AutoZone, Inc. et al v. Interamerican Motor, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AutoZone, Inc. and AZIMC Investments, Inc.
Defendant: Interamerican Motor, LLC and PA & E Holdco, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01695
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Setting Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/9/2019 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Colm F. Connolly. If the parties have no issues to discuss at the scheduling conference other than dates, they may request a telephonic conference. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/12/2018. (nmf)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John S. Golwen and Jonathan E. Nelson filed by AZIMC Investments, Inc., AutoZone, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/12/2018. (fms)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John S. Golwen and Jonathan E. Nelson - filed by AZIMC Investments, Inc., AutoZone, Inc.. (Teti, Randall)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Interamerican Motor, LLC, and PA & E Holdco, Inc.'s Rule 68 Offer of Judgment filed by Interamerican Motor, LLC, PA & E Holdco, Inc..(Peach, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Interamerican Motor, LLC, PA & E Holdco, Inc.. (Peach, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Interamerican Motor, LLC, PA & E Holdco, Inc..(Peach, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew John Peach on behalf of Interamerican Motor, LLC, PA & E Holdco, Inc. (Peach, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Thompson Bayliss on behalf of Interamerican Motor, LLC, PA & E Holdco, Inc. (Bayliss, A.)
November 16, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 31, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Interamerican Motor, LLC on 10/31/2018; PA & E Holdco, Inc. on 10/31/2018. (rwc)
October 30, 2018 Remark : Case submitted for routine judicial case assignment. (rwc)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - granting #1 Motion to Seal Complaint and Exhibits. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/30/18. (rwc)
October 29, 2018 Remark : Exit copies of Motion to Seal and Sealed Complaint to Duty Judge (CFC). (rwc)
October 29, 2018 No Summons Issued. (rwc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AutoZone, Inc. for Interamerican Motor Corporation. (rwc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint - filed by AZIMC Investments, Inc., AutoZone, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(rwc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND BREACH OF CONTRACT - filed against Interamerican Motor, LLC, PA & E Holdco, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 30520.) - filed by AutoZone, Inc., AZIMC Investments, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(rwc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint and Related Documents Under Seal - filed by AZIMC Investments, Inc., AutoZone, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Acknowledgement of Consent Form)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AutoZone, Inc. et al v. Interamerican Motor, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AutoZone, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick Troupe Mickler, IV
Represented By: William P. Bowden
Represented By: Randall J. Teti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AZIMC Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick Troupe Mickler, IV
Represented By: William P. Bowden
Represented By: Randall J. Teti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interamerican Motor, LLC
Represented By: Andrew John Peach
Represented By: A. Thompson Bayliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA & E Holdco, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John Peach
Represented By: A. Thompson Bayliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?