Duffy v. Carrillo et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Duffy
Defendant: Ralph F. Devore, Lee Russell, The Estate of Yehezkel Druckman, Kent S. Siegel, Michael B. Croswell, Jr., Martin M. Van Brauman, Justin W. Furnace, Gene Scammahorn, Victor G. Carrillo, Paul Oroian, John M. Brown, William H. Avery, Dustin L. Guinn and Forrest A. Garb
Nominal Defendant: Zion Oil & Gas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01725
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SO ORDERED Granting Joint Stipulation and Order Consolidating Related Actions and Appointing Co-Lead Counsel (see D.I. 5 in 18-cv-1725-RGA; D.I. 9 in 18-cv-1399-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/27/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01399-RGA, 1:18-cv-01725-RGA(nms)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Related Actions and Appointing Co-Lead Counsel by Jeff Duffy, Keith Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 11/28/2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/16/2018. (nms)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 11/28/2018 - filed by Jeff Duffy. (Farnan, Brian)
November 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeff Duffy. Zion Oil & Gas, Inc. served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Farnan, Michael)
November 1, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Zion Oil & Gas, Inc. on 11/1/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against William H. Avery, John M. Brown, Victor G. Carrillo, Michael B. Croswell, Jr, Ralph F. Devore, Justin W. Furnace, Forrest A. Garb, Dustin L. Guinn, Paul Oroian, Lee Russell, Gene Scammahorn, Kent S. Siegel, The Estate of Yehezkel Druckman, Martin M. Van Brauman, Zion Oil & Gas, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2495270.) - filed by Jeff Duffy. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy v. Carrillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph F. Devore
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Russell
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Yehezkel Druckman
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent S. Siegel
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Croswell, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin M. Van Brauman
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin W. Furnace
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Scammahorn
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor G. Carrillo
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Oroian
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Brown
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Avery
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin L. Guinn
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest A. Garb
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Zion Oil & Gas, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Duffy
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?