E. Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henri Beck
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?