Patterson v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Laura Patterson
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01697
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Herington, Ellis)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME time for Hartford to file a reply brief in response to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Hartford's Motion to Dismiss to December 3, 2018 filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Set Briefing Schedule: re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Reply Brief due 12/3/2018.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/20/2018. (fms)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME time for Hartford to file a reply brief in response to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Hartford's Motion to Dismiss to December 3, 2018 - filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Herington, Ellis)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion To Dismiss re #6 Response to Motion of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Laura Patterson. (Rhoads, Melissa)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Laura Patterson.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rhoads, Melissa)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Laura Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rhoads, Melissa)
November 16, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certifacte of Service)(Herington, Ellis)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Herington, Ellis)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Herington, Ellis)
October 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N18C-09-263 JRJ (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2491828)- filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Ellis E. Herington
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Patterson
Represented By: Melissa Lynn Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?